Andean Life, LLC v. Barry Callebaut U.S.A. LLC
Plaintiff: Andean Life, LLC
Defendant: Barry Callebaut U.S.A. LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv20765
Filed: February 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Edwin G Torres
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 PAPERLESS ORDER granting in part and denying in part #16 motion to amend mediation deadlines. The Court's scheduling order #10 is amended as follows. The Parties shall file a notice scheduling mediation on or before June 30, 2020. The Parties shall complete mediation by July 31, 2020. The parties are responsible for ensuring that within three business days of the mediation, a mediation report is filed, indicating whether the case settled (in full or in part), was continued with the consent of the parties, or whether the mediator declared an impasse. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 4/10/2020. (sgi)
April 9, 2020 Filing 16 Joint MOTION to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order to Change Deadlines for Scheduling and Completing Mediation by Barry Callebaut U.S.A. LLC. Responses due by 4/23/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Amending Scheduling Order)(Drummond, Alexandre)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #12 Plaintiff's Motion to Strike Affirmative Defenses. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 4/8/2020. See attached document for full details. (js02)
April 2, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION to Strike #5 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Counterclaim filed by Barry Callebaut U.S.A. LLC. Replies due by 4/9/2020. (Drummond, Alexandre)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER REFERRING #12 MOTION to Strike #5 Affirmative Defenses. THIS MATTER is before the Court on a sua sponte review of the record. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636 and the Magistrate Rules of the Local Rules for the Southern District of Florida, Plaintiff's motion #12 is REFERRED to United States Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres to take any appropriate action required by law. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 3/30/2020. (sgi)
March 20, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION to Strike #5 ANSWER to Complaint (Notice of Removal), Counterclaim by Andean Life, LLC. Responses due by 4/3/2020 (Fors, Jorge)
March 20, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER to Counterclaim by Andean Life, LLC. Attorney Jorge Luis Fors added to party Andean Life, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Jorge Luis Fors added to party Andean Life, LLC(pty:cd). (Fors, Jorge)
March 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 4/12/2021 in Miami Division before Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Calendar Call set for 4/6/2021 11:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 3/11/2020. See attached document for full details. (jao) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
March 10, 2020 Filing 9 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Barry Callebaut U.S.A. LLC (Drummond, Alexandre)
March 10, 2020 Filing 8 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Barry Callebaut U.S.A. LLC (Drummond, Alexandre)
March 6, 2020 Filing 7 STATUS REPORT of Removal by Barry Callebaut U.S.A. LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - State Court Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - Affidavit of Philipp Muheim)(Drummond, Alexandre)
March 6, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by Barry Callebaut U.S.A. LLC of Index of Docket Entries in State Court Pursuant to this Court's February 25 Order (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1 - State Court Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Ex. 2 - Complaint, #3 Exhibit Ex. 3 - Civil Action Summons, #4 Exhibit Ex. 4 - ESummons, #5 Exhibit Ex. 5 - Notice of Removal to Federal Court, #6 Exhibit Ex. 6 - State Court Docket) (Drummond, Alexandre)
February 28, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint re the Notice of Removal , COUNTERCLAIM against Andean Life, LLC by Barry Callebaut U.S.A. LLC. (Drummond, Alexandre)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres for Discovery Matters and Notice of Court Practice in Removal Cases. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 2/25/2020. See attached document for full details. (jbs)
February 24, 2020 Filing 3 Defendant's MOTION for Leave to File Exhibit 3 to Notice of Removal Under Seal by Barry Callebaut U.S.A. LLC. (Drummond, Alexandre)
February 21, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jbs)
February 21, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Andean Life, LLC v. Barry Callebaut USA, LLC) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-12493768, filed by Barry Callebaut U.S.A. LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Service of Process and Complaint, #2 Exhibit Andean Secretary of State Filing, #3 Exhibit Notice of Filing of Removal, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure)(Drummond, Alexandre)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Andean Life, LLC v. Barry Callebaut U.S.A. LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Barry Callebaut U.S.A. LLC
Represented By: Alexandre S Drummond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Andean Life, LLC
Represented By: Jorge Luis Fors, Jr.
Represented By: Jorge Luis Fors
Represented By: Fernando A. Prego
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?