Churilla et al v. Ford Motor Company
Plaintiff: Ida Gonzales, Zvonimir Burin, Daniel Detaranto, David Churilla, Judy Hooker, Danielle Stover, Stephanie Allen, Anthony Maple, Carole Kempermamm, Harold Hooker, Miron E Webster, Richard Berkheimer, Doren Gruenhagen, LeRoy White, Maria Weaver, Joyce Phillips, Walter Raub, Latoya Shallerhorn, Troy A Sickels, Susann Gage, Mike Lemonidis, Oscar Edwards, Edward Flowers, Maria De Leon, Luella Demond Wulzen, Laura Herzog, Porter Scott, Jack Harris, Michael Scotece, Diane O'Hara, Charles Eugene Wardell, Marcus Arriaga, Anthony Mendivil, Bruce Rogers, Winston Cummings, Carol M Webster, John Evans, Jon Weaver, Shirley Myles, Darri N Mugley, Alberto De Leon, Patricia Poindexter, Dale Powers and Chris Linn
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv24734
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Federico A Moreno
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 15:2301
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Filing 17 MDL Transfer In Case Receipt from District of Arizona. Case Number 2:19-cv-05350 with documents 1-13. Assigned FLSD Case Number 1:19-cv-24734-FAM on 11/15/2019. Re: FLSD MDL Case Number 1:15-md-02599-FAM. (mc)
November 15, 2019 Filing 16 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Trinette G. Kent, mailing date November 15, 2019, (pt)
November 15, 2019 Filing 15 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Federico A. Moreno. (mc)
November 15, 2019 Filing 14 Case transferred in from Arizona; Case Number 2:19-cv-05350. Electronic file including transfer order and docket sheet received. .(mc).
November 13, 2019 *Remark: Case Transferred to the Southern District of Florida via electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP) *NEF regenerated on 11/13/19 (SJF)
November 13, 2019 Filing 13 *CERTIFIED MDL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-88) Transferring Case to the Middle District of Florida Re MDL-2599. (MAP) *NEF regenerated on 11/13/19 (SJF)
November 5, 2019 Filing 12 NOTICE re: of Service by Stephanie Allen, Marcus Arriaga, Richard Berkheimer, Zvonimir Burin, David Churilla, Winston Cummings, Alberto De Leon, Maria De Leon, Daniel Detaranto, Oscar Edwards, John Evans, Edward Flowers, Susann Gage, Ida Gonzales, Doren Gruenhagen, Jack Harris, Laura Herzog, Harold Hooker, Judy Hooker, Carole Kempermamm, Mike Lemonidis, Chris Linn, Anthony Maple, Anthony Mendivil, Darri N Mugley, Shirley Myles, Diane O'Hara, Joyce Phillips, Patricia Poindexter, Dale Powers, Walter Raub, Bruce Rogers, Michael Scotece, Porter Scott, Latoya Shallerhorn, Troy A Sickels, Danielle Stover, Charles Eugene Wardell, Jon Weaver, Maria Weaver, Carol M Webster, Miron E Webster, LeRoy White, Luella Demond Wulzen . (Kent, Trinette)
November 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER that motions pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12(b) are discouraged if the defect can be cured by filing an amended pleading. The parties must meet and confer prior to the filing of such motions to determine whether it can be avoided. FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff(s) serve a copy of this Order upon Defendant(s) and file a notice of service. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Senior Judge Neil V Wake on 11/05/2019. (REK)
November 5, 2019 Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 3.7(b), a request has been received for a random reassignment of this case to a District Judge. FURTHER ORDERED Case reassigned by random draw to Judge Neil V. Wake. All further pleadings/papers should now list the following COMPLETE case number: CV-19-5350-PHX-NVW. FURTHER ORDERED that the Order to Show Cause Hearing scheduled for December 2, 2019 is hereby VACATED. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
November 4, 2019 Filing 9 Party Elects Assignment of Case to District Judge Jurisdiction. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order that Stephanie Allen, Marcus Arriaga, Richard Berkheimer, Zvonimir Burin, David Churilla, Winston Cummings, Alberto De Leon, Maria De Leon, Daniel Detaranto, Oscar Edwards, John Evans, Edward Flowers, Susann Gage, Ida Gonzales, Doren Gruenhagen, Jack Harris, Laura Herzog, Harold Hooker, Judy Hooker, Carole Kempermamm, Mike Lemonidis, Chris Linn, Anthony Maple, Anthony Mendivil, Darri N Mugley, Shirley Myles, Diane O'Hara, Joyce Phillips, Patricia Poindexter, Dale Powers, Walter Raub, Bruce Rogers, Michael Scotece, Porter Scott, Latoya Shallerhorn, Troy A Sickels, Danielle Stover, Charles Eugene Wardell, Jon Weaver, Maria Weaver, Carol M Webster, Miron E Webster, LeRoy White, Luella Demond Wulzen show cause for failure to comply with LRCiv 3.7(b) before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. Show Cause Hearing set for 12/2/2019 at 04:30 PM before Chief Judge G Murray Snow. (Attachments: #1 Instructions, #2 Consetn Form)(MAP)
October 25, 2019 Filing 6 *SERVICE EXECUTED filed by Stephanie Allen, Marcus Arriaga, Richard Berkheimer, Zvonimir Burin, David Churilla, Winston Cummings, Alberto De Leon, Maria De Leon, Daniel Detaranto, Oscar Edwards, John Evans, Edward Flowers, Susann Gage, Ida Gonzales, Doren Gruenhagen, Jack Harris, Laura Herzog, Harold Hooker, Judy Hooker, Carole Kempermamm, Mike Lemonidis, Chris Linn, Anthony Maple, Anthony Mendivil, Darri N Mugley, Shirley Myles, Diane O'Hara, Joyce Phillips, Patricia Poindexter, Dale Powers, Walter Raub, Bruce Rogers, Michael Scotece, Porter Scott, Latoya Shallerhorn, Troy A Sickels, Danielle Stover, Charles Eugene Wardell, Jon Weaver, Maria Weaver, Carol M Webster, Miron E Webster, LeRoy White, Luella Demond Wulzen: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 10/23/2019 to Kristine Gallardo for Ford Motor Company . (Kent, Trinette) *Modified text on 10/28/2019 (EJA).
October 9, 2019 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Ford Motor Company. (MCO). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document.
October 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE TO THE PARTIES - The Court is participating in the Mandatory Initial Discovery Pilot (MIDP) and this case is subject to that pilot. The key features and deadlines are set forth in the attached Notice which includes General Order 17-08. Also attached is a checklist for use by the parties. All parties must respond to the mandatory initial discovery requests set forth in the General Order before initiating any further discovery in this case. Please note: The discovery obligations in the General Order supersede the disclosures required by Rule 26(a)(1). Any party seeking affirmative relief must serve a copy of the attached documents (Notice to Parties, including General Order 17-08 and MIDP Checklist) on each new party when the Complaint, Counterclaim, Crossclaim, or Third-Party Complaint is served. (MCO)
October 9, 2019 Filing 3 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-17498037. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Michelle H Burns. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV-19-5350-PHX-MHB. Magistrate Election form attached. (MCO)
October 9, 2019 Filing 2 SUMMONS Submitted by Stephanie Allen, Marcus Arriaga, Richard Berkheimer, Zvonimir Burin, David Churilla, Winston Cummings, Alberto De Leon, Maria De Leon, Daniel Detaranto, Oscar Edwards, John Evans, Edward Flowers, Susann Gage, Ida Gonzales, Doren Gruenhagen, Jack Harris, Laura Herzog, Harold Hooker, Judy Hooker, Carole Kempermamm, Mike Lemonidis, Chris Linn, Anthony Maple, Anthony Mendivil, Darri N Mugley, Shirley Myles, Diane O'Hara, Joyce Phillips, Patricia Poindexter, Dale Powers, Walter Raub, Bruce Rogers, Michael Scotece, Porter Scott, Latoya Shallerhorn, Troy A Sickels, Danielle Stover, Charles Eugene Wardell, Jon Weaver, Maria Weaver, Carol M Webster, Miron E Webster, LeRoy White, Luella Demond Wulzen. (Kent, Trinette) (MCO)
October 9, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $ 400.00, receipt number 0970-17498037 filed by Michael Scotece, Bruce Rogers, Mike Lemonidis, Alberto De Leon, Shirley Myles, Laura Herzog, Stephanie Allen, David Churilla, Harold Hooker, Dale Powers, Jack Harris, Luella Demond Wulzen, Diane O'Hara, Darri N Mugley, Joyce Phillips, Maria Weaver, Carole Kempermamm, Ida Gonzales, Anthony Mendivil, Oscar Edwards, Walter Raub, Latoya Shallerhorn, John Evans, Carol M Webster, Chris Linn, Susann Gage, Anthony Maple, Patricia Poindexter, Winston Cummings, Jon Weaver, Troy A Sickels, Marcus Arriaga, Daniel Detaranto, Miron E Webster, Edward Flowers, Doren Gruenhagen, Charles Eugene Wardell, Maria De Leon, Richard Berkheimer, Porter Scott, Danielle Stover, LeRoy White, Judy Hooker, Zvonimir Burin. (Kent, Trinette) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit)(MCO)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Churilla et al v. Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ida Gonzales
Represented By: Trinette G. Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zvonimir Burin
Represented By: Trinette G. Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Detaranto
Represented By: Trinette G. Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Churilla
Represented By: Trinette G. Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Judy Hooker
Represented By: Trinette G. Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Danielle Stover
Represented By: Trinette G. Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Allen
Represented By: Trinette G. Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Maple
Represented By: Trinette G. Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carole Kempermamm
Represented By: Trinette G. Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Harold Hooker
Represented By: Trinette G. Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Miron E Webster
Represented By: Trinette G. Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Berkheimer
Represented By: Trinette G. Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doren Gruenhagen
Represented By: Trinette G. Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LeRoy White
Represented By: Trinette G. Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Weaver
Represented By: Trinette G. Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joyce Phillips
Represented By: Trinette G. Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Walter Raub
Represented By: Trinette G. Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latoya Shallerhorn
Represented By: Trinette G. Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Troy A Sickels
Represented By: Trinette G. Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susann Gage
Represented By: Trinette G. Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mike Lemonidis
Represented By: Trinette G. Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Oscar Edwards
Represented By: Trinette G. Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Flowers
Represented By: Trinette G. Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria De Leon
Represented By: Trinette G. Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Luella Demond Wulzen
Represented By: Trinette G. Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Laura Herzog
Represented By: Trinette G. Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Porter Scott
Represented By: Trinette G. Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack Harris
Represented By: Trinette G. Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Scotece
Represented By: Trinette G. Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane O'Hara
Represented By: Trinette G. Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Eugene Wardell
Represented By: Trinette G. Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marcus Arriaga
Represented By: Trinette G. Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anthony Mendivil
Represented By: Trinette G. Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Rogers
Represented By: Trinette G. Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Winston Cummings
Represented By: Trinette G. Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carol M Webster
Represented By: Trinette G. Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Evans
Represented By: Trinette G. Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jon Weaver
Represented By: Trinette G. Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shirley Myles
Represented By: Trinette G. Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darri N Mugley
Represented By: Trinette G. Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alberto De Leon
Represented By: Trinette G. Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Patricia Poindexter
Represented By: Trinette G. Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dale Powers
Represented By: Trinette G. Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chris Linn
Represented By: Trinette G. Kent
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ford Motor Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?