WILLIAMS v. Burger King Corporation Featured Case

Plaintiff Phillip Williams alleged that Defendant Burger King Corporation sold and marketed its Impossible Whopper burger as a meat-free food option even though it cooked the vegan patties on the same grills as its traditional meat products, thereby covering the outside of the burger with meat by-products. The Causes of Action are for breach of contract, violation of Florida's Deceptive and Unfair Trade Practices Act, and unjust enrichment.

Plaintiff: PHILLIP WILLIAMS
Defendant: Burger King Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv24755
Filed: November 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Ursula Ungaro
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PLANNING AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE, ( Scheduling Conference set for 1/3/2020 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro., Joint Scheduling Report due by 12/20/2019) Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 11/25/2019. See attached document for full details. (jao)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER GRANTING 7 RENEWED MOTION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE, CONSENT TO DESIGNATION AND REQUEST TO ELECTRONICALLY RECEIVE NOTICES OF ELECTRONIC FILING Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 11/26/2019. See attached document for full details. (jao)
November 26, 2019 Filing 7 MOTION to Amend/Correct 6 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, and to Provide Required Consent of Counsel in Support of Previously Filed Motion, Renewed Herein by PHILLIP WILLIAMS. Responses due by 12/10/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Certification Attorney Certification in Support of Motion, # 2 Certification Attorney Consent in Support of Motion, # 3 Text of Proposed Order)(Healy, David)
November 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER denying 5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney(s) Eugene Y. Turin of Attorney Eugene Y. Turin Notice of Termination delivered by US Mail to Eugene Turin.. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 11/25/2019. See attached document for full details. (jao)
November 19, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Eugene Y. Turin. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-12162364 by PHILLIP WILLIAMS. Responses due by 12/3/2019 (Attachments: # 1 Certification Attorney Certification in Support of Motion, # 2 Text of Proposed Order)(Healy, David)
November 19, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Burger King Corporation. (pes)
November 18, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by PHILLIP WILLIAMS re 1 Complaint filed by PHILLIP WILLIAMS (Healy, David)
November 18, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Ursula Ungaro. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jao)
November 18, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT (Class Action) and Demand for Jury Trial against Burger King Corporation. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12154211, filed by PHILLIP WILLIAMS. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Healy, David)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WILLIAMS v. Burger King Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PHILLIP WILLIAMS
Represented By: David Patrick Healy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Burger King Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?