Campbell v. Acting Secretary for the United States Department of Homeland Security et al
Petitioner: Boyd Campbell
Respondent: Acting Secretary Chad Wolf, Field Office Director, Miami Field Office, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Attorney General William Barr, Attorney General of the United States and Acting Secretary for the United States Department of Homeland Security
Case Number: 1:2020cv20768
Filed: February 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Edwin G Torres
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 30 PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS MATTER is before the Court on Respondent's motion to dismiss for lack of jurisdiction #26 . The motion argues that this matter should be dismissed as moot because Petitioner was released from ICE's custody on April 7, 2020. In a motion #27 seeking leave to file a response, Petitioner's counsel confirmed that he has been released. Accordingly, upon review of the motion and the record, it is ORDERED that Respondent's motion to dismiss is GRANTED. The telephonic hearing set for tomorrow, April 9, 2020 at 10:00 AM is CANCELLED. This case is CLOSED and all other pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 4/8/2020. (jws)
April 8, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE by Field Office Director, Miami Field Office, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement re 23 Order on Motion to Expedite,,, (Attachments: #1 Affidavit) (Bailyn, Jonathan)
April 7, 2020 Filing 28 RESPONSE to Motion re #27 MOTION for Leave to File response to motion to dismiss by April 10, 2020 filed by Field Office Director, Miami Field Office, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. Replies due by 4/14/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, E-mail Notice)(Bailyn, Jonathan)
April 7, 2020 Filing 27 MOTION for Leave to File response to motion to dismiss by April 10, 2020 by Boyd Campbell. (Prada, Mark)
April 7, 2020 Filing 26 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #20 MOTION to Expedite consideration of habeas petition, #24 Renewed MOTION to Expedite , #1 Application/Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus, by Field Office Director, Miami Field Office, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. Responses due by 4/21/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Letter re: Stay, #2 Exhibit B, Release Notification)(Bailyn, Jonathan)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 PAPERLESS ORDER Setting Telephonic Status Conference. THIS MATTER is before the Court on a sua sponte review of the record. A Telephonic Status Conference is SET for April 9, 2020 at 10:00 AM in the Miami Division before Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Defendants shall file their response required in the Court's prior order 23 by April 8, 2020 at 12:00 PM. The Parties shall dial in 5 minutes before the scheduled start of the telephonic hearing. Dial Toll-Free Number: 1-888-684-8852 Access Code: 7369700# Security Code: 1133#. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 4/6/2020. (jws)
April 6, 2020 Filing 24 Renewed MOTION to Expedite by Boyd Campbell. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Petitioner, #3 Exhibit 2 - Emails re: POCR, #4 Exhibit 3 - Email to DO Martinez, #5 Exhibit 4 - POCR Evidence, #6 Exhibit 5 - Emails re POCR Decision, #7 Exhibit 6 - Email re Interview, Etc, #8 Exhibit 7 - Herald, Coronavirus among Fla Inmates, #9 Exhibit 8 - Article, Panic in Immigration Courts, #10 Exhibit 9 - Declaration, Former ICE Director, Sandweg, J, #11 Exhibit 10 - Time, Makeshift Morgues, #12 Exhibit 11 - Fla. Exec. Orders, #13 Exhibit 12 - Declaration, DO Jenkins, #14 Exhibit 13 - ICE PBNDS Standards, #15 Exhibit 14 - Compiled Decisions, #16 Exhibit 15 - Herald, Monroe Jail Ends Contract with ICE)(Prada, Mark)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 PAPERLESS ORDER. Pursuant to the discussion held today, April 1, 2020, during the telephonic status conference, the Court RESERVES its ruling on Petitioner's motion for expedited consideration of his habeas petition. #20 . As stated during the hearing, the Court will analyze the reasonable foreseeability of Petitioner's removal--as required under Zadvydas--in light of the continuously changing circumstances surrounding the global pandemic. The Court has ordered the Respondent to provide additional information regarding the steps being taken to ensure the health and safety of Petitioner while he is detained at Krome. This supplemental information shall be filed with the Court by April 8, 2020. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 4/1/2020. (jws)
April 1, 2020 Filing 22 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Kathleen M. Williams: Telephone Conference held on 4/1/2020. Counsel of record present. Court Reporter: Patricia Sanders, 305-523-5548 / Patricia_Sanders@flsd.uscourts.gov. (mso)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 PAPERLESS ORDER Setting Telephonic Hearing. A telephonic hearing is set on Petitioner's habeas petition #1 for Wednesday, April 1, 2020 at 2:00 PM in the Miami Division before Judge Kathleen M. Williams. The Parties shall use the following dial-in information. Please dial in 5 minutes before the scheduled start of the hearing. Dial Toll-Free Number: 1-888-684-8852 Access Code: 7369700# Security Code: 1133#. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 3/30/2020. (jws)
March 29, 2020 Filing 20 MOTION to Expedite consideration of habeas petition by Boyd Campbell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Letter of Pros. Allen and Rich, #2 Exhibit B - Conlin Declaration, #3 Exhibit C - Marsha Hardy Declaration, #4 Exhibit D - Venters Declaration)(Prada, Mark)
March 10, 2020 Filing 19 REPLY to Response to Motion re #5 MOTION for Order to Show Cause , #17 MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Government's Response Brief filed by Boyd Campbell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Order of Supervision, #2 Exhibit 2 - Document Preservation Request, #3 Exhibit 3 - Stay Application)(Prada, Mark)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PAPERLESS ORDER. Petitioner's motion to file a reply to the response to the Court's order to show cause is GRANTED. Petitioner's reply shall be filed by March 11, 2020 and shall not exceed 15 pages. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 3/9/2020. (jws)
March 9, 2020 Filing 17 MOTION for Leave to File Reply to Government's Response Brief by Boyd Campbell. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Prada, Mark)
March 6, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE to #1 Application/Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus, by Acting Secretary for the United States Department of Homeland Security, Attorney General of the United States, Field Office Director, Miami Field Office, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O)(Bailyn, Jonathan)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Gregory P. Copeland. The Clerk shall add pro hac counsel as co-counsel for Petitioner. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 3/2/2020. (EGT)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #12 Respondent's Motion for Extension of Time. For good cause shown, Respondent's motion for an extension of time is GRANTED. Respondent shall respond to the Order to Show Cause by March 6, 2020. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 3/2/2020. (jws)
March 2, 2020 Filing 13 RESPONSE in Opposition re #12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Application/Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by Boyd Campbell. Replies due by 3/9/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Jenkins Communications, #2 Exhibit 2 - Gamboa Communications)(Prada, Mark)
March 1, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Application/Petition (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus, by Field Office Director, Miami Field Office, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. (Bailyn, Jonathan)
February 26, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Gregory P. Copeland. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-12516925 by Boyd Campbell. Responses due by 3/11/2020 (Prada, Mark)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE (Show Cause Response due by 3/3/2020.), Acting Secretary for the United States Department of Homeland Security (Chad F. Wolf) and Attorney General of the United States (William Barr) terminated. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 2/25/2020. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PAPERLESS ORDER granting in part and denying in part #6 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The motion is Granted in part only as to Attorney Sarah T. Gillman, who shall be added as pro hac counsel for Petitioner. The motion is Denied for any remaining counsel included in the motion as Admin. Order. 2020-9 requires payment of $200.00 per attorney seeking pro hac admission. A renewed motion, with the appropriate fee, may be filed as to other counsel seeking admission. Signed by Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres on 2/25/2020. (EGT)
February 25, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jonathan Bailyn on behalf of Acting Secretary for the United States Department of Homeland Security, Attorney General of the United States, Field Office Director, Miami Field Office, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement. Attorney Jonathan Bailyn added to party Acting Secretary for the United States Department of Homeland Security(pty:res), Attorney Jonathan Bailyn added to party Attorney General of the United States(pty:res), Attorney Jonathan Bailyn added to party Field Office Director, Miami Field Office, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement(pty:res). (Bailyn, Jonathan)
February 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER OF REFERRAL AND NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES, referring case to Magistrate Judge Edwin G. Torres for Pretrial Non-Dispositive Matters. Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 2/25/2020. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
February 25, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Gregory P. Copeland, and Sarah T. Gillman. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-12507881 by Boyd Campbell. Responses due by 3/10/2020 (Prada, Mark)
February 25, 2020 Filing 5 MOTION for Order to Show Cause by Boyd Campbell. (Prada, Mark)
February 24, 2020 Filing 4 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Electronic Case. Party(ies) Improperly Formatted. The Filer failed to enter the party name(s) in accordance with the CM/ECF Format for Adding Parties for Attorneys Guide. The correction was made. It is not necessary to re-file the document. (pcs)
February 24, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Acting Secretary for the United States Department of Homeland Security, Attorney General of the United States, Field Office Director, Miami Field Office, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement and U.S. Attorney (pcs)
February 21, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. (pcs)
February 21, 2020 Filing 1 APPLICATION/PETITION (Complaint) for Writ of Habeas Corpus pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 2241 and Motion for Order to Show Cause. Filing fee $ 5.00 receipt number AFLSDC-12494490, filed by Boyd Campbell. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Civil Cover Sheet, #7 Motion for Order to Show Cause, #8 Summon(s))(Prada, Mark)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Campbell v. Acting Secretary for the United States Department of Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Acting Secretary Chad Wolf
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Field Office Director, Miami Field Office, U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Jonathan Bailyn
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Represented By: Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General William Barr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Attorney General of the United States
Represented By: Jonathan Bailyn
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Represented By: Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Acting Secretary for the United States Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Jonathan Bailyn
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Represented By: Noticing 2241/Bivens US Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Boyd Campbell
Represented By: Mark Andrew Prada
Represented By: Sarah T. Gillman
Represented By: Gregory P. Copeland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?