The Estate of David H. Brooks v. The United States of America et al
Plaintiff: The Estate of David H. Brooks
Defendant: The Federal Bureau Of Prisons and The United States of America
Case Number: 1:2019cv24057
Filed: October 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:2674
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Jury Trial set for 10/26/2020 before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga., Calendar Call set for 10/20/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. ( Mediation Deadline 7/6/2020.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman for all discovery matters. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 11/27/2019. See attached document for full details. (mee)
November 26, 2019 Filing 15 Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates by The Estate of David H. Brooks identifying Other Affiliate Jeffrey Brooks, Other Affiliate Tache, Bronis, Christianson and Descalzo, P. A., Other Affiliate Orlando do Campo, Other Affiliate Victoria Brooks, Other Affiliate Andrew Brooks, Other Affiliate Elizabeth Brooks for The Estate of David H. Brooks (Thornton, John)
November 26, 2019 Filing 14 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by The Estate of David H. Brooks (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Joint Scheduling Report)(Thornton, John)
November 26, 2019 Filing 13 Certificate of Other Affiliates by The Federal Bureau Of Prisons, The United States of America (Welch, Alicia)
November 18, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Alicia Hayley Welch on behalf of The Federal Bureau Of Prisons, The United States of America. Attorney Alicia Hayley Welch added to party The Federal Bureau Of Prisons(pty:dft), Attorney Alicia Hayley Welch added to party The United States of America(pty:dft). (Welch, Alicia)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER that Defendants shall submit a single combined response, or separate answers, within the time permitted by the rules. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 10/22/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
October 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties to be filed by 11/29/2019. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 10/22/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
October 22, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by The Estate of David H. Brooks re #1 Complaint, #7 Summons Issued as to USA and Federal Bureau of Prisons (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. A)(Thornton, John)
October 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER that service must be perfected by 12/30/2019. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 10/21/2019. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
October 2, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to The Federal Bureau Of Prisons, The United States of America, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (kpe)
October 1, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by The Estate of David H. Brooks Civil Cover Sheet (Thornton, John)
October 1, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) for Federal Bureau of Prisons by The Estate of David H. Brooks (Thornton, John)
October 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) for United States of America by The Estate of David H. Brooks (Thornton, John)
October 1, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. No Civil Cover Sheet. Filer is instructed to file a Notice (Other) with the Civil Cover Sheet attached within 24 hours of the notice. (cds)
October 1, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds)
October 1, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12028727, filed by The Estate of David H. Brooks. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B)(Thornton, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: The Estate of David H. Brooks v. The United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Federal Bureau Of Prisons
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Estate of David H. Brooks
Represented By: John Thornton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?