Barrios et al v. McAleenan et al
Plaintiff: Javier Barrios and Liliana Mariela Pato
Defendant: Michael W. Meade, Acting Director Kenneth T Cuccinelli, Act. Sec. Dept. DHS Kevin K McAleenan, Service Center Director, USCIS Nebraska Service Center, Acting Director Matthew T Albence and Regional Director, for the U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services Southeast Region
Case Number: 1:2019cv24407
Filed: October 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Office: Miami Office
Presiding Judge: Robert N Scola
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:1651
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Anthony Richard Dominguez on behalf of Javier Barrios, Liliana Mariela Pato (Dominguez, Anthony)
November 15, 2019 Filing 12 TRANSCRIPT of emergency motion for temporary restraining order held on 10/25/19 before Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr, 1-21 pages, Court Reporter: Tammy Nestor, 305-523-5148 / Tammy_Nestor@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 12/6/2019. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 12/16/2019. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 2/13/2020. (tnr)
November 8, 2019 Civil Case Terminated. Per #8 Order. Closing Case. (sk)
November 1, 2019 Filing 11 Acknowledgment of Receipt of NOA from USCA re #9 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, filed by Liliana Mariela Pato, Javier Barrios. Date received by USCA: 10/30/2019. USCA Case Number: 19-14331-J. (apz)
October 30, 2019 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Javier Barrios, Liliana Mariela Pato re #1 Application/Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus,, #3 Summons Issued as to USA, (Prada, Mark)
October 30, 2019 Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Order under appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #9 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, Notice has been electronically mailed. (apz)
October 29, 2019 Filing 9 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal as to #8 Order on Emergency Motion with Certification of Emergency by Javier Barrios, Liliana Mariela Pato. Filing fee $ 505.00 receipt number 113C-12105604. Within fourteen days of the filing date of a Notice of Appeal, the appellant must complete the Eleventh Circuit Transcript Order Form regardless of whether transcripts are being ordered [Pursuant to FRAP 10(b)]. For information go to our FLSD website under Transcript Information. (Prada, Mark)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER denying #4 the Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order or a Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. See attached document for full details. (dka)
October 25, 2019 Filing 7 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr: Motion Hearing held on 10/25/2019 re #4 Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Liliana Mariela Pato, and Javier Barrios. Court order to follow. Total time in court: 32 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): AUSA John C. Spaccarotella, Anthony Richard Dominguez, and Mark Andrew Prada. Court Reporter: Tammy Nestor, 305-523-5148 / Tammy_Nestor@flsd.uscourts.gov. (jh)
October 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by John C. Spaccarotella on behalf of Matthew T Albence, Kenneth T Cuccinelli, Kevin K McAleenan, Michael W. Meade, Regional Director, for the U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services Southeast Region, Service Center Director, USCIS Nebraska Service Center. Attorney John C. Spaccarotella added to party Matthew T Albence(pty:dft), Attorney John C. Spaccarotella added to party Kenneth T Cuccinelli(pty:dft), Attorney John C. Spaccarotella added to party Kevin K McAleenan(pty:dft), Attorney John C. Spaccarotella added to party Michael W. Meade(pty:dft), Attorney John C. Spaccarotella added to party Regional Director, for the U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services Southeast Region(pty:dft), Attorney John C. Spaccarotella added to party Service Center Director, USCIS Nebraska Service Center(pty:dft). (Spaccarotella, John)
October 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER Setting a Hearing on the Plaintiffs' Emergency Motion for a Temporary Restraining Order at 3:00 P.M. on October 25, 2019. Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. See attached document for full details. (dka)
October 25, 2019 Filing 4 EMERGENCY MOTION with Certification of Emergency included ; Emergency Motion for Temporary Restraining Order by Javier Barrios, Liliana Mariela Pato. Responses due by 11/8/2019 (Attachments: #1 Certification Certification of Emergency, #2 Exhibit Order Staying Removal, Camarena v. Director, No. 19-13446 (CA11 Sept. 23, 2019))(Dominguez, Anthony)
October 25, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Matthew T Albence, Kenneth T Cuccinelli, Kevin K McAleenan, Michael W. Meade, Regional Director, for the U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services Southeast Region, Service Center Director, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (mee)
October 25, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. (mee)
October 25, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION/PETITION (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241 . Filing fee $ 5.00 receipt number 113C-12094627, filed by Liliana Mariela Pato, Javier Barrios. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Supplement Notice of Related Case, #3 Summon(s) Summons, #4 Exhibit A - OSUP documents, #5 Exhibit B- I-130 Application, #6 Exhibit C, I - Stay of Removal, #7 Exhibit C, II - Stay of Removal, #8 Exhibit C, III - Stay of Removal, #9 Exhibit C, IV - Stay of Removal, #10 Exhibit D - Denial of I-246 Stay of Removal, #11 Exhibit E - Plane Ticket for Departure on October 25, 2019)(Dominguez, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Barrios et al v. McAleenan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael W. Meade
Represented By: Noticing 2254 SAG Miami-Dade/Monroe
Represented By: John C. Spaccarotella
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Director Kenneth T Cuccinelli
Represented By: Noticing 2254 SAG Miami-Dade/Monroe
Represented By: John C. Spaccarotella
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Act. Sec. Dept. DHS Kevin K McAleenan
Represented By: Noticing 2254 SAG Miami-Dade/Monroe
Represented By: John C. Spaccarotella
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Service Center Director, USCIS Nebraska Service Center
Represented By: Noticing 2254 SAG Miami-Dade/Monroe
Represented By: John C. Spaccarotella
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Director Matthew T Albence
Represented By: Noticing 2254 SAG Miami-Dade/Monroe
Represented By: John C. Spaccarotella
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regional Director, for the U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services Southeast Region
Represented By: Noticing 2254 SAG Miami-Dade/Monroe
Represented By: John C. Spaccarotella
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Javier Barrios
Represented By: Anthony Richard Dominguez
Represented By: Mark Andrew Prada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liliana Mariela Pato
Represented By: Anthony Richard Dominguez
Represented By: Mark Andrew Prada
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?