United States of America v. Cordero et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Dimary Cordero, NMB Accounting and Tax Services, LLC, WFS Accounting and Tax Services, LLC and Dimary Cordero Torres
Case Number: 1:2019cv24841
Filed: November 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: James Lawrence King
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26:7402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 14, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer by Dimary Cordero. (amb)
January 7, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Leave to File Motions for Partial Default Judgment and Leave to Conduct Discovery by United States of America. (Applegate, Daniel)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER by Clerk of Entry of Default re #9 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default as to WFS Accounting and Tax Services, LLC. Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 1/7/2020. See attached document for full details. (ail)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Clerk of Entry of Default re #8 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default as to NMB Accounting and Tax Services, LLC. Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 1/7/2020. See attached document for full details. (ail)
January 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Clerk of Entry of Default re #7 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default as to Dimary Cordero. Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 1/7/2020. See attached document for full details. (ail)
January 6, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to WFS Accounting and Tax Services, LLC by United States of America. (Applegate, Daniel)
January 6, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to NMB Accounting and Tax Services, LLC by United States of America. (Applegate, Daniel)
January 6, 2020 Filing 7 MOTION for Clerks Entry of Default as to Dimary Cordero by United States of America. (Applegate, Daniel)
December 11, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by United States of America. WFS Accounting and Tax Services, LLC served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (Applegate, Daniel)
December 11, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by United States of America. NMB Accounting and Tax Services, LLC served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (Applegate, Daniel)
December 11, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by United States of America. Dimary Cordero served on 11/25/2019, answer due 12/16/2019. (Applegate, Daniel)
November 22, 2019 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Dimary Cordero, NMB Accounting and Tax Services, LLC, WFS Accounting and Tax Services, LLC. (amb)
November 22, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Senior Judge James Lawrence King. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (amb)
November 22, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00. USA Filer - No Filing Fee Required, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s))(Applegate, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Cordero et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dimary Cordero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NMB Accounting and Tax Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WFS Accounting and Tax Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dimary Cordero Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Samuel Peter Robins
Represented By: Daniel A. Applegate
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?