Liebman v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC et al
Appellee: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC and Futura Miami Invest LLC
Appellant: Andrea Rosen Liebman
Case Number: 1:2020cv20322
Filed: January 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Robert N Scola
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 6, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Katherine Marie Clemente on behalf of Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. Attorney Katherine Marie Clemente added to party Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC(pty:e). (Clemente, Katherine)
February 6, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Brigid F. Cech Samole on behalf of Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC. Attorney Brigid F. Cech Samole added to party Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC(pty:e). (Cech Samole, Brigid)
January 25, 2020 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 5 [service] restricted/sealed until further notice. (jua)
January 25, 2020 Filing 6 Clerks Notice of Docket Correction re 5 Acknowledgment of Receipt. Document Filed in Wrong Case; Document restricted and docket text modified. Document refiled in correct case # 20-MC-20262. (jua)
January 24, 2020 Filing 4 Clerk's Notice to Parties Re Administrative Order 2015-9 and Amendments to Federal Bankruptcy Rules and Local Rule 87.4 Re Processing of Bankruptcy Appeals (jc)
January 24, 2020 Filing 3 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jc)
January 24, 2020 Filing 2 Bankruptcy Transmittal of re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal,, filed by Andrea Rosen Liebman (Attachments: #1 Docket Sheet)(dcn)
January 24, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT [Amended and Second Amended] (received), Bankruptcy Court case number 15-13372-AJC, filed by Andrea Rosen Liebman. (Attachments: #1 ORDER FROM USCA CASE #1810495- CC, Directing Transmission to USBC) [*PLEASE NOTE: This Amended NOA was Originally Filed in USCA Case # 1810495CC on 06/29/2018, and RECEIVED by the Bankruptcy Court on 1/22/2020*], [Second Amended NOA was Originally Filed in USCA Case # 1810495CC on 07/09/2018, and RECEIVED by the Bankruptcy Court on 01/22/2020*])(dcn)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Liebman v. Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Ocwen Loan Servicing, LLC
Represented By: Ari Newman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Futura Miami Invest LLC
Represented By: Robert Conrad Meyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Andrea Rosen Liebman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?