De Saint George Elkaim et al v. City of Miami et al
Plaintiff: Erna De Saint George Elkaim, Marc De Saint George Elkaim and Esther De Saint George Elkaim
Defendant: The Shul Of Bal Harbour, Alexandra Aubry, Surfside Police Department, Town of Surfside, Grand Beach Hotel Surfside, City of Miami, Sholom Dovber Lipskar and Jay Matelis
Case Number: 1:2019cv24269
Filed: October 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Jose E Martinez
Referring Judge: Alicia M Otazo-Reyes
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 13, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Of Dismissal:granting #13 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 11/12/2019. See attached document for full details. (cqs)Text Modified on 11/13/2019 (cqs).
November 8, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION for Leave to File Defendants' Unilateral Conference Report by City of Miami. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Text of Proposed Order)(Harrison, Douglas)
October 24, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Paul Martin Woodson on behalf of Sholom Dovber Lipskar. Attorney Paul Martin Woodson added to party Sholom Dovber Lipskar(pty:dft). (Woodson, Paul)
October 24, 2019 Filing 13 MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by The Shul Of Bal Harbour. Responses due by 11/7/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Woodson, Paul)
October 23, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Ross Piper on behalf of Jay Matelis. Attorney Michael Ross Piper added to party Jay Matelis(pty:dft). (Piper, Michael)
October 23, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING CIVIL TRIAL DATE AND PRETRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MOTIONS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: (Jury Trial set for 7/20/2020 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Jose E. Martinez., Calendar Call set for 7/16/2020 01:30 PM in Miami Division before Judge Jose E. Martinez.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation., ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 10/23/2019. See attached document for full details. (jas)
October 18, 2019 Filing 10 Notice of Court Practice in Removal Cases. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 10/18/2019. See attached document for full details. (dq)
October 18, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Michael Ross Piper on behalf of Town of Surfside (Piper, Michael)
October 18, 2019 Filing 8 Clerks Notice to Filer re #6 First MOTION for Leave to Appear . Attorney/Representative: Paul M. Woodson. Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see [de#7]. It is not necessary to refile this document. (cqs)
October 18, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance (for image see DE#6) by Paul Martin Woodson on behalf of The Shul Of Bal Harbour (cqs)
October 18, 2019 Filing 6 First MOTION for Leave to Appear . Attorney/Representative: Paul M. Woodson by The Shul Of Bal Harbour. Attorney Paul Martin Woodson added to party The Shul Of Bal Harbour(pty:dft). Responses due by 11/1/2019 (Woodson, Paul) Modified on 10/18/2019 (cqs).
October 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 10/18/2019. See attached document for full details. (dq)
October 17, 2019 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 4 [order] restricted/sealed until further notice. (ch1)
October 17, 2019 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE that attorney Paul Martin Woodson has not been added to this case re #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),. For further information, please contact Attorney Admissions at 305-523-5265. (pt)
October 16, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds)
October 16, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - MARC DE ST GEORGE ELKAIM ET AL VS CITY OF MIAMI ET AL) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12068933, filed by Alexandra Aubry, Grand Beach Hotel Surfside. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Plaintiff's Complaint filed in State Court)(Burton, Mark) Text Modified on 10/16/2019 (cds). No Answer/Motion To Dismiss Filed.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: De Saint George Elkaim et al v. City of Miami et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Erna De Saint George Elkaim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc De Saint George Elkaim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Esther De Saint George Elkaim
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Shul Of Bal Harbour
Represented By: Paul Martin Woodson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alexandra Aubry
Represented By: Mark C. Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Surfside Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Town of Surfside
Represented By: Michael Ross Piper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grand Beach Hotel Surfside
Represented By: Mark C. Burton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Miami
Represented By: Douglas Andrew Harrison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sholom Dovber Lipskar
Represented By: Paul Martin Woodson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jay Matelis
Represented By: Michael Ross Piper
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?