Heinrich v. General Star Indemnity Company
Plaintiff: Diana Sredni Heinrich
Defendant: General Star Indemnity Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv24534
Filed: November 1, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Jose E Martinez
Referring Judge: Alicia M Otazo-Reyes
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 4, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2019 Filing 14 NOTICE by General Star Indemnity Company Notice of Filing State Court Record (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Docket, #2 Exhibit Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Exhibit Complaint, #4 Exhibit Plaintiff's First Set of Interrogatories, #5 Exhibit Plaintiff's Request for Production, #6 Exhibit Plaintiff's Deposition Request, #7 Exhibit Summons, #8 Exhibit Return of Service, #9 Exhibit Notice of Appearance and Email, #10 Exhibit Notice of Filing Notice of Removal) (Carlton, Stephanie)
December 4, 2019 Filing 13 STATUS REPORT Removal Status Report by General Star Indemnity Company (Carlton, Stephanie)
November 27, 2019 Filing 12 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by General Star Indemnity Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Election to Jurisdiction by Magistrate)(Carlton, Stephanie)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER SETTING CIVIL TRIAL DATE AND PRETRIAL SCHEDULE: ( Jury Trial set for 10/26/2020 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Jose E. Martinez., Calendar Call set for 10/22/2020 01:30 PM in Miami Division before Judge Jose E. Martinez.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. ( Mediation Deadline 8/27/2020.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 11/25/2019. See attached document for full details. (drz) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
November 22, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal by General Star Indemnity Company. (Carlton, Stephanie)
November 22, 2019 Filing 9 Initial Disclosure(s) of Rule 26 (A)(1)(A) by Diana Sredni Heinrich (Goldglantz, Joseph)
November 22, 2019 Filing 8 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Diana Sredni Heinrich identifying Corporate Parent Peoples Insurance Claim Center, Inc. for Diana Sredni Heinrich (Goldglantz, Joseph)
November 13, 2019 Filing 7 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Star Indemnity Company identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway Inc., Corporate Parent General Re Corporation, Corporate Parent General Reinsurance Corporation for General Star Indemnity Company (Bergman, Ira)
November 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #5 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint. Defendant shall respond on or before November 22, 2019. All other deadlines shall remain unaffected. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 11/8/2019. (kml)
November 7, 2019 Filing 5 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer by General Star Indemnity Company. (Carlton, Stephanie)
November 4, 2019 Filing 4 Notice of Court Practice in Removal Cases. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 11/4/2019. See attached document for full details. (dq)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 11/4/2019. See attached document for full details. (dq)
November 1, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds)
November 1, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Complaint) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12115276, filed by General Star Indemnity Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit "A" - State Court Action, #3 Exhibit "B" - Miami-Dade Property Appraiser, #4 Exhibit "C" - DE DOS, Division of Corporations, #5 Exhibit "D" - FLOIR Website, #6 Exhibit "E" - Demand Letter)(Carlton, Stephanie) Text Modified on 11/1/2019 (cds). No Answer/Motion To Dismiss Filed.

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heinrich v. General Star Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Star Indemnity Company
Represented By: Ira S. Bergman
Represented By: Stephanie Hope Carlton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diana Sredni Heinrich
Represented By: Matthew R. Gelber
Represented By: Joseph Benjamin Goldglantz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?