United States of America
Plaintiff: United States of America
In Re: $805,095.20
Case Number: 1:2019mc20337
Filed: January 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: John J O'Sullivan
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 18:0983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER granting #5 Motion for Extension of Time to File Complaint. Miscellaneous Deadline 5/20/2019. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 3/11/2019. See attached document for full details. (mkr)
March 10, 2019 Filing 5 Agreed MOTION for Extension of Time To File Civil Complaint re #3 Notice (Other) by United States of America. Responses due by 3/25/2019 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Lehr, Alison)
January 26, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by United States of America Regarding Due Date (Lehr, Alison)
January 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting Motion (Complaint) to Extend Time to File CAFRA Case Closing Case. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 1/24/2019. See attached document for full details. (mr1)
January 24, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan. (pes)
January 24, 2019 Filing 1 Motion (Complaint) to Extend Time to File CAFRA Case. Filing fee $ 47.00. USA Filer - No Filing Fee Required, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Order)(pes)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
In re: $805,095.20
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Alison Whitney Lehr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?