MSP Recovery Claims Series LLC v. Amgen, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: MSP Recovery Claims Series LLC
Defendant: Amgen, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Actavis Pharma Inc. and Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv20549
Filed: February 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Federico A Moreno
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2020 Filing 12 ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT. Case transferred from Florida Southern has been opened in District of Delaware as case 1:20-cv-00345, filed 03/09/2020. (jua)
March 9, 2020 SYSTEM ENTRY - Case 1:20-cv-20549 electronically transferred out to Delaware. (mc)
March 9, 2020 Filing 11 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1) transferring case to the District of Delaware re: MDL 2895 for consolidated pretrial proceedings pursuant to 28 USC 1407 and assigned to the Honorable Leonard P. Stark. (Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel). (mc)
February 28, 2020 Civil Case Terminated following #10 ORDER CLOSING CASE. (km02)
February 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER CLOSING CASE FOR STATISTICAL PURPOSES AND PLACING MATTER IN CIVIL SUSPENSE following #9 Stipulation to Extend Defendants' Time to Respond to the Complaint. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 2/28/2020. See attached document for full details. (km02)
February 28, 2020 Filing 9 STIPULATED MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to the Complaint by Amgen, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Bahadue, Suria) Event Modified on 2/28/2020. (scn)
February 27, 2020 Filing 8 Clerks Notice to Filer re #4 Summons Returned Executed,. Incorrect Service Date Entered; ERROR - The incorrect service date was entered. The correction was made by the Clerk and filing was re-docketed, see DE# 7 . It is not necessary to refile this document. (jas)
February 26, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by MSP Recovery Claims Series LLC. Actavis Pharma Inc. served on 2/11/2020, answer due 3/3/2020. (See DE#4 for document image). (jas)
February 26, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by MSP Recovery Claims Series LLC. Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc. served on 2/11/2020, answer due 3/3/2020. (Rivero, Andres)
February 26, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by MSP Recovery Claims Series LLC. Amgen, Inc. served on 2/7/2020, answer due 2/28/2020. (Rivero, Andres)
February 26, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by MSP Recovery Claims Series LLC. Actavis Pharma Inc. served on 2/112020, answer due 3/3/2020 (Rivero, Andres) Date Modified on 3/2/2020 (cqs).
February 6, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Actavis Pharma Inc., Amgen, Inc., Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., Watson Laboratories, Inc.. (cds)
February 6, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Federico A. Moreno. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds)
February 6, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-12412446, filed by MSP Recovery Claims Series LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Summon(s), #8 Summon(s), #9 Summon(s), #10 Summon(s))(Rivero, Andres)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: MSP Recovery Claims Series LLC v. Amgen, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amgen, Inc.
Represented By: Suria Marie Bahadue
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Actavis Pharma Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Watson Laboratories, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MSP Recovery Claims Series LLC
Represented By: David Lee DaPonte
Represented By: Jorge Alejandro Mestre
Represented By: Charles Edward Whorton
Represented By: Andres Rivero
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?