Crook v. Maiorana et al
Plaintiff: Ronny H. Crook
Defendant: Florida Department of Corrections and Warden C. Maiorana
Case Number: 1:2019cv25033
Filed: December 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia G Cooke
Referring Judge: Lisette M Reid
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 3, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 3, 2020 Filing 11 TRANSCRIPT INFORMATION FORM by Ronny H. Crook re #9 Notice of Appeal. No Transcript Requested. (apz)
January 23, 2020 Filing 10 Acknowledgment of Receipt of NOA from USCA re #9 Notice of Appeal, filed by Ronny H. Crook. Date received by USCA: 1/17/2020. USCA Case Number: 20-10217-A. (apz)
January 17, 2020 Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Order under appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #9 Notice of Appeal, Notice has been electronically mailed. (apz)
January 16, 2020 Filing 9 Notice of Appeal as to #7 Order on Report and Recommendations by Ronny H. Crook. FILING FEE: (NOT PAID). Within fourteen days of the filing date of a Notice of Appeal, the appellant must complete the Eleventh Circuit Transcript Order Form regardless of whether transcripts are being ordered [Pursuant to FRAP 10(b)]. For information go to our FLSD website under Transcript Information. (apz)
January 13, 2020 Filing 8 PAPERLESS Case No Longer Referred to Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid/Case Closed by the District Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 1/13/2020. (br)
January 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Adopting #5 Report and Recommendations. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 1/10/2020. See attached document for full details. (kou)
December 31, 2019 Filing 6 Letter to the Clerk's Office from Ronny H. Crook (ebz)
December 26, 2019 Filing 5 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATIONS on 42 USC 1983 case re #1 Complaint 42 USC 1983 or Bivens filed by Ronny H. Crook; Recommending that Plaintiff's Complaint ECF No. #1 be DISMISSED with prejudice, that Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis ECF No. #3 be DENIED, and the case CLOSED. Objections to R&R due by 1/9/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 12/26/2019. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
December 26, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of filing Name of Medication, Inmate Sick-Call Request and Request for Administrative Remedy or Appeal by Ronny H. Crook (ebz)
December 6, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Ronny H. Crook. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(pes)
December 6, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke and Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2019-2, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (pes)
December 6, 2019 Filing 1 Complaint pursuant to 42 USC 1983 against Florida Department of Corrections, C. Maiorana. Filing fee $ 400.00. IFP Filed, filed by Ronny H. Crook.(pes)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Crook v. Maiorana et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronny H. Crook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Florida Department of Corrections
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden C. Maiorana
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?