Goldberg et al v. McAleenan et al
Plaintiff: Osama Makram Wahny Guirguis, Lorne Morris, Qiang Wu, Apolinar Liborio Marcano Leccia, Jorge Solorzano Y Mosqueda, Antonio Erwin Dugarte Semidey, Carlos Antonio Espinos Perez, Jinshun Wu, Markus Schmid, Emilio Alverde Ochoa, Xinru Wu, Mehulkumar Dhirubhai Patel, Igor Ivanovich Obraztsov, Xiayi Shen, Duong Thuy Nguyen, Vikram Ahuja, Jianhua Yuan, Chang Cao, Jose Angel Mendoza, Yong She, Ruixue Xing, James Spiller, Xiangyu Li, Nga Thuy Luu, Meghaben Dhirubhai Patel, Galina Krylova, Jose Lasry Marrache, Alicia Lazo de la Vega Gomez, Felipe Accioly Vieira, Marian Kapusta, Momoko Okumura, Tianyun Wang, Tianmu Wang, Thaiza Tinoco Alvim, Chun Pang Suen, Mohammed Adil, Raisa V. Babaeva, Daniel Bittar Figueiredo, Chuong Nguyen Vo, Sharf Emdad, Martin Eugene Walsh, Adrian Gaty, Alaa Selim, Yue Zhang, Pinzhi Zhang, Chuan Qian, Dung Anh Ly, Nicolas Manuel Luis Carballo, Khumi Tonsing Massey, Stephan Jean Francois Gouaze, Tung Fai Wong, Rahul Shiakh, Ekaterina Fedyaeva, Zhonghua Ba, Michael I. Goldberg, Jessica Yung, Xiaochen Yang, Setareh Alipourfetrati, Yijun Zeng, Wanxin Shi, Fernando Penna Chaves, Mukesh Kantilal Patel, Tao Zhang, Shangshang Chen, Minfeng Wu, Yingzi Liu, Liliana Teresa Ng Cheung, Fei Chang, Narayanan Parameswaran, Samantha Patricia Castillo, Gyim Yang, Gigy Jacob Pollayil, Ling Sun, Carlos Eudardo Mesa Gomez, Phuoc Thanh Nguyen and Rahul Shaikh
Defendant: Sarah Kendall, Kenneth T (Ken) Cuccinelli, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services and Kevin McAleenan
Case Number: 1:2019cv24746
Filed: November 15, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Jose E Martinez
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Administrative Procedures Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision
Cause of Action: 08:1329
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 7, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 7, 2020 Filing 10 Clerks Notice to Filer re #9 Amended Complaint,,,,,. Parties Not Added; ERROR - The Filer failed to add all parties from the complaint/petition/removal. Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Entry of Parties Listed into CM/ECF and add the additional party. (ls)
January 6, 2020 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Jinshun Wu, Alaa Selim, Xiaochen Yang, Mehulkumar Dhirubhai Patel, Xiangyu Li, Wanxin Shi, Chuong Nguyen Vo, Lorne Morris, Jessica Yung, Jose Angel Mendoza, Ling Sun, Shangshang Chen, Yingzi Liu, Ekaterina Fedyaeva, Tao Zhang, Ruixue Xing, Meghaben Dhirubhai Patel, James Spiller, Setareh Alipourfetrati, Chun Pang Suen, Carlos Antonio Espinos Perez, Emilio Alverde Ochoa, Gigy Jacob Pollayil, Fei Chang, Thaiza Tinoco Alvim, Galina Krylova, Tianmu Wang, Jorge Solorzano Y Mosqueda, Adrian Gaty, Liliana Teresa Ng Cheung, Yong She, Rahul Shiakh, Nga Thuy Luu, Yijun Zeng, Martin Eugene Walsh, Sharf Emdad, Stephan Jean Francois Gouaze, Marian Kapusta, Zhonghua Ba, Fernando Penna Chaves, Osama Makram Wahny Guirguis, Phuoc Thanh Nguyen, Chang Cao, Igor Ivanovich Obraztsov, Felipe Accioly Vieira, Michael I. Goldberg, Momoko Okumura, Chuan Qian, Xiayi Shen, Apolinar Liborio Marcano Leccia, Jose Lasry Marrache, Antonio Erwin Dugarte Semidey, Gyim Yang, Samantha Patricia Castillo, Xinru Wu, Raisa V. Babaeva, Pinzhi Zhang, Nicolas Manuel Luis Carballo, Minfeng Wu, Daniel Bittar Figueiredo, Mohammed Adil, Tung Fai Wong, Khumi Tonsing Massey, Yue Zhang, Carlos Eudardo Mesa Gomez, Alicia Lazo de la Vega Gomez, Vikram Ahuja, Mukesh Kantilal Patel, Narayanan Parameswaran, Markus Schmid, Duong Thuy Nguyen, Qiang Wu, Jianhua Yuan, Tianyun Wang, Dung Anh Ly.(Surgeon, Naim)
December 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER granting the parties' #7 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Conference Report. The parties shall file the Joint Conference Report on or before January 30, 2020. All other deadlines shall remain unaffected. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 12/19/2019. (kml)
December 13, 2019 Filing 7 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time To File Conference Report re #5 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report by Mohammed Adil, Vikram Ahuja, Setareh Alipourfetrati, Thaiza Tinoco Alvim, Zhonghua Ba, Raisa V. Babaeva, Chang Cao, Nicolas Manuel Luis Carballo, Samantha Patricia Castillo, Fei Chang, Fernando Penna Chaves, Shangshang Chen, Liliana Teresa Ng Cheung, Sharf Emdad, Ekaterina Fedyaeva, Daniel Bittar Figueiredo, Adrian Gaty, Michael I. Goldberg, Alicia Lazo de la Vega Gomez, Carlos Eudardo Mesa Gomez, Stephan Jean Francois Gouaze, Osama Makram Wahny Guirguis, Marian Kapusta, Galina Krylova, Apolinar Liborio Marcano Leccia, Xiangyu Li, Yingzi Liu, Nga Thuy Luu, Dung Anh Ly, Jose Lasry Marrache, Khumi Tonsing Massey, Jose Angel Mendoza, Lorne Morris, Jorge Solorzano Y Mosqueda, Duong Thuy Nguyen, Phuoc Thanh Nguyen, Igor Ivanovich Obraztsov, Emilio Alverde Ochoa, Momoko Okumura, Narayanan Parameswaran, Meghaben Dhirubhai Patel, Mehulkumar Dhirubhai Patel, Mukesh Kantilal Patel, Carlos Antonio Espinos Perez, Gigy Jacob Pollayil, Chuan Qian, Markus Schmid, Alaa Selim, Antonio Erwin Dugarte Semidey, Yong She, Xiayi Shen, Wanxin Shi, Rahul Shiakh, James Spiller, Chun Pang Suen, Ling Sun, Felipe Accioly Vieira, Chuong Nguyen Vo, Martin Eugene Walsh, Tianmu Wang, Tianyun Wang, Tung Fai Wong, Jinshun Wu, Minfeng Wu, Qiang Wu, Xinru Wu, Ruixue Xing, Gyim Yang, Xiaochen Yang, Jianhua Yuan, Jessica Yung, Yijun Zeng, Pinzhi Zhang, Tao Zhang, Yue Zhang. Responses due by 12/27/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Exhibit 1)(Surgeon, Naim)
November 22, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Natalie Diaz on behalf of Kenneth T (Ken) Cuccinelli, Sarah Kendall, Kevin McAleenan, U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services. Attorney Natalie Diaz added to party Kenneth T (Ken) Cuccinelli(pty:dft), Attorney Natalie Diaz added to party Sarah Kendall(pty:dft), Attorney Natalie Diaz added to party Kevin McAleenan(pty:dft), Attorney Natalie Diaz added to party U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services(pty:dft). (Diaz, Natalie)
November 18, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 11/18/2019. See attached document for full details. (dq)
November 18, 2019 Filing 4 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Daniel B. Lundy, H. Ronald Klasko, mailing date November 18, 2019, (cco)
November 18, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services. (amb)
November 15, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb)
November 15, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Writ in the Nature of Mandamus against All Plaintiffs. Filing fees $ 400.00. Pay.gov Agency Tracking ID 113C-12150011, payment transferred from : 19CV24732 Goldberg et al. vs. McAleenann, filed by Jinshun Wu, Alaa Selim, Xiaochen Yang, Mehulkumar Dhirubhai Patel, Xiangyu Li, Wanxin Shi, Chuong Nguyen Vo, Lorne Morris, Jessica Yung, Jose Angel Mendoza, Ling Sun, Shangshang Chen, Yingzi Liu, Ekaterina Fedyaeva, Tao Zhang, Ruixue Xing, Meghaben Dhirubhai Patel, James Spiller, Setareh Alipourfetrati, Chun Pang Suen, Carlos Antonio Espinos Perez, Emilio Alverde Ochoa, Gigy Jacob Pollayil, Fei Chang, Thaiza Tinoco Alvim, Galina Krylova, Tianmu Wang, Jorge Solorzano Y Mosqueda, Adrian Gaty, Liliana Teresa Ng Cheung, Yong She, Rahul Shiakh, Nga Thuy Luu, Yijun Zeng, Martin Eugene Walsh, Sharf Emdad, Stephan Jean Francois Gouaze, Marian Kapusta, Zhonghua Ba, Fernando Penna Chaves, Osama Makram Wahny Guirguis, Phuoc Thanh Nguyen, Chang Cao, Igor Ivanovich Obraztsov, Felipe Accioly Vieira, Michael I. Goldberg, Momoko Okumura, Chuan Qian, Xiayi Shen, Apolinar Liborio Marcano Leccia, Jose Lasry Marrache, Antonio Erwin Dugarte Semidey, Gyim Yang, Samantha Patricia Castillo, Xinru Wu, Raisa V. Babaeva, Pinzhi Zhang, Nicolas Manuel Luis Carballo, Minfeng Wu, Daniel Bittar Figueiredo, Mohammed Adil, Tung Fai Wong, Khumi Tonsing Massey, Yue Zhang, Carlos Eudardo Mesa Gomez, Alicia Lazo de la Vega Gomez, Vikram Ahuja, Mukesh Kantilal Patel, Narayanan Parameswaran, Markus Schmid, Duong Thuy Nguyen, Qiang Wu, Jianhua Yuan, Tianyun Wang, Dung Anh Ly. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Surgeon, Naim)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Goldberg et al v. McAleenan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Osama Makram Wahny Guirguis
Represented By: Naim Shakir Surgeon
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: H. Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lorne Morris
Represented By: Naim Shakir Surgeon
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: H. Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Qiang Wu
Represented By: Naim Shakir Surgeon
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: H. Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Apolinar Liborio Marcano Leccia
Represented By: Naim Shakir Surgeon
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: H. Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jorge Solorzano Y Mosqueda
Represented By: Naim Shakir Surgeon
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: H. Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Erwin Dugarte Semidey
Represented By: Naim Shakir Surgeon
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: H. Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Antonio Espinos Perez
Represented By: Naim Shakir Surgeon
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: H. Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jinshun Wu
Represented By: Naim Shakir Surgeon
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: H. Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Markus Schmid
Represented By: Naim Shakir Surgeon
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: H. Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emilio Alverde Ochoa
Represented By: Naim Shakir Surgeon
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: H. Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xinru Wu
Represented By: Naim Shakir Surgeon
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: H. Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mehulkumar Dhirubhai Patel
Represented By: Naim Shakir Surgeon
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: H. Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Igor Ivanovich Obraztsov
Represented By: Naim Shakir Surgeon
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: H. Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xiayi Shen
Represented By: Naim Shakir Surgeon
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: H. Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Duong Thuy Nguyen
Represented By: Naim Shakir Surgeon
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: H. Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vikram Ahuja
Represented By: Naim Shakir Surgeon
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: H. Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jianhua Yuan
Represented By: Naim Shakir Surgeon
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: H. Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chang Cao
Represented By: Naim Shakir Surgeon
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: H. Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Angel Mendoza
Represented By: Naim Shakir Surgeon
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: H. Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yong She
Represented By: Naim Shakir Surgeon
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: H. Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ruixue Xing
Represented By: Naim Shakir Surgeon
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: H. Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Spiller
Represented By: Naim Shakir Surgeon
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: H. Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xiangyu Li
Represented By: Naim Shakir Surgeon
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: H. Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nga Thuy Luu
Represented By: Naim Shakir Surgeon
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: H. Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Meghaben Dhirubhai Patel
Represented By: Naim Shakir Surgeon
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: H. Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Galina Krylova
Represented By: Naim Shakir Surgeon
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: H. Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Lasry Marrache
Represented By: Naim Shakir Surgeon
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: H. Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alicia Lazo de la Vega Gomez
Represented By: Naim Shakir Surgeon
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: H. Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Felipe Accioly Vieira
Represented By: Naim Shakir Surgeon
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: H. Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marian Kapusta
Represented By: Naim Shakir Surgeon
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: H. Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Momoko Okumura
Represented By: Naim Shakir Surgeon
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: H. Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tianyun Wang
Represented By: Naim Shakir Surgeon
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: H. Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tianmu Wang
Represented By: Naim Shakir Surgeon
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: H. Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Thaiza Tinoco Alvim
Represented By: Naim Shakir Surgeon
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: H. Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chun Pang Suen
Represented By: Naim Shakir Surgeon
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: H. Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mohammed Adil
Represented By: Naim Shakir Surgeon
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: H. Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Raisa V. Babaeva
Represented By: Naim Shakir Surgeon
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: H. Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel Bittar Figueiredo
Represented By: Naim Shakir Surgeon
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: H. Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chuong Nguyen Vo
Represented By: Naim Shakir Surgeon
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: H. Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharf Emdad
Represented By: Naim Shakir Surgeon
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: H. Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martin Eugene Walsh
Represented By: Naim Shakir Surgeon
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: H. Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adrian Gaty
Represented By: Naim Shakir Surgeon
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: H. Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alaa Selim
Represented By: Naim Shakir Surgeon
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: H. Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yue Zhang
Represented By: Naim Shakir Surgeon
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: H. Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pinzhi Zhang
Represented By: Naim Shakir Surgeon
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: H. Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chuan Qian
Represented By: Naim Shakir Surgeon
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: H. Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dung Anh Ly
Represented By: Naim Shakir Surgeon
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: H. Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nicolas Manuel Luis Carballo
Represented By: Naim Shakir Surgeon
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: H. Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Khumi Tonsing Massey
Represented By: Naim Shakir Surgeon
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: H. Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephan Jean Francois Gouaze
Represented By: Naim Shakir Surgeon
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: H. Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tung Fai Wong
Represented By: Naim Shakir Surgeon
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: H. Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rahul Shiakh
Represented By: Naim Shakir Surgeon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ekaterina Fedyaeva
Represented By: Naim Shakir Surgeon
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: H. Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Zhonghua Ba
Represented By: Naim Shakir Surgeon
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: H. Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael I. Goldberg
Represented By: Naim Shakir Surgeon
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: H. Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jessica Yung
Represented By: Naim Shakir Surgeon
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: H. Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Xiaochen Yang
Represented By: Naim Shakir Surgeon
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: H. Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Setareh Alipourfetrati
Represented By: Naim Shakir Surgeon
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: H. Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yijun Zeng
Represented By: Naim Shakir Surgeon
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: H. Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wanxin Shi
Represented By: Naim Shakir Surgeon
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: H. Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fernando Penna Chaves
Represented By: Naim Shakir Surgeon
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: H. Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mukesh Kantilal Patel
Represented By: Naim Shakir Surgeon
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: H. Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tao Zhang
Represented By: Naim Shakir Surgeon
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: H. Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shangshang Chen
Represented By: Naim Shakir Surgeon
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: H. Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Minfeng Wu
Represented By: Naim Shakir Surgeon
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: H. Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yingzi Liu
Represented By: Naim Shakir Surgeon
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: H. Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Liliana Teresa Ng Cheung
Represented By: Naim Shakir Surgeon
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: H. Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fei Chang
Represented By: Naim Shakir Surgeon
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: H. Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Narayanan Parameswaran
Represented By: Naim Shakir Surgeon
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: H. Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Samantha Patricia Castillo
Represented By: Naim Shakir Surgeon
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: H. Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gyim Yang
Represented By: Naim Shakir Surgeon
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: H. Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gigy Jacob Pollayil
Represented By: Naim Shakir Surgeon
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: H. Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ling Sun
Represented By: Naim Shakir Surgeon
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: H. Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carlos Eudardo Mesa Gomez
Represented By: Naim Shakir Surgeon
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: H. Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phuoc Thanh Nguyen
Represented By: Naim Shakir Surgeon
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: H. Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rahul Shaikh
Represented By: Naim Shakir Surgeon
Represented By: Daniel B. Lundy
Represented By: H. Ronald Klasko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sarah Kendall
Represented By: Natalie Diaz
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kenneth T (Ken) Cuccinelli
Represented By: Natalie Diaz
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services
Represented By: Natalie Diaz
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kevin McAleenan
Represented By: Natalie Diaz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?