Aska v. Atlas Air Worldwide Holdings, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Elliott Aska
Defendant: Amazon Fulfillment Services, Inc., Atlas Air, Inc., Amazon.com Services, Inc., Atlas Air Worldwide Holdings, Inc., Flightstar Aircraft Services, LLC and F & E Aircraft Maintenance (Miami) L.L.C.
Case Number: 1:2019cv23948
Filed: September 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 7, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 7, 2019 Filing 9 Transmittal Letter Sent with Order of Remand to: Eleventh Circuit. (lbc)
October 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Remanding Case to State Court. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 10/7/2019. See attached document for full details. (lbc)
October 2, 2019 Filing 7 STIPULATION re #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), Withdrawing Notice of Removal and Remanding to State Court by Atlas Air, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order Remanding Case)(Thornton, Clayton)
September 24, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by Atlas Air, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), Filing Exhibit B to Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Exhibit B - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) (Thornton, Clayton)
September 24, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Atlas Air, Inc. re 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Records) (Thornton, Clayton)
September 24, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion shall be double-spaced in Times New Roman 12-point typeface. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the striking of the motion or dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (bfk)
September 24, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. State Court Records not included. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the State Court Records attached within 24 hours. (pcs)
September 23, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
September 23, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12006989, filed by Atlas Air, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Complaint)(Thornton, Clayton) No Answer/Motion to Dismiss filed. Modified on 9/24/2019 (pcs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aska v. Atlas Air Worldwide Holdings, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon Fulfillment Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlas Air, Inc.
Represented By: Clayton Wickliffe Thornton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Atlas Air Worldwide Holdings, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Flightstar Aircraft Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: F & E Aircraft Maintenance (Miami) L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elliott Aska
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?