Pinero v. PLAZA YI, LLC
Plaintiff: Emilio Pinero
Defendant: PLAZA YI, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv24697
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Paul C Huck
Referring Judge: Chris M McAliley
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12182
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S SECOND MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT, granting #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document PLAZA YI, LLC. Answer due 2/7/2020. Re: #1 Complaint filed by Emilio Pinero. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 1/9/2020. See attached document for full details. (mee)
January 8, 2020 Filing 13 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by PLAZA YI, LLC. (Widom, Glenn)
December 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER ON DEFENDANT'S UNOPPOSED RENEWED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT,granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document PLAZA YI, LLC. Answer due 1/8/2020. Re: #1 Complaint filed by Emilio Pinero. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 12/12/2019. See attached document for full details. (mee)
December 11, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Glenn R Goldstein on behalf of Emilio Pinero. Attorney Glenn R Goldstein added to party Emilio Pinero(pty:pla). (Goldstein, Glenn)
December 11, 2019 Filing 10 PAPERLESS NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 12/12/2019 09:00 AM before Senior Judge Paul C. Huck. Counsel are instructed to take the following steps shortly before the scheduled hearing time so that the telephonic hearing may begin promptly: Call the Toll-Free Number: 1-888-684-8852. Enter the access code, 4825076, followed by the # sign. Enter the security code, 332010468, followed by the # sign. State your name and enter the conference. For clarity, please do not use a cell phone or a speaker phone. For technical assistance, please call 800-526-2655. (rbn)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING CIVIL NON-JURY TRIAL DATE AND PRETRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION AND REFERRING CERTAIN MOTIONS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Calendar Call set for 5/5/2020 at 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Senior Judge Paul C. Huck., Bench Trial set for 5/11/2020 in Miami Division before Senior Judge Paul C. Huck.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation., ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Chris McAliley for Discovery Matters. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 12/10/2019. See attached document for full details. (mee)
December 9, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by PLAZA YI, LLC. Attorney Glenn Laurence Widom added to party PLAZA YI, LLC(pty:dft). (Widom, Glenn)
November 27, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Compliance by Emilio Pinero re #4 Order (Wassenberg, Lauren)
November 27, 2019 Filing 6 Statement of: Claim by Emilio Pinero re #4 Order (Wassenberg, Lauren)
November 15, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #4 Order Prior Filings Under the ADA by Lauren Nicole Wassenberg on behalf of Emilio Pinero (Wassenberg, Lauren)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF COURT-MANDATED REQUIREMENTS IN AMERICANS WITH DISABILITIES ACT CASES. Signed by Senior Judge Paul C. Huck on 11/14/2019. See attached document for full details. (mee)
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to PLAZA YI, LLC. (mee)
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Senior Judge Paul C. Huck. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Chris M. McAliley is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (mee)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against PLAZA YI, LLC. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12143869, filed by Emilio Pinero. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Wassenberg, Lauren)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pinero v. PLAZA YI, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emilio Pinero
Represented By: Lauren Nicole Wassenberg
Represented By: Glenn R Goldstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PLAZA YI, LLC
Represented By: Glenn Laurence Widom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?