Culda et al v. Department of Homeland Security et al
Plaintiff: HT International Exhibitions, LLC. and Dorin Cosmin Culda
Defendant: Acting Director, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Director, USCIS California Service Center, Acting Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security and Department of Homeland Security
Case Number: 1:2019cv24590
Filed: November 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Darrin P Gayles
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 05:0551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Set/Reset Answer Due Deadline: 1/24/2020 as to Defendants. SEE DE 9 ORDER (ail)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER vacating 18 Notice of Court Practice. Defendants shall respond to Plaintiff's Complaint on or before January 24, 2020. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (bfk)
December 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 **VACATED** NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE ON DEFAULT PROCEDURE. Plaintiff effectuated service of the summons and complaint on Defendants on November 25, 2019 [ECF No. 7]. Defendants, however, have failed to plead or otherwise defend this action after being served with process. Accordingly, within five (5) days of the date of this Order, Plaintiff shall file for entry of default by the Clerk as to the Defendants. Within ten (10) days of entry of default by the Clerk, Plaintiff shall file a motion for final default judgment, accompanied by a proposed final default judgment attached to the motion as Exhibit A, and duly supported by affidavits and other documentation. Plaintiffs failure to file a Motion for Final Default Judgment on or before the date set forth above may result in dismissal of the instant action. Plaintiff shall immediately provide Defendants with a copy of this Order via certified mail. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (bfk) Text Modified on 12/19/2019 per DE 9 Order(ail).
November 25, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed by Dorin Cosmin Culda, HT International Exhibitions, LLC.. All Defendants. (Hassine, Ariel)
November 14, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Natalie Diaz on behalf of Acting Director, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Acting Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Department of Homeland Security, Director, USCIS California Service Center. Attorney Natalie Diaz added to party Acting Director, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services(pty:dft), Attorney Natalie Diaz added to party Acting Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security (pty:dft), Attorney Natalie Diaz added to party Department of Homeland Security(pty:dft), Attorney Natalie Diaz added to party Director, USCIS California Service Center(pty:dft). (Diaz, Natalie)
November 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE. Unless otherwise specified by the Court, every motion shall be double-spaced in Times New Roman 12-point typeface. Multiple Plaintiffs or Defendants shall file joint motions with co-parties unless there are clear conflicts of position. If conflicts of position exist, parties shall explain the conflicts in their separate motions. Failure to comply with ANY of these procedures may result in the imposition of appropriate sanctions, including but not limited to, the striking of the motion or dismissal of this action. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (bfk)
November 7, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Dorin Cosmin Culda, HT International Exhibitions, LLC. (Hassine, Ariel)
November 6, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Acting Director, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services, Acting Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security, Department of Homeland Security, Director, USCIS California Service Center, U.S. Attorney. (jas)
November 6, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jas)
November 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12125441, filed by Dorin Cosmin Culda, HT International Exhibitions, LLC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s), #5 Summon(s), #6 Summon(s), #7 Exhibit List, #8 Exhibit 1, #9 Exhibit 2)(Hassine, Ariel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Culda et al v. Department of Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: HT International Exhibitions, LLC.
Represented By: Connor Throckmorton
Represented By: Ariel Hassine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorin Cosmin Culda
Represented By: Ariel Hassine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Director, United States Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Natalie Diaz
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director, USCIS California Service Center
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Represented By: Natalie Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Acting Secretary, U.S. Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Natalie Diaz
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Natalie Diaz
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?