Bushmans Inc., a Wisconsin corporation v. American Fruit & Produce Corp et al
Plaintiff: Bushmans Inc., a Wisconsin corporation
Defendant: Hugo Acosta, Jr., David Acosta, American Fruit & Produce Corp, Daniel Acosta and Michael Acosta
Case Number: 1:2020cv20644
Filed: February 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07 U.S.C. ยง 0499
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 21, 2020 Filing 25 JUDGMENT in favor of Bushmans Inc., a Wisconsin corporation, and against American Fruit & Produce Corp, David Acosta and Hugo Acosta, Jr. Bushmans Inc.s claims against Defendants, Daniel Acosta and Michael Acosta are DISMISSED without prejudice. Closing Case. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 2/21/2020. See attached document for full details. (scn) Spacing Modified on 2/21/2020 (scn)
February 21, 2020 Filing 24 Summons (Affidavit) Returned Unexecuted by Bushmans Inc., a Wisconsin corporation as to Michael Acosta. (De Falco, Steven)
February 21, 2020 Filing 23 Summons (Affidavit) Returned Unexecuted by Bushmans Inc., a Wisconsin corporation as to Daniel Acosta. (De Falco, Steven)
February 21, 2020 Filing 22 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Bushmans Inc., a Wisconsin corporation. Hugo Acosta, Jr served on 2/18/2020, answer due 3/10/2020. (De Falco, Steven)
February 21, 2020 Filing 21 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Bushmans Inc., a Wisconsin corporation. David Acosta served on 2/18/2020, answer due 3/10/2020. (De Falco, Steven)
February 21, 2020 Filing 20 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Bushmans Inc., a Wisconsin corporation. American Fruit & Produce Corp served on 2/18/2020, answer due 3/10/2020. (De Falco, Steven)
February 20, 2020 Filing 19 STIPULATION re #18 Temporary Restraining Order,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings, #16 Temporary Restraining Order,,,,, Set/Reset Hearings,,,,, Set/Reset Motion/R&R Deadlines and Hearings,,,, Stipulation for Judgment, For Order Dissolving Temporary Restraining Order, and For Dismissal of Claims Against Daniel Acosta and Michael Acosta, ONLY, Without Prejudice by Bushmans Inc., a Wisconsin corporation (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(De Falco, Steven)
February 18, 2020 Filing 17 CLERK'S NOTICE of Compliance by Unsealing #11 , #12 , #13 , #14 pursuant to #16 Order (nc)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER re EX PARTE MOTION Temporary Restraining Order by Bushmans Inc., a Wisconsin corporation. ( Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 2/28/2020 01:00 PM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom.) Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 2/14/2020. See attached document for full details. (cbr)
February 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER granting #11 Ex-Parte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order; This Temporary Restraining Order is entered this 14th day of February, 2020 at 4:00 p.m., and shall remain in full force and effect until February 28, 2020, unless extended for good cause shown upon motion duly filed and served on all parties. A hearing on Plaintiff's Motion for Issuance of Preliminary Injunction, ECF No. #15 , is set for Friday, February 28 at 1:00 p.m. Any response or opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Issuance of Preliminary Injunction, ECF No. #15 , must be filed and served on Plaintiff's counsel by February 26, 2020. Defendants are on notice that failure to appear at the hearing may result in the imposition of a preliminary injunction against them. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 65. The Motion for Ex-Parte Temporary Restraining Order, ECF No. #11 , and the supporting materials, ECF Nos. #12 , #13 , and #14 , shall be unsealed and this Order shall not be filed under seal. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 2/14/2020. See attached document for full details. (wc)
February 14, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Bushmans Inc., a Wisconsin corporation. (De Falco, Steven)
February 14, 2020 Filing 14 Ex Parte Document Certification of Counsel as to Why Notice is not Required Pursuant to Rule 65(b) [DE 11] by Bushmans Inc., a Wisconsin corporation. (De Falco, Steven) Modified by Unsealing Document per #16 Order on 2/18/2020 (nc).
February 14, 2020 Filing 13 Ex Parte Document Declaration of Plaintiff in Support of Ex Parte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order [DE 11] by Bushmans Inc., a Wisconsin corporation. (De Falco, Steven) Modified by Unsealing Document per #16 Order on 2/18/2020 (nc).
February 14, 2020 Filing 12 Ex Parte Document Memorandum in Support of Ex Parte Motion for Temporary Restraining Order [DE 11] by Bushmans Inc., a Wisconsin corporation. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (De Falco, Steven) Modified by Unsealing Document per #16 Order on 2/18/2020 (nc).
February 14, 2020 Filing 11 EX PARTE MOTION Temporary Restraining Order by Bushmans Inc., a Wisconsin corporation. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (De Falco, Steven) Modified by Unsealing Document per #16 Order on 2/18/2020 (nc).
February 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Order Requiring Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 2/13/2020. See attached document for full details. (drz)
February 13, 2020 Filing 9 Corrected Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bushmans Inc., a Wisconsin corporation (De Falco, Steven)
February 13, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Bushmans Inc., a Wisconsin corporation (De Falco, Steven)
February 13, 2020 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Daniel Acosta. (drz)
February 13, 2020 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Michael Acosta. (drz)
February 13, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to David Acosta. (drz)
February 13, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Hugo Acosta, Jr. (drz)
February 13, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to American Fruit & Produce Corp. (drz)
February 13, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (drz)
February 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-12448612, filed by Bushmans Inc., a Wisconsin corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) - American Fruit & Produce, Corp., #3 Summon(s) - Hugo Acosta, #4 Summon(s) - David Acosta, #5 Summon(s) - Michael Acosta, #6 Summon(s) - Daniel Acosta)(De Falco, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bushmans Inc., a Wisconsin corporation v. American Fruit & Produce Corp et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hugo Acosta, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: David Acosta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Fruit & Produce Corp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Acosta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Acosta
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bushmans Inc., a Wisconsin corporation
Represented By: Steven M. De Falco
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?