Ramganesh v. Celebrity Cruises, Inc.
Plaintiff: Dhanrajie Ramganesh
Defendant: Celebrity Cruises, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv20542
Filed: February 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER CLOSING CASE. ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the Clerk of the Court is DIRECTED to mark this case CLOSED for statistical purposes only. All motions are denied as moot. The Court nonetheless retains jurisdiction, and the case shall be restored to the active docket upon court order following motion of the parties (with an accompanying proposed scheduling report) advising they are prepared to proceed. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 3/30/2020. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
March 30, 2020 Filing 8 Unopposed MOTION to Stay by Celebrity Cruises, Inc.. Responses due by 4/13/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Applin, Nicholas)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 Order Requiring Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties. Joint Scheduling Report due by 4/3/2020. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 3/23/2020. See attached document for full details. (ls)
March 20, 2020 Filing 6 Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Celebrity Cruises, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Royal Caribbean Cruises Ltd. for Celebrity Cruises, Inc. (Applin, Nicholas)
March 20, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Celebrity Cruises, Inc.. Attorney Nicholas Allen Applin added to party Celebrity Cruises, Inc.(pty:dft). (Applin, Nicholas)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER requiring service to be perfected by 5/6/2020. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 3/2/2020. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
February 6, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Celebrity Cruises, Inc.. (kpe)
February 6, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (kpe)
February 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Celebrity Cruises, Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-12409313, filed by Dhanrajie Ramganesh. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s))(Hoffman, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramganesh v. Celebrity Cruises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dhanrajie Ramganesh
Represented By: Paul M. Hoffman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Celebrity Cruises, Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas Allen Applin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?