United States America v. Romeu et al
Plaintiff: United States America
Defendant: Francis Romeu and Hugo Romeu
Case Number: 1:2019cv23925
Filed: September 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Referring Judge: Jonathan Goodman
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER Scheduling Mediation before Francis L. Carter. Mediation Hearing set for 12/18/2019 02:00 PM. The parties are reminded that a report of their mediation must be filed within seven (7) days thereafter. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 11/15/2019. See attached document for full details. (wc)
November 14, 2019 Filing 25 NOTICE by United States America of Selection of Mediator (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Wilcove, Michael)
October 31, 2019 Filing 24 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Francis Romeu (Granoff, Loren)
October 31, 2019 Filing 23 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Hugo Romeu (Granoff, Loren)
October 31, 2019 Filing 22 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Francis Romeu (Granoff, Loren)
October 31, 2019 Filing 21 NOTICE of Compliance by Hugo Romeu (Granoff, Loren)
October 31, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Compliance by Francis Romeu (Granoff, Loren)
October 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MAGISTRATE JUDGE GOODMAN'S DISCOVERY PROCEDURES ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 10/31/2019. See attached document for full details. (tb)
October 31, 2019 Filing 18 Clerks Notice to Filer re #16 Notice (Other), #17 Certificate of Counsel. Wrong Event Selected - Document is a Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement; CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED - The Filer must File a Notice of Striking, then refile the document using the Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement event and ensure all Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents are entered. Note - Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents do not appear on the docket sheet. (pes)
October 31, 2019 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE of Counsel by Loren Stuart Granoff on behalf of Hugo Romeu (Granoff, Loren)
October 31, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE by Francis Romeu (Granoff, Loren)
October 30, 2019 Filing 15 CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman per Order on DE #14 (jao)
October 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING BENCH TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Calendar Call set for 8/25/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga., Bench Trial set for 8/31/2020 before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga., Mediation Deadline 5/11/2020.), Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 10/30/2019. See attached document for full details. (jao) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
October 29, 2019 Filing 13 Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement by United States America (Wilcove, Michael)
October 29, 2019 Filing 12 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by United States America (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wilcove, Michael)
October 15, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Francis Romeu. (Granoff, Loren)
October 15, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Hugo Romeu. (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet)(Granoff, Loren)
October 8, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Loren Stuart Granoff on behalf of Hugo Romeu. Attorney Loren Stuart Granoff added to party Hugo Romeu(pty:dft). (Granoff, Loren)
October 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Loren Stuart Granoff on behalf of Francis Romeu. Attorney Loren Stuart Granoff added to party Francis Romeu(pty:dft). (Granoff, Loren)
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER that Defendants shall submit a single combined response or separate answers within the time permitted by the rules. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 9/26/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1) Modified on 9/27/2019 (ps1).
September 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties to be filed by 10/31/2019. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 9/26/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1) Modified on 9/27/2019 (ps1).
September 26, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by United States America. Francis Romeu served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019. (Wilcove, Michael)
September 26, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by United States America. Hugo Romeu served on 9/26/2019, answer due 10/17/2019. (Wilcove, Michael)
September 23, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Francis Romeu, Hugo Romeu. (jao)
September 20, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jao)
September 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00. USA Filer - No Filing Fee Required, filed by United States America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) to Hugo Romeu, #3 Summon(s) to Francis Romeu)(Wilcove, Michael)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States America v. Romeu et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Francis Romeu
Represented By: Loren Stuart Granoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hugo Romeu
Represented By: Loren Stuart Granoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States America
Represented By: Michael N. Wilcove
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?