Meaux v. Carnival Cruise Line et al
Plaintiff: Adonis Meaux
Defendant: Carnival Cruise Line North America, Carnival plc, Carnival Cruise Line, Motor Vessel Carnival Horizon and Carnival Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv20795
Filed: February 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Ursula Ungaro
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER OF REFERRAL TO MEDIATION. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 4/14/2020. See attached document for full details. (jao)
April 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 SCHEDULING ORDER FOR PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND TRIAL: Amended Pleadings due by 5/8/2020. Discovery due by 10/9/2020. Expert Discovery due by 10/9/2020. Joinder of Parties due by 5/8/2020. In Limine Motions due by 10/30/2020. Dispositive Motions due by 10/30/2020. Motions due by 10/30/2020. Pretrial Stipulation due by 11/6/2020. Jury Trial set for 1/4/2021 09:00 AM before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Calendar Call set for 12/30/2020 01:00 PM before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Pretrial Conference set for 12/11/2020 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 4/14/2020. See attached document for full details. (jao) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here. (jao).
April 9, 2020 Filing 15 Defendants' CARNIVAL CORPORATION and CARNIVAL CRUISE LINE NORTH AMERICA ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Carnival Corporation, Carnival Cruise Line, Carnival Cruise Line North America. Attorney John Michael Magee added to party Carnival Cruise Line(pty:dft), Attorney John Michael Magee added to party Carnival Cruise Line North America(pty:dft). (Magee, John)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER - Defendants Carnival plc and Motor Vessel Carnival Horizon (its corpus, officers and/or crew) are dismissed without prejudice. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 4/8/2020. See attached document for full details. (scn)
April 8, 2020 Filing 13 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 Carnival Corporation served on 3/19/2020, answer due 4/9/2020. (drz)
April 8, 2020 Filing 12 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 Carnival Cruise Line North America served on 3/19/2020, answer due 4/9/2020. (drz)
April 8, 2020 Filing 11 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 Carnival Cruise Line served on 3/19/2020, answer due 4/9/2020. (drz)
April 7, 2020 Filing 10 Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by Carnival Corporation (Magee, John)
April 7, 2020 Filing 9 Defendant's ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Carnival Corporation. Attorney John Michael Magee added to party Carnival Corporation(pty:dft). (Magee, John)
March 17, 2020 Set Hearing per Order on DE #8 , Initial Planning and Scheduling Conference set for 4/24/2020 10:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro. (jao)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE; Show Cause Response due by 4/7/2020. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 3/17/2020. See attached document for full details. (jao)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Setting Initial Planning and Scheduling Conference: ( Scheduling Conference set for 4/3/2020 10:00 AM before Judge Ursula Ungaro.) Joint Scheduling Report due by 3/20/2020 Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 2/25/2020. See attached document for full details. (jbs)
February 26, 2020 Filing 6 CORRECTED Clerks Notice of Receipt of Filing Fee received on 2/25/2020 in the amount of $ 400.00, receipt number FLS100203973. (vt)
February 25, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Carnival Corporation, Carnival Cruise Line, Carnival Cruise Line North America. (pcs)
February 25, 2020 Filing 4 Clerks Notice of Receipt of Filing Fee received on 2/24/2020 in the amount of $ 400.00, receipt number FLS100203973. (vt)
February 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER OF INSTRUCTIONS TO PRO SE LITIGANT Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 2/24/2020. See attached document for full details. (jbs)
February 24, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Ursula Ungaro. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
February 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Carnival Corporation, Carnival Cruise Line, Carnival Cruise Line North America, Carnival plc, Motor Vessel Carnival Horizon. Filing fees $ 400.00, filed by Adonis Meaux. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s), #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(pcs) (Additional attachment(s) added on 2/24/2020: #3 Check) (pcs).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Meaux v. Carnival Cruise Line et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carnival Cruise Line North America
Represented By: John Michael Magee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carnival plc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carnival Cruise Line
Represented By: John Michael Magee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Motor Vessel Carnival Horizon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carnival Corporation
Represented By: John Michael Magee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Adonis Meaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?