United Parcel Service Co. & UPS Worldwide Fwd. v. DNJ Logistics Group Inc.
Plaintiff: United Parcel Service Co. & UPS Worldwide Fwd.
Defendant: DNJ Logistics Group Inc. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2019mc24603
Filed: November 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: K Michael Moore
Nature of Suit: Other Statutory Actions
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 9, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 9, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE by United Parcel Service Co. & UPS Worldwide Fwd. of Intent to Serve Subpoena Duces Tecum to Non-Party (Without Deposition) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Sepulveda, Jose)
November 15, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by United Parcel Service Co. & UPS Worldwide Fwd. of Service of Garnishee Answer and Notice of Right to Dissolve Writ (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Sepulveda, Jose)
November 15, 2019 Filing 9 Clerks Motion and Order for Appointment of Vivian Gomez as Process Server. re #4 MOTION for Appointment of Special Process Server filed by United Parcel Service Co. & UPS Worldwide Fwd. Signed by Deputy Clerk (asl)
November 14, 2019 Filing 8 ANSWER to Writ of Garnishment by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. Reply/Objections to Writ Answer due by 12/4/2019. (Herron, Andrew)
November 14, 2019 Filing 7 Writ of Garnishment Returned Executed Date of Service 11/11/2019 (Sepulveda, Jose)
November 13, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE by United Parcel Service Co. & UPS Worldwide Fwd. of Service of Copies of Ex-Parte Motion for Writ of Garnishment after Judgment and Writ of Garnishment (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B) (Sepulveda, Jose)
November 8, 2019 Filing 5 WRIT OF GARNISHMENT issued as to Garnishee JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. in the amount of $7,778,676.00; granting: #3 Motion for Writ of Garnishment. (jas)
November 8, 2019 Filing 4 MOTION for Appointment of Special Process Server by United Parcel Service Co. & UPS Worldwide Fwd.. Responses due by 11/22/2019 (Sepulveda, Jose)
November 8, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION/PETITION for Writ of Garnishment on JPMorgan Chase Bank After Judgment by United Parcel Service Co. & UPS Worldwide Fwd.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Sepulveda, Jose)
November 6, 2019 Civil Case Terminated. Closing Case. (ebz)
November 6, 2019 Filing 2 Judge Assignment to Chief Judge K. Michael Moore (ebz)
November 6, 2019 Filing 1 REGISTRATION of Foreign Judgment Certified. Filing fee $47.00 receipt number 113C-12126590, filed by United Parcel Service Co. & UPS Worldwide Fwd.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Certification)(Sepulveda, Jose)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United Parcel Service Co. & UPS Worldwide Fwd. v. DNJ Logistics Group Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United Parcel Service Co. & UPS Worldwide Fwd.
Represented By: Jose Guillermo Sepulveda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DNJ Logistics Group Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Andrew R. Herron
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?