COFFEY et al v. WCW & AIR, INC. et al

Plaintiff: VALERIE VAN DYKE, JONATHAN COFFEY, SYDNEY COFFEY and VALERIE DIANE VAN DYKE
Defendant: WCW & AIR, INC., HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC., AQUION, INC. and HOME DEPOT, U.S.A., INC.
Case Number: 1:2019mc22314
Filed: June 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Darrin P Gayles
Referring Judge: Alicia M Otazo-Reyes
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Jury Demanded By: None

Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 26, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2019 Filing 27 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION by JONATHAN COFFEY, SYDNEY COFFEY, VALERIE DIANE VAN DYKE re #26 MOTION for Contempt filed by SYDNEY COFFEY, JONATHAN COFFEY, VALERIE DIANE VAN DYKE (Hancock, Brian)
July 23, 2019 Filing 26 MOTION for Contempt by JONATHAN COFFEY, SYDNEY COFFEY, VALERIE DIANE VAN DYKE. Responses due by 8/6/2019 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Plaintiffs' Exhibit A)(Hancock, Brian)
June 28, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 25 Paperless Order administratively closing case pursuant to Judge Otazo-Reyes's Order [ECF No. 24]. The parties are hereby notified that, within sixty (60) days of the date of this Order, they must file a Stipulation or Notice of Dismissal along with any other pertinent document necessary to conclude this action. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (lfn)
June 27, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER granting in part #1 Petition/Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 6/27/2019. See attached document for full details. (kmh)
June 27, 2019 Filing 23 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes: Telephonic Discovery Hearing held on 6/27/2019. Total time in court: 40 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Brian Douglas Hancock appeared on behalf of the Plaintiffs; David Rubenstein appeared on behalf of Non-Party Miami Water and Air, Inc. Order to follow. (Digital 10:13:34) (sl)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 22 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #21 Joint MOTION for Leave to Appear. Counsel may appear at the 6/27/2019 hearing by telephone. Counsel shall call the conference number 1-888-684-8852 at the appointed time, then enter access code 4791317 and security code 0627. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 6/26/2019. (kmh)
June 26, 2019 Filing 21 Joint MOTION for Leave to Appear Telephonically at Hearing . Attorney/Representative: Brian D. Hancock and David Rubenstein by JONATHAN COFFEY, SYDNEY COFFEY, Miami Water & Air, Inc., VALERIE DIANE VAN DYKE. Responses due by 7/10/2019 (Hancock, Brian)
June 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 20 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #10 MOTION for Extension of Time and Postponement of Hearing. Attorney David Rubenstein shall be allowed to appear solely for the purposes of the 6/27/2019 Hearing. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 6/26/2019. (kmh)
June 25, 2019 Filing 19 REPLY to #12 Memorandum by JONATHAN COFFEY, SYDNEY COFFEY, VALERIE DIANE VAN DYKE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Hancock, Brian)
June 20, 2019 Filing 18 RESPONSE in Opposition re #10 MOTION for Extension of Time for Extension of Time and Postponement of Hearing MOTION to Continue filed by JONATHAN COFFEY, SYDNEY COFFEY, VALERIE DIANE VAN DYKE. Replies due by 6/27/2019. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Hancock, Brian)
June 19, 2019 Filing 17 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney David Rubenstein, mailing date June 19, 2019, (pt)
June 19, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER requiring an expedited response to #10 MOTION for Extension of Time and Postponement of Hearing. Response due by 6/21/2019. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 6/19/2019. (kmh)
June 19, 2019 Filing 15 NOTICE OF CONVENTIONAL FILING of #14 Affidavit by Miami Water & Air, Inc. (drz)
June 19, 2019 Filing 14 DECLARATION OF DAVID RUBENSTEIN in Support Of re #12 OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL by Miami Water & Air, Inc.. (drz)
June 19, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE OF CONVENTIONAL FILING of #12 Memorandum by Miami Water & Air, Inc. (drz)
June 19, 2019 Filing 12 NON-PARTY MIAMI WATER & AIR, INC.'S MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Opposition re #1 Petition/Motion (Complaint) RE: Subpoena from Another District, by Miami Water & Air, Inc.. (drz)
June 19, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE OF CONVENTIONAL FILING of #10 MOTION for Extension of Time for Extension of Time and Postponement of Hearing by Miami Water & Air, Inc. (drz)
June 19, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Extension of Time and Postponement of Hearing by Miami Water & Air, Inc.. Responses due by 7/3/2019 (drz). Added MOTION to Continue on 6/19/2019 (asl).
June 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS Order setting Hearing on #1 Petition/Motion (Complaint) RE: Subpoena from Another District for 6/27/2019 at 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes on 6/10/2019. (jsa)
June 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PAPERLESS ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes for all pretrial matters. Signed by Judge Darrin P. Gayles (lfn)
June 6, 2019 Filing 7 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Robert C. Palmer, III, mailing date June 6, 2019, (pt)
June 6, 2019 Filing 6 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney S. Stewart Haskins and J. Andrew Pratt, mailing date June 6, 2019, (pt)
June 6, 2019 Filing 5 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney Jonathan L. Lewis, mailing date June 6, 2019, (pt)
June 6, 2019 Filing 4 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney R. Trent Taylor, mailing date June 6, 2019, (pt)
June 6, 2019 Filing 3 Bar Letter re: Admissions sent to attorney J. Phillip Warren, mailing date June 6, 2019, (pt)
June 5, 2019 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Darrin P. Gayles. (ar2)
June 5, 2019 Filing 1 Petition/Motion (Complaint) RE: Subpoena from Another District . Filing fee $47.00 receipt number 113C-11705380, filed by JONATHAN COFFEY, VALERIE VAN DYKE, SYDNEY COFFEY. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hancock, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: COFFEY et al v. WCW & AIR, INC. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WCW & AIR, INC.
Represented By: Russell B Buchanan
Represented By: Kelly Overstreet Johnson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOME DEPOT U.S.A., INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: AQUION, INC.
Represented By: Richard Trent Taylor
Represented By: Jonathan L. Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HOME DEPOT, U.S.A., INC.
Represented By: Robert Conrad Palmer, III
Represented By: J. Andrew Pratt
Represented By: S. Stewart Haskins, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VALERIE VAN DYKE
Represented By: Brian Douglas Hancock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JONATHAN COFFEY
Represented By: Brian Douglas Hancock
Represented By: J Phillip Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SYDNEY COFFEY
Represented By: Brian Douglas Hancock
Represented By: J Phillip Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: VALERIE DIANE VAN DYKE
Represented By: Brian Douglas Hancock
Represented By: J Phillip Warren
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?