Kerzer v. Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. et al
Plaintiff: Steven Kerzer
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC., Chattem, Inc., SANOFI S.A., Sanofi US Services Inc., Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., GlaxoSmithKline, PLC, Pfizer, Inc. and GlaxoSmithKline, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv24092
Filed: October 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia G Cooke
Referring Judge: Robert N Scola
2 Judge: Edwin G Torres
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 29, 2019 Filing 27 REPLY to Response to Motion re #23 MOTION to Strike #10 MOTION to Preserve Evidence or in the Alternative, Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preservation Order MOTION to Vacate , #10 MOTION to Preserve Evidence filed by Steven Kerzer. (Maderal, Francisco)
November 22, 2019 Filing 26 REPLY to Response to Motion re #20 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation or, in the Alternative, to Transfer, and Memorandum of Law in Support by Defendants Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sanofi US Services Inc., Chattem, Inc. and Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. filed by Sanofi US Services Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Oprison, Christopher)
November 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 PAPERLESS ORDER: The Court denies as moot #9 Defendants' motion to dismiss. The Plaintiff's amended pleading #22 moots the motion to dismiss the prior pleading. See Taylor v. Alabama, 275 F. Appx 836, 838 (11th Cir. 2008) (noting that when the plaintiffs amended their complaint the defendants' motion to dismiss became moot). Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. on 11/22/2019. (jaa)
November 22, 2019 Filing 24 Summons Issued as to GlaxoSmithKline, LLC, GlaxoSmithKline, PLC, Pfizer, Inc.. (kpe)
November 21, 2019 Filing 23 MOTION to Strike #10 MOTION to Preserve Evidence or in the Alternative, Response in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preservation Order ( Responses due by 12/5/2019), MOTION to Vacate by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Chattem, Inc., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7)(Arthur, Ethan)
November 21, 2019 Filing 22 First AMENDED COMPLAINT Steven Kerzer against All Defendants, filed by Steven Kerzer. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Summon(s) Pfizer Summons, #3 Summon(s) GSK LLC Summons, #4 Summon(s) GSK PLC Summons)(Maderal, Francisco)
November 20, 2019 Filing 21 RESPONSE in Opposition re #20 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation or, in the Alternative, to Transfer, and Memorandum of Law in Support by Defendants Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sanofi US Services Inc., Chattem, Inc. and filed by Steven Kerzer. Replies due by 11/27/2019. (Maderal, Francisco)
November 19, 2019 Filing 20 MOTION to Stay Proceedings Pending Decision by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation or, in the Alternative, to Transfer, and Memorandum of Law in Support by Defendants Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sanofi US Services Inc., Chattem, Inc. and Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC.. Responses due by 12/3/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Oprison, Christopher)
November 19, 2019 Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Ethan Alexander Arthur on behalf of Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Attorney Ethan Alexander Arthur added to party Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.(pty:dft). (Arthur, Ethan)
November 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Temporary Order Regarding the Preservation of Documents and Electronically Stored Information.( Responses due by 11/26/2019) Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 11/19/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
November 14, 2019 Filing 17 Courtesy Copy of of Motion of Plaintiffs for Transfer of Actions to the District of New Jersey pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1407 for Coordinated or Consolidated Pretrial Proceedings sent to the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. (Attachments: #1 Brief in Support, #2 Amended Brief in Support, #3 Schedule of Actions, #4 Proof of Service, #5 Amended Proof of Service)(mc)
November 13, 2019 Filing 16 Defendant's Corporate Disclosure Statement by Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Boehringer Ingelheim USA Corporation, Corporate Parent Boehringer Ingelheim Corporation for Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. (Cohen, Jordan)
November 12, 2019 Filing 15 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. identifying Corporate Parent Sanofi for Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. (Oprison, Christopher)
November 12, 2019 Filing 14 Corrected Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chattem, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Sanofi for Chattem, Inc. (Oprison, Christopher)
November 12, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jordan Scott Cohen on behalf of Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. Attorney Jordan Scott Cohen added to party Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.(pty:dft). (Cohen, Jordan)
November 11, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Sanofi US Services Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Sanofi for Sanofi US Services Inc. (Oprison, Christopher)
November 11, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Chattem, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Sanofi for Chattem, Inc. (Oprison, Christopher)
November 9, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION to Preserve Evidence by Steven Kerzer. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B-Minute Entry, #3 Exhibit C-Transcript)(Maderal, Francisco)
November 7, 2019 Filing 9 Joint MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Complaint, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendants Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC, Sanofi US Services Inc., Chattem, Inc., and Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc. by Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC.. Attorney Christopher George Oprison added to party Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC.(pty:dft). Responses due by 11/21/2019 (Oprison, Christopher)
October 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING DISCOVERY PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 10/24/2019. See attached document for full details. (mdc)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Requiring Discovery and Scheduling Conference and Order Referring Discovery Matters to the Magistrate Judge. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 10/23/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
October 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER OF RECUSAL. Judge Marcia G. Cooke recused. Case reassigned to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 10/15/2019. See attached document for full details. (vjk)
October 3, 2019 Filing 5 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Steven Kerzer (Maderal, Francisco)
October 3, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Chattem, Inc.. (kpe)
October 3, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc., SANOFI S.A., Sanofi US Services Inc., Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC.. (kpe)
October 3, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (kpe)
October 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Kerzer against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12034783, filed by Steven Kerzer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s), #5 Summon(s), #6 Summon(s))(Maderal, Francisco)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kerzer v. Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi-Aventis U.S. LLC.
Represented By: Christopher George Oprison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chattem, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher George Oprison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SANOFI S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sanofi US Services Inc.
Represented By: Christopher George Oprison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boehringer Ingelheim Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Ethan Alexander Arthur
Represented By: Jordan Scott Cohen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GlaxoSmithKline, PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pfizer, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GlaxoSmithKline, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Kerzer
Represented By: Roberto Martinez
Represented By: Curtis Bradley Miner
Represented By: Francisco Raul Maderal, Jr.
Represented By: Lewis S. Eidson
Represented By: Robert Jason Richards
Represented By: Bryan Frederick Aylstock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?