FERNANDEZ et al v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Plaintiff: REINA ISABEL FERNANDEZ and SERGIO FLORES
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 1:2019cv24073
Filed: October 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1346
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 1, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 1, 2019 Filing 8 Clerks Notice to Filer re #6 Summons Returned Executed as to USA. Incorrect Service Date Entered; ERROR - The incorrect party served was entered. The correction was made by the Clerk and filing was re-docketed, see DE# 7 . It is not necessary to refile this document. (jas)
November 1, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by REINA ISABEL FERNANDEZ, SERGIO FLORES. US Attorney served on 10/15/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (See DE#6 for image). (jas)
November 1, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by REINA ISABEL FERNANDEZ. REINA ISABEL FERNANDEZ served on 10/15/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (Ganz, Marc)
November 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE re #3 Summons Issued as to USA Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 11/1/2019. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
October 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 10/2/2019. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
October 2, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney. (ar2)
October 2, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ar2)
October 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Reina Isabel Fernandez against UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12032413, filed by REINA ISABEL FERNANDEZ. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Ganz, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: FERNANDEZ et al v. UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: REINA ISABEL FERNANDEZ
Represented By: Daniel Jackson Feight, II
Represented By: Marc Phillip Ganz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SERGIO FLORES
Represented By: Daniel Jackson Feight, II
Represented By: Marc Phillip Ganz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?