Herrera v. Riva Motorsports Miami, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Frank Herrera
Defendant: Yamaha Motor Manufacturing Corporation of America, Inc., Riva Motorsports Miami, Inc., Automotive Warranty Services of Florida, Inc., Yamaha Jet Boat Manufacturing U.S.A., Inc., Yamaha Motor Corporation, USA, Riva Motorsports Pompano and Riva Performance Products, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv24175
Filed: October 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia G Cooke
Referring Judge: Jonathan Goodman
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 15:2301
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 11/25/2019. See attached document for full details. (kou)
November 7, 2019 Filing 13 STIPULATION of Dismissal by Yamaha Motor Corporation, USA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Kissane, Daniel)
October 17, 2019 Filing 12 Summons Issued as to Automotive Warranty Services of Florida, Inc., Riva Motorsports Miami, Inc., Riva Motorsports Pompano, Riva Performance Products, Inc., Yamaha Jet Boat Manufacturing U.S.A., Inc., Yamaha Motor Corporation, USA, Yamaha Motor Manufacturing Corporation of America, Inc. (pes)
October 16, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) AUTOMOTIVE WARRANTY SERVICES OF FLORIDA, INC. by Frank Herrera (Sardina, Gustavo)
October 16, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) RIVA MOTORSPORTS POMPANO by Frank Herrera (Sardina, Gustavo)
October 16, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) RIVA PERFORMANCE PRODUCTS, INC. by Frank Herrera (Sardina, Gustavo)
October 16, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) RIVA MOTORSPORTS MIAMI, INC. by Frank Herrera (Sardina, Gustavo)
October 16, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) YAMAHA JET BOAT MANUFACTURING U.S.A., INC. by Frank Herrera (Sardina, Gustavo)
October 16, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) YAMAHA MOTOR MANUFACTURING CORPORATION OF AMERICA, INC. by Frank Herrera (Sardina, Gustavo)
October 16, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) YAMAHA MOTOR CORPORATION, USA by Frank Herrera (Sardina, Gustavo)
October 11, 2019 Filing 4 REFERRAL to Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman per DE #3 Order of Referral and Order Regarding Court Practices and Procedures. (yar)
October 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF REFERRAL AND ORDER REGARDING COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES. Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters; Notice re Joint Motions; Expedited Service Deadline 12/09/2019. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 10/10/2019. See attached document for full details. (kou)
October 9, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jao)
October 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12052916, filed by Frank Herrera. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Sardina, Gustavo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Herrera v. Riva Motorsports Miami, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yamaha Motor Manufacturing Corporation of America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riva Motorsports Miami, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Automotive Warranty Services of Florida, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yamaha Jet Boat Manufacturing U.S.A., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Yamaha Motor Corporation, USA
Represented By: Daniel John Kissane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riva Motorsports Pompano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Riva Performance Products, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Herrera
Represented By: Gustavo Sardina
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?