Vreeland II v. Pruitt et al
Plaintiff: Delmart E.J.M. Vreeland II
Defendant: State of Florida and Scott Pruitt
Case Number: 1:2019cv24460
Filed: October 29, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Darrin P Gayles
Referring Judge: Lisette M Reid
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 27, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 27, 2019 Filing 7 PAPERLESS Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid/Case Closed by the District Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 11/27/2019. (br)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER ADOPTING #5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS re. Certificate of Appealability: No Ruling. This case shall be Transferred to the Middle District of Florida for all further proceedings. Closing Case. Motions terminated: #5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on 28 USC 2254 case re #1 Application/Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Delmart E.J.M. Vreeland II Recommending that this petition for writ of habeas corpus be transferred to the Middle District of F. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles on 11/25/2019. See attached document for full details. (lk)
November 5, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on 28 USC 2254 case re #1 Application/Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus filed by Delmart E.J.M. Vreeland II;' Recommending that this petition for writ of habeas corpus be transferred to the Middle District of Florida, as it is the appropriate venue. Objections to R&R due by 11/19/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 11/5/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
October 30, 2019 Filing 4 Clerks Notice of Receipt of Filing Fee received on 10/30/2019 in the amount of $ 5.00, receipt number FLS100197167. (vt)
October 29, 2019 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM and Argument in Support of Petition for Habeas Corpus re #1 Application/Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus by Delmart E.J.M. Vreeland II. (mee)
October 29, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles and Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2019-2, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (mee)
October 29, 2019 Filing 1 APPLICATION/PETITION (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254. Filing fee $ 5.00. NOT PAID/NO IFP., filed by Delmart E.J.M. Vreeland II. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(mee)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vreeland II v. Pruitt et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Florida
Represented By: Noticing 2254 SAG Miami-Dade/Monroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Pruitt
Represented By: Noticing 2254 SAG Miami-Dade/Monroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Delmart E.J.M. Vreeland II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?