Longhini v. Jae Miami Dade, LLC
Plaintiff: Doug Longhini
Defendant: JAE Miami Dade, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv24801
Filed: November 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Referring Judge: Jonathan Goodman
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12182
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 17, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Selected/Added Anthony Torrente as Mediator. Mediation Hearing set for 4/8/2020 at 10:30 a.m.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Order Scheduling Mediation)(Perez, Anthony)
January 14, 2020 Filing 18 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by JAE Miami Dade, LLC identifying Other Affiliate Charles Childers ADA Assistance Group, Inc for JAE Miami Dade, LLC (Ahr, Kristin)
January 14, 2020 Filing 17 Clerks Notice to Filer re #16 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents Not Entered; ERROR - The Filer failed to enter all Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents from the Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filer is instructed to refile their Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement and enter the missing Other Affiliates/Corp Parents. Note - Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents do not appear on the docket sheet. (ail)
January 13, 2020 Filing 16 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by JAE Miami Dade, LLC (Ahr, Kristin)
January 3, 2020 Filing 15 Clerks Notice to Filer re #14 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents Not Entered; ERROR - The Filer failed to enter all Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents from the Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filer is instructed to refile their Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement and enter the missing Other Affiliates/Corp Parents. Note - Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents do not appear on the docket sheet. (jas)
January 2, 2020 Filing 14 Defendant's Corporate Disclosure Statement by JAE Miami Dade, LLC (Ahr, Kristin)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MAGISTRATE JUDGE GOODMAN'S DISCOVERY PROCEDURES ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 1/2/2020. See attached document for full details. (tb)
December 31, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #11 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga (CMA)
December 30, 2019 Filing 11 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to file Motion to Strike Answer re #6 Answer to Complaint by Doug Longhini. Responses due by 1/13/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Perez, Anthony)
December 30, 2019 Deadline(s) terminated. (asl)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER ( Defendant shall comply with the Order #5 by 1/2/2020) Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 12/30/2019. See attached document for full details. (amb)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER SETTING BENCH TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE. SCHEDULING ORDER: ( Jury Trial set for 8/17/2020 before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga., Calendar Call set for 8/11/2020 09:00 AM before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. ( Mediation Deadline 4/27/2020.), ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 12/30/2019. See attached document for full details. (amb) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
December 27, 2019 Filing 8 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Doug Longhini (Attachments: #1 Supplement Joint Scheduling Form, #2 Supplement Election to Jurisdiction by Magistrate for Final Disposition of Motions, #3 Text of Proposed Order Scheduling Order)(Perez, Anthony)
December 27, 2019 Filing 7 Plaintiff's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Doug Longhini identifying Other Affiliate Edilberto Rodriguez, Other Affiliate Jhonny Mercado, Other Affiliate Michael L. Schmickle, Other Affiliate Charles D. Childers for Doug Longhini (Perez, Anthony)
December 10, 2019 Filing 6 Defednants' ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Plaintiff, Doug Longhini by JAE Miami Dade, LLC. Attorney Kristin Maria Ahr added to party JAE Miami Dade, LLC(pty:dft). (Ahr, Kristin)
November 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Joint Scheduling Report due by 12/27/2019. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 11/26/2019. See attached document for full details. (amb)
November 26, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Doug Longhini. JAE Miami Dade, LLC served on 11/21/2019, answer due 12/12/2019. (Perez, Anthony)
November 20, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to JAE Miami Dade, LLC. (amb)
November 20, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb)
November 20, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against JAE Miami Dade, LLC. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12164583, filed by Doug Longhini. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Perez, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Longhini v. Jae Miami Dade, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JAE Miami Dade, LLC
Represented By: Kristin Maria Ahr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doug Longhini
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Perez
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?