Gallardo v. Ford Motor Company
Plaintiff: Joseph Gallardo, Cody Vasquez, Joseph Warrington, Robert Booth, Nicole Lucero, Frances Pino, Kevin Pocalyko, Shawn Murray, Joyce D. Looney, Robert Bradfield, Frances Neff, Nicholas Thelen, Michele Pacitto, Akram Takatri, Jacq Robinson, Joshua Johnson, Terry Dalby, Dennis Smith, Kayla Griego, Christopher Ramee, Michael J. Crane, Sr., Joan Anderson, Maureen P Owens, Ana Gamboa, Manuel Pino, Gamez Martinez, Robert Morin, Mark Fuller, Dennis Brandt, Evelyn Davith, Nicholas Pocalyko, Desiree Hillyer, Robert Bisby, Lauren Vasquez, Dennis Washington, Curtis Archibald, Richard Davis, Jarod Stone, William Benjamin Kerr, Chris Engle, Babette Andre, Samya Alves, Al Eide, Jay Fields, Raymond Navarrette, Antonio Greene, Steven Groth, Daniel Chavez, Cheryl Miller, Lawrence Lovato, Adrian A Tapiz, Cleofos B. Romero, Marylin Chuchuru, Sarah Langlais and Robert Fisher
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv24326
Filed: October 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Federico A Moreno
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 2301
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2020 Filing 25 CLERK'S NOTICE of REMANDING Case 1:19-24326-FAM/CO C.A. No. 1:19-02686 Gallardo v. Ford Motor Company pursuant to ( 3793 in 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 24 in 1:19-cv-24326-FAM) CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER. (mc)
March 13, 2020 Filing 24 CONDITIONAL REMAND ORDER (FLS C.A. No. 1:19-24980/ALS C.A. No. 1:19-00911 Bass et al v. Ford Motor Company; FLS C.A. No. 1:19-25056/ARE C.A. No. 4:19-00808 Green et al v. Ford Motor Company; FLS C.A. No. 1:19-24734/AZ C.A. No. 2:19-05350 Churilla et al v. Ford Motor Company; FLS C.A. No. 1:19-24326/CO C.A. No. 1:19-02686 Gallardo v. Ford Motor Company; FLS C.A. No. 1:19-24685/CT C.A. No. 3:19-01565 Esposito et al v. Ford Motor Company; FLS C.A. No. 1:19-24735/FLN C.A. No. 4:19-00500 Doyle et al v. Ford Motor Company; FLS C.A. No. 1:19-24327/ GAN C.A. No. 1:19-04196 Harper et al v. Ford Motor Company; FLS C.A. No. 1:19-24737/ILN C.A. No. 1:19-06686 Davis v. Ford Motor Company; FLS C.A. No. 1:19-25002/INS C.A. No. 4:19-00227 Arvin v. Ford Motor Company; FLS C.A. No. 1:19-24237/MA C.A. No. 1:19-11877 Crehan et al v. Ford Motor Company; FLS C.A. No. 1:19-24800/MD C.A. No. 1:19-02974 DuPreez et al. v. Ford Motor Company; FLS C.A. No. 1:19-25205/MIE C.A. No. 2:19-13368 Powell v. Ford Motor Company; FLS C.A. No. 1:19-24791/MOE C.A. No. 4:19-02751 Reed, et al. v. Ford Motor Company; FLS C.A. No. 1:19-25006/MSS C.A. No. 3:19-00780 Allen et al v. Ford Motor Company; FLS C.A. No. 1:19-24799/NE C.A. No. 8:19-00446 Coffman et al v. Ford Motor Company; FLS C.A. No. 1:19-24241/NJ C.A. No. 2:19-17837 Abi-Hanna et al v. Ford Motor Company; FLS C.A. No. 1:19-24807/NYS C.A. No. 7:19-09188 Senitta Jr v. Ford Motor Company; FLS C.A. No. 1:19-24422/OHN C.A. No. 1:19-02234 Mastroberti v. Ford Motor Company; FLS C.A. No. 1:19-24815/OKW C.A. No. 5:19-00941 Henderson v. Ford Motor Company; FLS C.A. No. 1:19-24447/PAE C.A. No. 2:19-04512 McDaid v. Ford Motor Company; FLS C.A. No. 1:19-24329/TXW C.A. No. 1:19-00907 Heuss v. Ford Motor Company; FLS C.A. No. 1:20-20387/UT C.A. No. 1:19-00149 George et al v. Ford Motor Company; FLS C.A. No. 1:19-24816/WIE C.A. No. 2:19-01485 Milton Childs, et al. v. Ford Motor Company) re: MDL 2599. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, pursuant to Rule 10.4(a), the parties shall furnish the Clerk of the Southern District of Florida with a stipulation or designation of the contents of the record to be remanded. (Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel). (mc)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting ( 3622 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1480 in case 1:14-cv-24009-FAM) Defendant Ford Motor Company's Motion for Suggestion of Remand. The Court respectfully suggests to the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation that the above-named case be remanded to the United States District Court for the District of Colorado. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 2/28/2020. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:19-cv-24326-FAM. See attached document for full details. (mc)
February 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Staying Case, Closing Case for Statistical Purposes, and Placing Matter in a Civil Suspense File. Case No. 19-24326-CV-MORENO is STAYED. All future pleadings shall be filed under both Case No. 14-24009-CV-MORENO and Master File No. 15-2599-MD-MORENO. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 2/7/2020. See attached document for full details. This Document relates to: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM, 1:19-cv-24326-FAM (pes)
February 7, 2020 Case Stayed per DE #22 . Closing Case. (pes)
January 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE REGARDING FORD OPT-OUT LITIGATION STATUS CONFERENCE SET FOR JANUARY 23, 2020 re ( 3585 in case 1:15-md-02599-FAM) Order Setting Status Conference Regarding the Class Opt-Out Litigation against Ford Motor Company. This Notice advises that the status conference relates to these individual cases: 1:19-cv-24237-FAM, 1:19-cv-24241-FAM, 1:19-cv-24326-FAM, 1:19-cv-24327-FAM, 1:19-cv-24329-FAM, 1:19-cv-24422-FAM, 1:19-cv-24447-FAM, 1:19-cv-24685-FAM, 1:19-cv-24734-FAM, 1:19-cv-24735-FAM, 1:19-cv-24737-FAM, 1:19-cv-24791-FAM, 1:19-cv-24799-FAM, 1:19-cv-24800-FAM, 1:19-cv-24807-FAM, 1:19-cv-24815-FAM, 1:19-cv-24816-FAM, 1:19-cv-24980-FAM, 1:19-cv-25002-FAM, 1:19-cv-25006-FAM, 1:19-cv-25056-FAM, 1:19-cv-25205-FAM. (Status Conference Regarding Class Opt-Out Litigation against Defendant Ford Motor Company set for 1/23/2020 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Federico A. Moreno). Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 1/22/2020. See attached document for full details. Associated Cases: 1:15-md-02599-FAM, 1:14-cv-24009-FAM (mc)
December 6, 2019 Filing 20 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Henry Salas on behalf of Ford Motor Company. Attorney Henry Salas added to party Ford Motor Company(pty:dft). (Salas, Henry)
December 6, 2019 Filing 19 RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re #16 Order to Show Cause by Ford Motor Company. (Dominguez, Brian)
December 6, 2019 Filing 18 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian A Dominguez on behalf of Ford Motor Company (Dominguez, Brian)
December 6, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brian A Dominguez on behalf of Ford Motor Company. Attorney Brian A Dominguez added to party Ford Motor Company(pty:dft). (Dominguez, Brian)
November 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE REGARDING ADMISSION TO PRACTICE. Response due 12/6/2019. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 11/20/2019. See attached document for full details. (km02)
October 21, 2019 Filing 15 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction re 14 MDL Case Receipt. Filed in Wrong Case; Docket text modified. Refiled in correct case # 19-cv-24327. (pes)
October 21, 2019 Filing 14 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction re 14 MDL Case Receipt. Filed in Wrong Case; Docket text modified. See DE 15 Modified on 10/23/2019 (pes).
October 21, 2019 Filing 13 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from District of Colorado. Case Number 1:19-cv-02686 with documents 1-9. Assigned FLSD Case Number 1:19-cv-24326-FAM on 10/21/2019 Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:15-md-02599-FAM. (pes)
October 21, 2019 Filing 12 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Sammantha Jeannine Tillotson, mailing date October 21, 2019, (pt)
October 21, 2019 Filing 11 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Federico A. Moreno. (pes)
October 21, 2019 Filing 10 Case transferred in from Colorado; Case Number 1:19-cv-02686. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(pes).
October 17, 2019 Filing 9 CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-85) from the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407, transferring from the District of Colorado 19-cv-02686 NYW, to the Southern District of Florida, to become part of MDL 2599, by Clerk on 10/17/2019. (evana, )
October 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #7 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer or Otherwise Respond by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 10/15/2019. To the extent the Motion requests specific extensions dependent on the outcome of pending multi-district litigation to which this case has been conditionally transferred, the Motion is DENIED in part as moot. Once a certified copy of the Conditional Transfer Order is received and docketed by the Clerk's Office, the case will no longer be before the presiding judge. Nevertheless, the Motion is GRANTED in part the Motion insofar as the Parties' are concerned that the current answer/response deadline will lapse before the instant docket is terminated. Accordingly, Defendant Ford Motor Company's deadline to answer or otherwise respond is extended to 11/21/2019. Text Only Entry(nywlc1, )
October 9, 2019 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer or Otherwise Respond by Defendant Ford Motor Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 Excerpts from Ford Motor Companys Notice of Potential Tag-Along Action, #2 Proposed Order (PDF Only))(Tillotson, Sammantha)
October 3, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Joseph Gallardo. Ford Motor Company served on 9/30/2019, answer due 10/21/2019. (Lemberg, Sergei)
September 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang on 090/27/19 Setting Scheduling/Planning Conference and Setting Deadline for Filing of Consent/Nonconsent Form. Consent Form due by 11/21/2019. Proposed Scheduling Order due by 11/28/2019. Scheduling/Planning Conference set for 12/5/2019 09:30 AM in Courtroom A 502 before Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. (nmarb, )
September 20, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS issued by Clerk. (Attachments: #1 Magistrate Judge Consent Form) (rvill, )
September 20, 2019 Filing 3 Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Nina Y. Wang. Text Only Entry. (rvill, )
September 19, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS REQUEST as to Ford Motor Company by Plaintiff Joseph Gallardo. (Lemberg, Sergei)
September 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Ford Motor Company (Filing fee $ 400,Receipt Number 1082-6903300)Attorney Sergei Lemberg added to party Joseph Gallardo(pty:pla), filed by Joseph Gallardo. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lemberg, Sergei)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gallardo v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Gallardo
Represented By: Sergei Lemberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cody Vasquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Warrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Booth
Represented By: Sergei Lemberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicole Lucero
Represented By: Sergei Lemberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frances Pino
Represented By: Sergei Lemberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Pocalyko
Represented By: Sergei Lemberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shawn Murray
Represented By: Sergei Lemberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce D. Looney
Represented By: Sergei Lemberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Bradfield
Represented By: Sergei Lemberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frances Neff
Represented By: Sergei Lemberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Thelen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michele Pacitto
Represented By: Sergei Lemberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Akram Takatri
Represented By: Sergei Lemberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jacq Robinson
Represented By: Sergei Lemberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joshua Johnson
Represented By: Sergei Lemberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Dalby
Represented By: Sergei Lemberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Smith
Represented By: Sergei Lemberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kayla Griego
Represented By: Sergei Lemberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christopher Ramee
Represented By: Sergei Lemberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael J. Crane, Sr.
Represented By: Sergei Lemberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan Anderson
Represented By: Sergei Lemberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maureen P Owens
Represented By: Sergei Lemberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ana Gamboa
Represented By: Sergei Lemberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manuel Pino
Represented By: Sergei Lemberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gamez Martinez
Represented By: Sergei Lemberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Morin
Represented By: Sergei Lemberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mark Fuller
Represented By: Sergei Lemberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Brandt
Represented By: Sergei Lemberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Evelyn Davith
Represented By: Sergei Lemberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicholas Pocalyko
Represented By: Sergei Lemberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Desiree Hillyer
Represented By: Sergei Lemberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Bisby
Represented By: Sergei Lemberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lauren Vasquez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dennis Washington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Curtis Archibald
Represented By: Sergei Lemberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Davis
Represented By: Sergei Lemberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jarod Stone
Represented By: Sergei Lemberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Benjamin Kerr
Represented By: Sergei Lemberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Engle
Represented By: Sergei Lemberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Babette Andre
Represented By: Sergei Lemberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samya Alves
Represented By: Sergei Lemberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Al Eide
Represented By: Sergei Lemberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jay Fields
Represented By: Sergei Lemberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raymond Navarrette
Represented By: Sergei Lemberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Greene
Represented By: Sergei Lemberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Groth
Represented By: Sergei Lemberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Chavez
Represented By: Sergei Lemberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cheryl Miller
Represented By: Sergei Lemberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Lovato
Represented By: Sergei Lemberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrian A Tapiz
Represented By: Sergei Lemberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cleofos B. Romero
Represented By: Sergei Lemberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marylin Chuchuru
Represented By: Sergei Lemberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sarah Langlais
Represented By: Sergei Lemberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robert Fisher
Represented By: Sergei Lemberg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Represented By: Sammantha Jeannine Tillotson
Represented By: Brian A Dominguez
Represented By: Henry Salas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?