Longhini v. Shilldev (U.S.), Inc.
Plaintiff: Doug Longhini
Defendant: Shilldev (U.S.), Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv24835
Filed: November 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Edwin G Torres
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12182
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 3, 2020 Filing 7 Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Shilldev (U.S.), Inc.. Attorney Chelsea Silvia added to party Shilldev (U.S.), Inc.(pty:dft). (Silvia, Chelsea)
December 17, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Doug Longhini. Shilldev (U.S.), Inc. served on 12/11/2019, answer due 1/2/2020. (Perez, Anthony)
December 4, 2019 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Counsel re #4 Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,, Notice of Court Practice/to Appear/Other, Verified Certificate of Plaintiff's Counsel Regarding Prior Filings Under the Americans with Disabilities Act for the Subject Properties and Defendants by Anthony Joseph Perez on behalf of Doug Longhini (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Consent Decree) (Perez, Anthony)
November 25, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF REFERRAL AND OF COURT PRACTICE IN ADA CASES. ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres for all discovery disputes and Non-Dispositive Pretrial Matters. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 11/25/2019. See attached document for full details. (mc)
November 22, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Shilldev (U.S.), Inc.. (pcs)
November 21, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
November 21, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Shilldev (U.S.), Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12170069, filed by Doug Longhini. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Perez, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Longhini v. Shilldev (U.S.), Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shilldev (U.S.), Inc.
Represented By: Chelsea Silvia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Doug Longhini
Represented By: Anthony Joseph Perez
Represented By: Beverly Virues
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?