ABI-HANNA et al v. FORD MOTOR COMPANY
Plaintiff: MICHAEL TREZZA, ROSE M. CAMPANARO, HAROLD CAREY, MICHAEL PAYNE, LESLIE UJJ, FRANK IOVINE, DANIEL CAFFREY, ROBERT CASTON, WILLIAM T. MARSH JR, WAYNE BOYCE, HOPE GOODMAN, MICHAEL PARHAM, FRANK FISCHL, DAVID MARSH, STEVEN SOFIA, WILLIAM C. ZINK III, ARTUS SATTERFIELD, GEORGE JENZANO, OLIVER W. BENDERS, STEVEN GRAY, PABITRA PAUDEL, CARL A. BEHARRY, JOYCE GORANT, LISA JESTER, MAXINE GURIN, WENDE CAMPANILE, CLEVELAND SMALL, JEROME WILKINS, STEPHEN WHITEHEAD, VINCENT SACCO, ANASTASIA PARSONS, RICHARD A. SMITH, NICHOLAS MARIOLIS, JAMES WORTHINGTON, GEORGE WILLIAMS, ROSS ALAIMO, SUSAN HUGHES, GEORGE ROBERTSON, ANDREA BLOCK, DOMENICK C. LINSALATO, JOHN AHRENS, LYNN MIZER, PATRICIA LAPINSKI, GEORGE ALFONSO, MALCOLM GINSBERG, ROBERT SAUNDERS, JOHN MARTIN, GLADYS KAY, THERESA D. FERRISS, LYNDA TAYLOR, KELLIANNE WORTHINGTON,, ROBERT VETTER, DAYNA FILLMAN, KENNETH HALLORAN, SHIRLEY MCGOVERN, THOMAS E. FRANK, AKRAM ABI-HANNA, JAMES RUSHMORE, LOURDES HERRERA, DOMINICK ERVELLI JR, JONATHAN HILDUM, JOHN G. PEPITONE, ERIK SPONG, WAYNE RELYEA, JOSEPH UNCLE, ALEXANDER ASTRAKAN, MICHAEL ZAK, EDWARD T. HEARN, MEGHAN RUSSO, KATHLEEN MCCARTHY, BARBARA A. BALLARD, Robert Teti, NELSON GASKILL, BARBARA ROSARIO, ELIZABETH RASMUSSEN, MARTIN AGACINSKI JR. and ISRAEL EISENBERG
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv24241
Filed: October 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Federico A Moreno
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 15:2301
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 6, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #13 Order to Show Cause by SUSAN HUGHES, JONATHAN HILDUM, FRANK FISCHL, STEVEN SOFIA, STEPHEN WHITEHEAD, BARBARA A. BALLARD, JOYCE GORANT, DOMINICK ERVELLI JR, JEROME WILKINS, ROBERT CASTON, KATHLEEN MCCARTHY, BARBARA ROSARIO, JAMES WORTHINGTON, STEVEN GRAY, MEGHAN RUSSO, CLEVELAND SMALL, DAYNA FILLMAN, ANDREA BLOCK, LOURDES HERRERA, GEORGE JENZANO, WAYNE BOYCE, ANASTASIA PARSONS, WILLIAM C. ZINK III, LYNDA TAYLOR, KENNETH HALLORAN, MICHAEL PAYNE, DOMENICK C. LINSALATO, ERIK SPONG, VINCENT SACCO, WILLIAM T. MARSH JR, DANIEL CAFFREY, HAROLD CAREY, ELIZABETH RASMUSSEN, ROBERT SAUNDERS, JAMES RUSHMORE, Robert Teti, SHIRLEY MCGOVERN, GEORGE WILLIAMS, MICHAEL ZAK, THERESA D. FERRISS, RICHARD A. SMITH, GEORGE ROBERTSON, MICHAEL TREZZA, ROBERT VETTER, LESLIE UJJ, MARTIN AGACINSKI JR., ISRAEL EISENBERG, AKRAM ABI-HANNA, EDWARD T. HEARN, HOPE GOODMAN, MAXINE GURIN, KELLIANNE WORTHINGTON,, NICHOLAS MARIOLIS, WENDE CAMPANILE, JOSEPH UNCLE, ARTUS SATTERFIELD, PABITRA PAUDEL, MALCOLM GINSBERG, WAYNE RELYEA, THOMAS E. FRANK, DAVID MARSH, LYNN MIZER, ROSE M. CAMPANARO, NELSON GASKILL, ALEXANDER ASTRAKAN, JOHN AHRENS, LISA JESTER, OLIVER W. BENDERS, JOHN G. PEPITONE, MICHAEL PARHAM, CARL A. BEHARRY, PATRICIA LAPINSKI, ROSS ALAIMO, FRANK IOVINE, GLADYS KAY, JOHN MARTIN, GEORGE ALFONSO. (Fornaro, Matthew)
December 6, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Henry Salas on behalf of Ford Motor Company. Attorney Henry Salas added to party Ford Motor Company(pty:dft). (Salas, Henry)
December 6, 2019 Filing 16 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #13 Order to Show Cause by Ford Motor Company. (Dominguez, Brian)
December 6, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian A Dominguez on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Dominguez, Brian)
December 6, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian A Dominguez on behalf of Ford Motor Company. Attorney Brian A Dominguez added to party Ford Motor Company(pty:dft). (Dominguez, Brian)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING ADMISSION TO PRACTICE. Response due 12/6/2019. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 11/20/2019. See attached document for full details. (km02)
October 17, 2019 Filing 12 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from District of New Jersey. Case Number 2:19-cv-17837 with documents 1-7. Assigned FLSD Case Number 1:19-cv-24241-FAM on 10/15/2019. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:15-md-02599-FAM. (mc)
October 16, 2019 Filing 11 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Spencer H. Kuhner, mailing date October 16, 2019, (cco)
October 16, 2019 Filing 10 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney James Steven Dobis, mailing date October 16, 2019, (cco)
October 15, 2019 Filing 9 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Federico A. Moreno. (mc)
October 15, 2019 Filing 8 Case transferred in from New Jersey; Case Number 2:19-cv-17837. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(mc).
October 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order of MDL Panel transferring case to the Southern District of Florida. (MDL 2599 CTO 84 Judge Federico A. Moreno) (gh, )
October 2, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 TEXT ORDER: The Court grants Defendants request (DE 4) to extend the deadline to respond to the Complaint until 30 days after the earliest of the following events: (i) the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation denies transfer of this action into an MDL or (ii) this action is transferred and re-docketed in Southern District of Florida following the JPMLs decision transferring this action to the MDL.. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor on 10/2/19. (tjg, )
September 30, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines as to #4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,,,, . Motion set for 10/21/2019 before Judge Esther Salas. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (ld, )
September 26, 2019 Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FORD MOTOR COMPANY. (DOBIS, JAMES)
September 26, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,,,, by FORD MOTOR COMPANY. (DOBIS, JAMES)
September 26, 2019 Filing 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed by SUSAN HUGHES, JONATHAN HILDUM, FRANK FISCHL, STEVEN SOFIA, STEPHEN WHITEHEAD, BARBARA A. BALLARD, JOYCE GORANT, DOMINICK ERVELLI JR, JEROME WILKINS, ROBERT CASTON, KATHLEEN MCCARTHY, BARBARA ROSARIO, JAMES WORTHINGTON, STEVEN GRAY, MEGHAN RUSSO, CLEVELAND SMALL, DAYNA FILLMAN, ANDREA BLOCK, LOURDES HERRERA, GEORGE JENZANO, WAYNE BOYCE, ANASTASIA PARSONS, WILLIAM C. ZINK III, LYNDA TAYLOR, KENNETH HALLORAN, MICHAEL PAYNE, DOMENICK C. LINSALATO, ERIK SPONG, VINCENT SACCO, WILLIAM T. MARSH JR, DANIEL CAFFREY, HAROLD CAREY, ELIZABETH RASMUSSEN, ROBERT SAUNDERS, JAMES RUSHMORE, ROBERT TETI, SHIRLEY MCGOVERN, GEORGE WILLIAMS, MICHAEL ZAK, THERESA D. FERRISS, RICHARD A. SMITH, GEORGE ROBERTSON, MICHAEL TREZZA, ROBERT VETTER, LESLIE UJJ, MARTIN AGACINSKI JR., ISRAEL EISENBERG, AKRAM ABI-HANNA, EDWARD T. HEARN, HOPE GOODMAN, MAXINE GURIN, KELLIANNE WORTHINGTON,, NICHOLAS MARIOLIS, WENDE CAMPANILE, JOSEPH UNCLE, ARTUS SATTERFIELD, PABITRA PAUDEL, MALCOLM GINSBERG, WAYNE RELYEA, THOMAS E. FRANK, DAVID MARSH, LYNN MIZER, ROSE M. CAMPANARO, NELSON GASKILL, ALEXANDER ASTRAKAN, JOHN AHRENS, LISA JESTER, OLIVER W. BENDERS, JOHN G. PEPITONE, MICHAEL PARHAM, CARL A. BEHARRY, PATRICIA LAPINSKI, ROSS ALAIMO, FRANK IOVINE, GLADYS KAY, JOHN MARTIN, GEORGE ALFONSO. FORD MOTOR COMPANY served on 9/17/2019, answer due 10/8/2019. (KUHNER, SPENCER)
September 11, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to FORD MOTOR COMPANY. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (ams, )
September 11, 2019 Judge Esther Salas and Magistrate Judge Cathy L. Waldor added. (eu, )
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against FORD MOTOR COMPANY ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number 0312-9953069) with JURY DEMAND, filed by SUSAN HUGHES, JONATHAN HILDUM, FRANK FISCHL, STEVEN SOFIA, STEPHEN WHITEHEAD, BARBARA A. BALLARD, JOYCE GORANT, DOMINICK ERVELLI JR, JEROME WILKINS, ROBERT CASTON, KATHLEEN MCCARTHY, BARBARA ROSARIO, JAMES WORTHINGTON, STEVEN GRAY, MEGHAN RUSSO, CLEVELAND SMALL, DAYNA FILLMAN, ANDREA BLOCK, LOURDES HERRERA, GEORGE JENZANO, WAYNE BOYCE, ANASTASIA PARSONS, WILLIAM C. ZINK III, LYNDA TAYLOR, KENNETH HALLORAN, MICHAEL PAYNE, DOMENICK C. LINSALATO, ERIK SPONG, VINCENT SACCO, WILLIAM T. MARSH JR, DANIEL CAFFREY, HAROLD CAREY, ELIZABETH RASMUSSEN, ROBERT SAUNDERS, JAMES RUSHMORE, ROBERT TETI, SHIRLEY MCGOVERN, GEORGE WILLIAMS, MICHAEL ZAK, THERESA D. FERRISS, RICHARD A. SMITH, GEORGE ROBERTSON, MICHAEL TREZZA, ROBERT VETTER, LESLIE UJJ, MARTIN AGACINSKI JR., ISRAEL EISENBERG, AKRAM ABI-HANNA, EDWARD T. HEARN, HOPE GOODMAN, MAXINE GURIN, KELLIANNE WORTHINGTON,, NICHOLAS MARIOLIS, WENDE CAMPANILE, JOSEPH UNCLE, ARTUS SATTERFIELD, PABITRA PAUDEL, MALCOLM GINSBERG, WAYNE RELYEA, THOMAS E. FRANK, DAVID MARSH, LYNN MIZER, ROSE M. CAMPANARO, NELSON GASKILL, ALEXANDER ASTRAKAN, JOHN AHRENS, LISA JESTER, OLIVER W. BENDERS, JOHN G. PEPITONE, MICHAEL PARHAM, CARL A. BEHARRY, PATRICIA LAPINSKI, ROSS ALAIMO, FRANK IOVINE, GLADYS KAY, JOHN MARTIN, GEORGE ALFONSO. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Summons)(KUHNER, SPENCER)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ABI-HANNA et al v. FORD MOTOR COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL TREZZA
Represented By: Matthew Fornaro
Represented By: Spencer H. Kuhner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROSE M. CAMPANARO
Represented By: Matthew Fornaro
Represented By: Spencer H. Kuhner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HAROLD CAREY
Represented By: Matthew Fornaro
Represented By: Spencer H. Kuhner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL PAYNE
Represented By: Matthew Fornaro
Represented By: Spencer H. Kuhner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LESLIE UJJ
Represented By: Matthew Fornaro
Represented By: Spencer H. Kuhner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANK IOVINE
Represented By: Matthew Fornaro
Represented By: Spencer H. Kuhner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DANIEL CAFFREY
Represented By: Matthew Fornaro
Represented By: Spencer H. Kuhner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT CASTON
Represented By: Matthew Fornaro
Represented By: Spencer H. Kuhner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM T. MARSH JR
Represented By: Matthew Fornaro
Represented By: Spencer H. Kuhner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WAYNE BOYCE
Represented By: Matthew Fornaro
Represented By: Spencer H. Kuhner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HOPE GOODMAN
Represented By: Matthew Fornaro
Represented By: Spencer H. Kuhner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL PARHAM
Represented By: Matthew Fornaro
Represented By: Spencer H. Kuhner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: FRANK FISCHL
Represented By: Matthew Fornaro
Represented By: Spencer H. Kuhner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAVID MARSH
Represented By: Matthew Fornaro
Represented By: Spencer H. Kuhner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEVEN SOFIA
Represented By: Matthew Fornaro
Represented By: Spencer H. Kuhner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM C. ZINK III
Represented By: Matthew Fornaro
Represented By: Spencer H. Kuhner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ARTUS SATTERFIELD
Represented By: Matthew Fornaro
Represented By: Spencer H. Kuhner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEORGE JENZANO
Represented By: Matthew Fornaro
Represented By: Spencer H. Kuhner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: OLIVER W. BENDERS
Represented By: Matthew Fornaro
Represented By: Spencer H. Kuhner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEVEN GRAY
Represented By: Matthew Fornaro
Represented By: Spencer H. Kuhner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PABITRA PAUDEL
Represented By: Matthew Fornaro
Represented By: Spencer H. Kuhner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CARL A. BEHARRY
Represented By: Matthew Fornaro
Represented By: Spencer H. Kuhner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOYCE GORANT
Represented By: Matthew Fornaro
Represented By: Spencer H. Kuhner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LISA JESTER
Represented By: Matthew Fornaro
Represented By: Spencer H. Kuhner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MAXINE GURIN
Represented By: Matthew Fornaro
Represented By: Spencer H. Kuhner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WENDE CAMPANILE
Represented By: Matthew Fornaro
Represented By: Spencer H. Kuhner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CLEVELAND SMALL
Represented By: Matthew Fornaro
Represented By: Spencer H. Kuhner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JEROME WILKINS
Represented By: Matthew Fornaro
Represented By: Spencer H. Kuhner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHEN WHITEHEAD
Represented By: Matthew Fornaro
Represented By: Spencer H. Kuhner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VINCENT SACCO
Represented By: Matthew Fornaro
Represented By: Spencer H. Kuhner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANASTASIA PARSONS
Represented By: Matthew Fornaro
Represented By: Spencer H. Kuhner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RICHARD A. SMITH
Represented By: Matthew Fornaro
Represented By: Spencer H. Kuhner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NICHOLAS MARIOLIS
Represented By: Matthew Fornaro
Represented By: Spencer H. Kuhner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES WORTHINGTON
Represented By: Matthew Fornaro
Represented By: Spencer H. Kuhner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEORGE WILLIAMS
Represented By: Matthew Fornaro
Represented By: Spencer H. Kuhner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROSS ALAIMO
Represented By: Matthew Fornaro
Represented By: Spencer H. Kuhner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SUSAN HUGHES
Represented By: Matthew Fornaro
Represented By: Spencer H. Kuhner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEORGE ROBERTSON
Represented By: Matthew Fornaro
Represented By: Spencer H. Kuhner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ANDREA BLOCK
Represented By: Matthew Fornaro
Represented By: Spencer H. Kuhner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOMENICK C. LINSALATO
Represented By: Matthew Fornaro
Represented By: Spencer H. Kuhner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN AHRENS
Represented By: Matthew Fornaro
Represented By: Spencer H. Kuhner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LYNN MIZER
Represented By: Matthew Fornaro
Represented By: Spencer H. Kuhner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PATRICIA LAPINSKI
Represented By: Matthew Fornaro
Represented By: Spencer H. Kuhner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEORGE ALFONSO
Represented By: Matthew Fornaro
Represented By: Spencer H. Kuhner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MALCOLM GINSBERG
Represented By: Matthew Fornaro
Represented By: Spencer H. Kuhner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT SAUNDERS
Represented By: Matthew Fornaro
Represented By: Spencer H. Kuhner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN MARTIN
Represented By: Matthew Fornaro
Represented By: Spencer H. Kuhner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GLADYS KAY
Represented By: Matthew Fornaro
Represented By: Spencer H. Kuhner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THERESA D. FERRISS
Represented By: Matthew Fornaro
Represented By: Spencer H. Kuhner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LYNDA TAYLOR
Represented By: Matthew Fornaro
Represented By: Spencer H. Kuhner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KELLIANNE WORTHINGTON,
Represented By: Matthew Fornaro
Represented By: Spencer H. Kuhner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT VETTER
Represented By: Matthew Fornaro
Represented By: Spencer H. Kuhner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DAYNA FILLMAN
Represented By: Matthew Fornaro
Represented By: Spencer H. Kuhner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KENNETH HALLORAN
Represented By: Matthew Fornaro
Represented By: Spencer H. Kuhner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHIRLEY MCGOVERN
Represented By: Matthew Fornaro
Represented By: Spencer H. Kuhner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THOMAS E. FRANK
Represented By: Matthew Fornaro
Represented By: Spencer H. Kuhner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AKRAM ABI-HANNA
Represented By: Matthew Fornaro
Represented By: Spencer H. Kuhner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAMES RUSHMORE
Represented By: Matthew Fornaro
Represented By: Spencer H. Kuhner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LOURDES HERRERA
Represented By: Matthew Fornaro
Represented By: Spencer H. Kuhner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DOMINICK ERVELLI JR
Represented By: Matthew Fornaro
Represented By: Spencer H. Kuhner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JONATHAN HILDUM
Represented By: Matthew Fornaro
Represented By: Spencer H. Kuhner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN G. PEPITONE
Represented By: Matthew Fornaro
Represented By: Spencer H. Kuhner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ERIK SPONG
Represented By: Matthew Fornaro
Represented By: Spencer H. Kuhner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WAYNE RELYEA
Represented By: Matthew Fornaro
Represented By: Spencer H. Kuhner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOSEPH UNCLE
Represented By: Matthew Fornaro
Represented By: Spencer H. Kuhner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ALEXANDER ASTRAKAN
Represented By: Matthew Fornaro
Represented By: Spencer H. Kuhner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MICHAEL ZAK
Represented By: Matthew Fornaro
Represented By: Spencer H. Kuhner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EDWARD T. HEARN
Represented By: Matthew Fornaro
Represented By: Spencer H. Kuhner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MEGHAN RUSSO
Represented By: Matthew Fornaro
Represented By: Spencer H. Kuhner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATHLEEN MCCARTHY
Represented By: Matthew Fornaro
Represented By: Spencer H. Kuhner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARBARA A. BALLARD
Represented By: Matthew Fornaro
Represented By: Spencer H. Kuhner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Teti
Represented By: Matthew Fornaro
Represented By: Spencer H. Kuhner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NELSON GASKILL
Represented By: Matthew Fornaro
Represented By: Spencer H. Kuhner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BARBARA ROSARIO
Represented By: Matthew Fornaro
Represented By: Spencer H. Kuhner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ELIZABETH RASMUSSEN
Represented By: Matthew Fornaro
Represented By: Spencer H. Kuhner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARTIN AGACINSKI JR.
Represented By: Matthew Fornaro
Represented By: Spencer H. Kuhner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ISRAEL EISENBERG
Represented By: Matthew Fornaro
Represented By: Spencer H. Kuhner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Brian A Dominguez
Represented By: Henry Salas
Represented By: James Steven Dobis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?