Ariza v. T.M.C. Import & Export Company, L.L.C.
Plaintiff: Victor Ariza
Defendant: T.M.C. Import & Export Company, L.L.C.
Case Number: 1:2019cv24698
Filed: November 13, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Ursula Ungaro
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 10, 2020 Filing 13 Plaintiff's NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Selected/Added Robert A. Dulberg as Mediator. Mediation Hearing set for 3/13/2020 at 10:00 a.m.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hannah, Roderick)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 12/26/2019. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
December 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL: Amended Pleadings due by 1/17/2020. Discovery due by 3/27/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 1/17/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 4/17/2020. Motions due by 4/17/2020. Pretrial Stipulation due by 5/1/2020. Jury Trial set for 7/6/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Calendar Call set for 7/1/2020 01:00 PM before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Pretrial Conference set for 6/19/2020 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 12/26/2019. See attached document for full details. (pcs) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
December 20, 2019 Filing 10 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Victor Ariza (Hannah, Roderick)
December 19, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Compliance with Initial Planning and Scheduling Order by Victor Ariza (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Hannah, Roderick)
December 17, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by T.M.C. Import & Export Company, L.L.C.. (Weiss, Jonathan)
December 17, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan Ross Weiss on behalf of T.M.C. Import & Export Company, L.L.C.. Attorney Jonathan Ross Weiss added to party T.M.C. Import & Export Company, L.L.C.(pty:dft). (Weiss, Jonathan)
December 3, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PLANNING AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE (Scheduling Conference set for 1/3/2020 11:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro, Joint Scheduling Report due by 12/20/2019) Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 12/2/2019. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
December 2, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Victor Ariza. T.M.C. Import & Export Company, L.L.C. served on 11/26/2019, answer due 12/17/2019. (Hannah, Roderick)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER dismissing Count II of Plaintiffs complaint. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 11/25/2019. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
November 13, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to T.M.C. Import & Export Company, L.L.C.. (amb)
November 13, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Ursula Ungaro. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb)
November 13, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against T.M.C. Import & Export Company, L.L.C.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12143947, filed by Victor Ariza. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Summon(s))(Hannah, Roderick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ariza v. T.M.C. Import & Export Company, L.L.C.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T.M.C. Import & Export Company, L.L.C.
Represented By: Jonathan Ross Weiss
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Ariza
Represented By: Roderick Victor Hannah
Represented By: Pelayo M. Duran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?