Frost v. Carnival Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth Frost
Defendant: ABC CORP.(S), and XYZ CORP., Scotchies, Carnival Corporation, a Panamanian Corporation d/b/a Carnival Cruise Line, Carnival Corporation, ABC Corp.(S) and XYZ Corp.
Case Number: 1:2019cv25096
Filed: December 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Federico A Moreno
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 30, 2020 Filing 15 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against ABC Corp.(S), Carnival Corporation, Scotchies, XYZ Corp., filed by Kenneth Frost.(Hayashi, Matthias)
January 23, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Darren Wayne Friedman on behalf of Carnival Corporation (Friedman, Darren)
January 21, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Avi C Shoham on behalf of Carnival Corporation (Shoham, Avi)
January 21, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey Eric Foreman on behalf of Carnival Corporation. Attorney Jeffrey Eric Foreman added to party Carnival Corporation(pty:dft). (Foreman, Jeffrey)
January 16, 2020 Filing 11 Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Carnival Corporation (Shoham, Avi)
January 16, 2020 Filing 10 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice #1 Complaint, by Carnival Corporation. Responses due by 1/30/2020 (Shoham, Avi)
January 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #8 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 1/14/2020. See attached document for full details. (mmd)
January 13, 2020 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by Carnival Corporation. Attorney Avi C Shoham added to party Carnival Corporation(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Shoham, Avi)
December 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #6 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document Carnival Corporation. Answer due 1/16/2020. Re: #1 Complaint, filed by Kenneth Frost. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 12/30/2019. (mmc)
December 27, 2019 Filing 6 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, by Carnival Corporation. Attorney Darren Wayne Friedman added to party Carnival Corporation(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Friedman, Darren)
December 17, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Kenneth Frost. Carnival Corporation served on 12/12/2019, answer due 1/2/2020. (Aronfeld, Spencer)
December 11, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Carnival Corporation. (pes)
December 10, 2019 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party(ies) Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party name(s) in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (pes)
December 10, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Federico A. Moreno. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pes)
December 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ABC CORP.(S), and XYZ CORP., Carnival Corporation, a Panamanian Corporation d/b/a Carnival Cruise Line, Scotchies. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-12215422, filed by Kenneth Frost. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s), #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Aronfeld, Spencer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frost v. Carnival Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC CORP.(S), and XYZ CORP.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scotchies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carnival Corporation, a Panamanian Corporation d/b/a Carnival Cruise Line
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carnival Corporation
Represented By: Avi C Shoham
Represented By: Darren Wayne Friedman
Represented By: Jeffrey Eric Foreman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ABC Corp.(S)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: XYZ Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Frost
Represented By: Spencer Marc Aronfeld
Represented By: Matthias Masayasu Hayashi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?