Del Signore v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Kenneth Del Signore
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv24725
Filed: November 14, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Referring Judge: Lauren Fleischer Louis
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1132
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 30, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Amended Pleadings due by 2/28/2020., Discovery due by 6/30/2020., Expert Discovery due by 6/30/2020., Joinder of Parties due by 2/28/2020., Mediation Deadline 7/14/2020., In Limine Motions due by 7/22/2020., Dispositive Motions due by 7/22/2020., Motions due by 7/22/2020., Pretrial Stipulation due by 10/13/2020., Jury Trial set for 10/26/2020 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom., Calendar Call set for 10/20/2020 01:45 PM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom., Mediation Deadline 7/14/2020.) Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 12/30/2019. See attached document for full details. (jao) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
December 27, 2019 Filing 8 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Kenneth Del Signore (Attachments: #1 Proposed Scheduling Order)(Ortiz, Nick)
December 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to Complaint by January 13, 2020. Re: #1 Complaint, filed by Kenneth Del Signore. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
December 9, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Attorney Jeannine Cline Jacobson added to party Metropolitan Life Insurance Company(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Jacobson, Jeannine)
November 15, 2019 Filing 5 Certificate of Other Affiliates by Kenneth Del Signore (Ortiz, Nick)
November 15, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 11/14/2019. See attached document for full details. (jao)
November 14, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. (jao)
November 14, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jao)
November 14, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Metropolitan Life Insurance Company. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12147765, filed by Kenneth Del Signore. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) Summons for Defendant Metropolitan Life Insurance Company)(Ortiz, Nick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Del Signore v. Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Del Signore
Represented By: Katelyn Louise Hauser
Represented By: Nick Anthony Ortiz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metropolitan Life Insurance Company
Represented By: Jeannine Cline Jacobson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?