Chapman v. Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Kimberly Chapman
Defendant: Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv24716
Filed: November 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Becerra
Referring Judge: James Lawrence King
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Discovery due by 12/30/2020., Motions due by 1/4/2021., Pretrial Stipulation due by 2/26/2021., Calendar Call set for 5/6/2021 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Senior Judge James Lawrence King., Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/5/2021 11:45 AM in Miami Division before Senior Judge James Lawrence King., Bench Trial set for 5/10/2021 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Senior Judge James Lawrence King. All hearings to be held before Judge King will be held in Courtroom II, Eleventh Floor.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra for Discovery Matters. Signed by Senior Judge James Lawrence King on 12/19/2019. See attached document for full details. (jw)
December 18, 2019 Filing 7 Defendant's Corporate Disclosure Statement by Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Tokio Marine Holdings Inc for Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company (Suarez, Tanya)
December 17, 2019 Filing 6 First RESPONSE to #5 Answer to Complaint,, Counterclaim, by Kimberly Chapman. (Jessup, Stephen)
December 17, 2019 Filing 5 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint , COUNTERCLAIM against Kimberly Chapman by Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company. Attorney Tanya Irene Suarez added to party Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company(pty:dft). (Suarez, Tanya)
December 9, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Kimberly Chapman. Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company served on 11/27/2019, answer due 12/18/2019. (Jessup, Stephen)
November 14, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company. (amb)
November 14, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Senior Judge James Lawrence King. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb)
November 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12146616, filed by Kimberly Chapman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Jessup, Stephen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chapman v. Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reliance Standard Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Tanya Irene Suarez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly Chapman
Represented By: Stephen Francis Jessup
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?