Benjamin Cousins, M.D. v. United Healthcare, Inc.
Plaintiff: Benjamin Cousins, M.D.
Defendant: United Healthcare, Inc. and United Healthcare Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv25061
Filed: December 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Referring Judge: Lauren Fleischer Louis
Nature of Suit: Labor: E.R.I.S.A.
Cause of Action: 29:1001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE AS TO DEFENDANT UNITED HEALTHCARE, INC. ONLY. Order Dismissing Party United Healthcare, Inc. re #21 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. The above-styled case shall proceed against Defendant United Healthcare Insurance Company. All deadlines shall remain in place. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 1/21/2020. See attached document for full details. (amb)
January 20, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal as to Defendant United Healthcare, Inc. by Benjamin Cousins, M.D. (Luck, Lauren)
January 16, 2020 Filing 20 Summons Issued as to United Healthcare Insurance Company. (mc)
January 15, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Benjamin Cousins, M.D. re #15 Amended Complaint filed by Benjamin Cousins, M.D. (Luck, Lauren)
January 15, 2020 Filing 18 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summons cannot be issued for the following reason - The Summons is improperly formatted. The filer is instructed to draft and re-file properly formatted or use AO 440 form. (ail)
January 14, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Benjamin Cousins, M.D. re #15 Amended Complaint filed by Benjamin Cousins, M.D. (Luck, Lauren)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot #6 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. See First Amended Complaint at ECF No. #15 . Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
January 13, 2020 Filing 15 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Benjamin Cousins, M.D..(Luck, Lauren)
January 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Amended Pleadings due by 3/11/2020., Discovery due by 7/14/2020., Expert Discovery due by 7/14/2020., Joinder of Parties due by 3/11/2020., Mediation Deadline 7/28/2020., In Limine Motions due by 8/5/2020., Dispositive Motions due by 8/5/2020., Motions due by 8/5/2020., Pretrial Stipulation due by 10/26/2020., Jury Trial set for 11/9/2020 at 9:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom., Calendar Call set for 11/3/2020 at 1:45 PM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 1/13/2020. See attached document for full details. (ail) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
January 10, 2020 Filing 13 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by United Healthcare, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Alter, Daniel)
January 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER granting ECF No. #11 Joint Motion for Extension of Time to File Joint Scheduling Report. The parties must file their Joint Scheduling Report by January 10, 2020. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom. (ks01)
January 2, 2020 Filing 11 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time TO FILE JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT by Benjamin Cousins, M.D.. Responses due by 1/16/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Luck, Lauren)
December 26, 2019 Filing 10 Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by United Healthcare, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Unitedhealth Group Incorporated, Other Affiliate UHIC Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate United Healthcare Insurance Company, Other Affiliate United Healthcare Services, Inc. for United Healthcare, Inc. (Alter, Daniel)
December 26, 2019 Set/Reset Deadline as to #6 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM . Responses due by 1/13/2020. SEE DE 9 ORDER (ail)
December 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #8 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to Motion by January 13, 2020. Re: #6 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by United Healthcare, Inc.. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
December 24, 2019 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #6 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Benjamin Cousins, M.D.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO DEFENDANTS MOTION TO DISMISS)(Luck, Lauren)
December 18, 2019 Filing 7 Clerks Notice to Filer re #5 Notice (Other). Docket Text Does Not Match Document; ERROR - The Filer failed to enter a title in the docket text that matches the title of the document. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile the document. (ail)
December 17, 2019 Filing 6 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by United Healthcare, Inc.. Responses due by 12/31/2019 (Alter, Daniel)
December 17, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Filing State Court Docket Sheet by United Healthcare, Inc. re #3 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report, (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet) (Alter, Daniel) Text Modified on 12/18/2019 (ail).
December 11, 2019 Filing 4 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint), with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Benjamin Cousins, M.D.. United Healthcare, Inc. served on 11/19/2019, answer due 12/10/2019. (Luck, Lauren)
December 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER on Post-Removal Procedures, and Requiring Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties. (Joint Scheduling Report due by 1/2/2020). Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 12/10/2019. See attached document for full details. (mc)
December 9, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (mc)
December 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT ) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12210578, filed by United Healthcare, Inc.. No answer/motion to dismiss filed. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1 - State Court Action, #3 Exhibit 2 - Declaration of Jane Stalinski)(Alter, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Benjamin Cousins, M.D. v. United Healthcare, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Cousins, M.D.
Represented By: Lauren Juliette Luck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Healthcare, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Alter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United Healthcare Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?