Charlemagne v. State of Florida
Plaintiff: Linaker Charlemagne
Defendant: State of Florida
Case Number: 1:2020cv20308
Filed: January 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Referring Judge: Lisette M Reid
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 2, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jeffrey Robert Geldens on behalf of Mark Inch, State of Florida. Attorney Jeffrey Robert Geldens added to party Mark Inch(pty:dft), Attorney Jeffrey Robert Geldens added to party State of Florida(pty:dft). (Geldens, Jeffrey)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE 28 U.S.C. 2254. On or before forty-five days from the date of this order the respondent shall file a memorandum of fact and law to show cause why this petition should not be granted. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 2/24/2020. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 INITIAL ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANT. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 2/24/2020. See attached document for full details. (fbn)
February 24, 2020 Filing 6 AMENDED 2254 Petition against Mark Inch filed in response to Order Granting Motion for Leave, filed by Linaker Charlemagne.(pcs)
February 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER FOR AMENDED PETITION 28 U.S.C. 2254. On or before March 5, 2020, petitioner shall file an amended 2254 petition that complies with the applicable rules of procedure set forth in this order, and that cures the pleading deficiencies identified in this order., ( Amended Complaint due by 3/5/2020.) Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 2/4/2020. See attached document for full details. (Attachments: #1 2254 Complaint Form) (fbn)
January 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. USM Service NOT Ordered. Although petitioner did not submit the required trust statement, state judicial records show that he was appointed a public defender during his criminal prosecution. Therefore, the court implicitly grants him IFP status for the purposes of this case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid on 1/27/2020. (js05)
January 24, 2020 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Linaker Charlemagne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Inmate Bank Statements)(ar2)
January 24, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga and Magistrate Judge Lisette M. Reid. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2019-2, this matter is referred to the Magistrate Judge for a ruling on all pre-trial, non-dispositive matters and for a Report and Recommendation on any dispositive matters. (ar2)
January 24, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION/PETITION (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2254. Filing fee $ 5.00. IFP Filed, filed by Linaker Charlemagne. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index to Attachments)(ar2)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Charlemagne v. State of Florida
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: State of Florida
Represented By: Noticing 2254 SAG Miami-Dade/Monroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linaker Charlemagne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?