Beaver v. Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston
Plaintiff: David Beaver
Defendant: Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston and Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston
Case Number: 1:2019cv24503
Filed: October 31, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Ursula Ungaro
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 26, 2019 Filing 13 Joint NOTICE of Mediator Selection. Selected/Added David Beaver, Richard Lord as Mediator. (Palamara, Alexander)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 12/10/2019. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL Amended Pleadings due by 1/10/2020. Discovery due by 5/15/2020. Expert Discovery due by 5/15/2020. Fact Discovery due by 5/15/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 1/10/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 6/5/2020. Motions due by 6/5/2020. Joint Pretrial Stipulation due by 6/26/2020. Jury Trial set for 8/17/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Calendar Call set for 8/12/2020 01:00 PM before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Pretrial Conference set for 7/31/2020 11:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 12/10/2019. See attached document for full details. (ebz) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
December 6, 2019 Filing 10 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by David Beaver (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Palamara, Alexander)
December 2, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint by Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston, Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston. Attorney Lee Warren Marcus added to party Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston(pty:dft), Attorney Lee Warren Marcus added to party Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston(pty:dft). (Marcus, Lee)
November 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PLANNING AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE Joint Planning and Scheduling Report due by 12/6/2019 Initial Planning and Scheduling Conference set for 12/20/2019 11:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 11/13/2019. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
November 13, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #4 Amended Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by David Beaver. Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston served on 11/7/2019, answer due 11/29/2019. (Palamara, Alexander)
November 4, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston. (jas)
November 4, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by David Beaver (Attachments: #1 Summon(s)) (Palamara, Alexander)
November 4, 2019 Filing 4 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston, filed by David Beaver.(Palamara, Alexander)
October 31, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. (ebz)
October 31, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Ursula Ungaro. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ebz)
October 31, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12111562, filed by David Beaver. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Exhibit)(Palamara, Alexander)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beaver v. Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Life Assurance Company of Boston
Represented By: Lee Warren Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lincoln Life Assurance Company of Boston
Represented By: Lee Warren Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Beaver
Represented By: Alexander Arthur Palamara
Represented By: Gregory Michael Dell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?