UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. ONE 1999 135-FOOT BAGLIETTO YACHT et al
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: REAL PROPERTY LOCATED AT VISTAMAR GOLF VILLAGE, NUMBER 3, INCLUDING FIXTURES AND FURNISHINGS, IN PANAMA, PANAMA,, REAL PROPERTY LOCATED AT 2101 SOUTH SURF ROAD, UNIT 2E, HOLLYWOOD, FLORIDA, REAL PROPERTY LOCATED AT RESIDENCIAL COSTAMARE, APARTMENT 24-011, INCLUDING FIXTURES AND FURNISHINGS, IN PANAMA, PANAMA,, APPROXIMATELY $4,096,989.74 IN U.S. CURRENCY RECOVERED ON OR ABOUT JULY 17, 2018,, REAL PROPERTY LOCATED AT 18555 COLLINS AVENUE, UNIT 2205, SUNNY ISLES BEACH, FLORIDA 33160,, REAL PROPERTY LOCATED AT RESIDENCIAL SANTA MARIA SIGNATURE, APARTMENTS 2-A, 2-B, 3-B, 5-B, 6-B, 7-B, 8-A, 11-A, 11-B, INCLUDING FIXTURES AND FURNISHINGS, IN PANAMA, PANAMA,, APPROXIMATELY $5,999,710.00 IN U.S. CURRENCY SEIZED ON OR ABOUT DECEMBER 19, 2017,, APPROXIMATELY $35,488,967.72 IN U.S. CURRENCY SEIZED ON OR ABOUT JANUARY 8, 2018,, ALL ASSETS ON DEPOSIT IN ACCOUNT NUMBER Z1ULD767 AT VALBURY CAPITAL, LTD. IN LONDON, UNITED KINGDOM, and, ONE 1999 135-FOOT BAGLIETTO YACHT, KNOWN AS M/Y BLUE ICE, OFFICIAL NUMBER 40146 REGISTERED IN ST. VINCENT AND THE GRENADINES, IN CURACAO, REAL PROPERTY LOCATED AT RESIDENCIAL SANTA MARIA SIGNATURE, APARTMENTS 9-A AND 9-B, INCLUDING FIXTURES AND FURNISHINGS, IN PANAMA, PANAMA,, REAL PROPERTY LOCATED AT RESIDENCIAL COSTAMARE, APARTMENT 24-021, INCLUDING FIXTURES AND FURNISHINGS, IN PANAMA, PANAMA,, One 1999 135-Foot Baglietto Yacht, Real Property Located At Vistamar Golf Village, Real Property Located At Residencial Costamare, Real Property Located At Residencial Santa Maria Signature Apartments, Real Property Located At Residencial Santa Maria Signature, M and Real Property Located At Residencial costamare Apartment
Claimant: Zenaida Claret Urbano-Taylor Romero
Case Number: 1:2019cv24249
Filed: October 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Kathleen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 18:0981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 12, 2019 Filing 22 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to #1 Complaint for Forfeiture,,,,,, (18555 Collins Avenue, Unit 2205, Sunny Isles Beach, FL) filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Croke, Danielle)
December 12, 2019 Filing 21 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE as to #1 Complaint for Forfeiture,,,,,, (Real property located at 2101 South Surf Road, Unit 2E, Hollywood, FL) filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Croke, Danielle)
December 10, 2019 Filing 20 Corrected MOTION for Extension of Time to file a verified claim re #14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint for Forfeiture,,,,,, by REAL PROPERTY LOCATED AT 2101 SOUTH SURF ROAD, UNIT 2E, HOLLYWOOD, FLORIDA. Attorney Jorge A Perez Santiago added to party REAL PROPERTY LOCATED AT 2101 SOUTH SURF ROAD, UNIT 2E, HOLLYWOOD, FLORIDA(pty:dft). Responses due by 12/24/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perez Santiago, Jorge)
December 9, 2019 Filing 19 CLAIM Verified Claim by Zenaida Claret Urbano-Taylor Romero. (Couriel, John)
December 9, 2019 Filing 18 CLAIM Verified Claim by Zenaida Claret Urbano-Taylor Romero. (Couriel, John)
December 9, 2019 Filing 17 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Jason Michael Short. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-12211578 by Zenaida Claret Urbano-Taylor Romero. Responses due by 12/23/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Couriel, John)
December 9, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Emiliano Martin De Luca. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-12211577 by Zenaida Claret Urbano-Taylor Romero. Responses due by 12/23/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Couriel, John)
December 9, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John Daniel Couriel on behalf of Zenaida Claret Urbano-Taylor Romero. Attorney John Daniel Couriel added to party Zenaida Claret Urbano-Taylor Romero(pty:clm). (Couriel, John)
December 9, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint for Forfeiture,,,,,, by REAL PROPERTY LOCATED AT 2101 SOUTH SURF ROAD, UNIT 2E, HOLLYWOOD, FLORIDA. Attorney Jeffrey Henry Sloman added to party REAL PROPERTY LOCATED AT 2101 SOUTH SURF ROAD, UNIT 2E, HOLLYWOOD, FLORIDA(pty:dft). (Sloman, Jeffrey)
December 4, 2019 Filing 13 CLAIM Verified Claim of CC1 FL II, LLC as Tax Lien Certificate Holder by CC1 FL II, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" Tax Lien)(Wernick, Aaron)
December 4, 2019 Filing 12 CLAIM Verified Claim of CAZ Creek V, LLC as Tax Lien Certificate Holder by CAZ Creek Florida V, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit "A" Tax Lien)(Wernick, Aaron)
November 27, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Aaron A. Wernick on behalf of CAZ Creek Florida V, LLC. Attorney Aaron A. Wernick added to party CAZ Creek Florida V, LLC(pty:ip). (Wernick, Aaron)
November 27, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Aaron A. Wernick on behalf of CC1 FL II, LLC. Attorney Aaron A. Wernick added to party CC1 FL II, LLC(pty:ip). (Wernick, Aaron)
November 14, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA Regarding Arrest Warrants In Rem (Croke, Danielle)
November 7, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA for property located at 18555 Collins Avenue, Unit 2205, Sunny Isles Beach, Florida 33160-2403 ; Grantees: PALADIUM REAL ESTATE GROUP LLC (Attachments: #1 Recorded Lis Pendens) (Croke, Danielle)
October 31, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Lis Pendens by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA for property located at 2101 South Surf Road, Unit 2E, Hollywood, FL ; Grantees: Land Trust TH 041117 (Attachments: #1 Recorded Lis Pendens) (Croke, Danielle)
October 23, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA of Filing Notice of Action Foreign (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice of Action Foreign) (Croke, Danielle)
October 23, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Striking D.E. 1-5 Notice of Action Foreign by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Croke, Danielle)
October 17, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Nicole Grosnoff on behalf of UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Grosnoff, Nicole)
October 16, 2019 Filing 3 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Nicole Grosnoff, mailing date Occtober 16, 2019, (pt)
October 15, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (cds)
October 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Forfeiture against ALL ASSETS ON DEPOSIT IN ACCOUNT NUMBER Z1ULD767 AT VALBURY CAPITAL, LTD. IN LONDON, UNITED KINGDOM, and, APPROXIMATELY $35,488,967.72 IN U.S. CURRENCY SEIZED ON OR ABOUT JANUARY 8, 2018,, APPROXIMATELY $4,096,989.74 IN U.S. CURRENCY RECOVERED ON OR ABOUT JULY 17, 2018,, APPROXIMATELY $5,999,710.00 IN U.S. CURRENCY SEIZED ON OR ABOUT DECEMBER 19, 2017,, ONE 1999 135-FOOT BAGLIETTO YACHT, KNOWN AS M/Y BLUE ICE, OFFICIAL NUMBER 40146 REGISTERED IN ST. VINCENT AND THE GRENADINES, IN CURACAO, REAL PROPERTY LOCATED AT 18555 COLLINS AVENUE, UNIT 2205, SUNNY ISLES BEACH, FLORIDA 33160,, REAL PROPERTY LOCATED AT 2101 SOUTH SURF ROAD, UNIT 2E, HOLLYWOOD, FLORIDA, REAL PROPERTY LOCATED AT RESIDENCIAL COSTAMARE, APARTMENT 24-011, INCLUDING FIXTURES AND FURNISHINGS, IN PANAMA, PANAMA,, REAL PROPERTY LOCATED AT RESIDENCIAL COSTAMARE, APARTMENT 24-021, INCLUDING FIXTURES AND FURNISHINGS, IN PANAMA, PANAMA,, REAL PROPERTY LOCATED AT RESIDENCIAL SANTA MARIA SIGNATURE, APARTMENTS 2-A, 2-B, 3-B, 5-B, 6-B, 7-B, 8-A, 11-A, 11-B, INCLUDING FIXTURES AND FURNISHINGS, IN PANAMA, PANAMA,, REAL PROPERTY LOCATED AT RESIDENCIAL SANTA MARIA SIGNATURE, APARTMENTS 9-A AND 9-B, INCLUDING FIXTURES AND FURNISHINGS, IN PANAMA, PANAMA,, REAL PROPERTY LOCATED AT VISTAMAR GOLF VILLAGE, NUMBER 3, INCLUDING FIXTURES AND FURNISHINGS, IN PANAMA, PANAMA,. Filing fees $ 400.00. USA Filer - No Filing Fee Required, filed by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Civil Complaint Cover Sheet, #3 Notice of Action Porsche Condo, #4 Notice of Action Sage Condo, #5 Stricken and restricted per DE#5)(Croke, Danielle) Modified on 10/24/2019 (cqs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. ONE 1999 135-FOOT BAGLIETTO YACHT et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REAL PROPERTY LOCATED AT VISTAMAR GOLF VILLAGE, NUMBER 3, INCLUDING FIXTURES AND FURNISHINGS, IN PANAMA, PANAMA,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REAL PROPERTY LOCATED AT 2101 SOUTH SURF ROAD, UNIT 2E, HOLLYWOOD, FLORIDA
Represented By: Jorge A Perez Santiago
Represented By: Jeffrey Henry Sloman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REAL PROPERTY LOCATED AT RESIDENCIAL COSTAMARE, APARTMENT 24-011, INCLUDING FIXTURES AND FURNISHINGS, IN PANAMA, PANAMA,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APPROXIMATELY $4,096,989.74 IN U.S. CURRENCY RECOVERED ON OR ABOUT JULY 17, 2018,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REAL PROPERTY LOCATED AT 18555 COLLINS AVENUE, UNIT 2205, SUNNY ISLES BEACH, FLORIDA 33160,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REAL PROPERTY LOCATED AT RESIDENCIAL SANTA MARIA SIGNATURE, APARTMENTS 2-A, 2-B, 3-B, 5-B, 6-B, 7-B, 8-A, 11-A, 11-B, INCLUDING FIXTURES AND FURNISHINGS, IN PANAMA, PANAMA,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APPROXIMATELY $5,999,710.00 IN U.S. CURRENCY SEIZED ON OR ABOUT DECEMBER 19, 2017,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: APPROXIMATELY $35,488,967.72 IN U.S. CURRENCY SEIZED ON OR ABOUT JANUARY 8, 2018,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALL ASSETS ON DEPOSIT IN ACCOUNT NUMBER Z1ULD767 AT VALBURY CAPITAL, LTD. IN LONDON, UNITED KINGDOM, and
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ONE 1999 135-FOOT BAGLIETTO YACHT, KNOWN AS M/Y BLUE ICE, OFFICIAL NUMBER 40146 REGISTERED IN ST. VINCENT AND THE GRENADINES, IN CURACAO
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REAL PROPERTY LOCATED AT RESIDENCIAL SANTA MARIA SIGNATURE, APARTMENTS 9-A AND 9-B, INCLUDING FIXTURES AND FURNISHINGS, IN PANAMA, PANAMA,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REAL PROPERTY LOCATED AT RESIDENCIAL COSTAMARE, APARTMENT 24-021, INCLUDING FIXTURES AND FURNISHINGS, IN PANAMA, PANAMA,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: One 1999 135-Foot Baglietto Yacht
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property Located At Vistamar Golf Village
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property Located At Residencial Costamare
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property Located At Residencial Santa Maria Signature Apartments
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property Located At Residencial Santa Maria Signature
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Real Property Located At Residencial costamare Apartment
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Danielle Nicole Croke
Represented By: Nicole Grosnoff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: Zenaida Claret Urbano-Taylor Romero
Represented By: Jason Michael Short
Represented By: John Daniel Couriel
Represented By: Emiliano Martin De Luca
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?