Sexual MD Solutions, LLC v. Wolff et al
Plaintiff: Sexual MD Solutions, LLC
Defendant: Moon Pool, LLC, Dustin Wolff, Stephanie Wolff, Wolff Marketing Enterprises LLC and Novus Anti-Aging Center, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv20824
Filed: February 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: John J O'Sullivan
Referring Judge: Ursula Ungaro
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Notice of Removal
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 199 ORDER of DISMISSAL from USCA. Pursuant to Appellants Moon Pool, LLC, Novus Anti-Aging Center, Inc., Dustin Wolff, Stephanie Wolff and Wolff Marketing Enterprises LLC's motion for voluntary dismissal, FRAP Rule 42 and 11th Cir. R. 42-1(a), the above referenced appeal was duly entered dismissed re #142 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, filed by Moon Pool, LLC. USCA #20-11871-C. (apz)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 198 ORDER DISMISSING CASE with prejudice, vacating and dissolving the #125 #126 Preliminary Injunction, denying as moot #67 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss and #141 Defendants' Motion to Stay, cancelling the June 28, 2021 trial and all pretrial hearings and deadlines and Closing Case. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 6/9/2020. See attached document for full details. (mkr)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 197 NOTICE of Settlement and Joint Stipulation for Voluntary Dismissal with Prejudice by Sexual MD Solutions, LLC (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Beaulieu, Andrew)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 196 ORDER granting #195 Motion to Stay as to all pretrial deadlines and filing deadlines only. The #126 preliminary injunction remains in place. The parties shall file a joint status report concerning the settlement no later than June 19, 2020. Status Report due by 6/19/2020. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 6/5/2020. See attached document for full details. (mkr)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 195 Joint MOTION to Stay Plaintiff and Defendants by Moon Pool, LLC. Responses due by 6/19/2020 (Berman, Andrew)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 192 HEARING EXHIBITS 15 by Moon Pool, LLC, Novus Anti-Aging Center, Inc., Dustin Wolff, Stephanie Wolff, Wolff Marketing Enterprises LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defs Ex 15)(Webner, Jamie)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 194 Amended Exhibit and Witness List by Dustin Wolff.. (nf)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 193 Third Amended Exhibit and Witness List by Sexual MD Solutions, LLC. (nf)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 191 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan: Evidentiary Hearing on Defendants' Motion for Contempt, Sanctions and to Modify Preliminary Injunction, DE #134 , held on 5/29/2020 Witnesses Dustin Wolff, Mark White and Peter Godwin testified. Total time in court: 4 hour(s) : 30 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Andrew Scott Berman, Jayashree Mitra, Jamie Leigh Webner, Rasheed M. McWilliams, Joshua Shore, Andrew Edward Beaulieu, Alice Ferot, Jeffrey W. Gutchess, Richard Serafan and Barry Bloom. Court Reporter: Vernita Allen-Williams, 305-523-5048 / Vernita_Allen-Williams@flsd.uscourts.gov. (Digital 09:39:18) (cg1)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 190 HEARING EXHIBITS 2 by Sexual MD Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2)(Ferot, Alice)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 189 ORDER regarding preservation of Facebook pages. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 5/29/2020. See attached document for full details. (mkr)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 188 ORDER denying #134 Expedited Motion for Contempt, Sanctions, and to Modify Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 5/29/2020. See attached document for full details. (mkr)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 187 REPLY to Response to Motion re #134 EXPEDITED MOTION For Contempt, For Sanctions, and to Modify Preliminary Injunction (refiled unredacted as per the Court's instructions) filed by Sexual MD Solutions, LLC. (Ferot, Alice)
May 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 186 ORDER denying #179 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File under Seal and requiring the plaintiff to file the fully unreadacted reply and plaintiff's exhibit 2 not under seal. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 5/29/2020. See attached document for full details. (mkr)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 184 HEARING EXHIBITS 1-42 by Sexual MD Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 through 10, #2 Exhibit 11 through 20, #3 Exhibit 21 through 30, #4 Exhibit 31 through 42)(Ferot, Alice)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 183 HEARING EXHIBITS 1-22 by Moon Pool, LLC, Novus Anti-Aging Center, Inc., Dustin Wolff, Stephanie Wolff, Wolff Marketing Enterprises LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Defs Exs 1-21, #2 Exhibit Defs Ex 22)(Webner, Jamie)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 182 Exhibit and Witness List Amended Exhibit and Witness List by Moon Pool, LLC, Novus Anti-Aging Center, Inc., Dustin Wolff, Stephanie Wolff, Wolff Marketing Enterprises LLC.. (Webner, Jamie)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 181 Exhibit and Witness List (Third Amended) by Sexual MD Solutions, LLC.. (Ferot, Alice)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 180 ORDER denying without prejudice #179 Motion to Seal, requiring the plaintiff to submit to the Court an unredacted version of the reply and requiring the parties to be prepared to argue why the motion to seal should be granted at the 5/29/2020 hearing. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 5/28/2020. See attached document for full details. (mkr)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 179 Unopposed MOTION to Seal DE #178 Defendant's Reply in Support of Contempt, Sanctions, and to Modify Preliminary Injunction per Local Rule 5.4 by Sexual MD Solutions, LLC. (Shore, Joshua)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 178 REPLY to Response to Motion re #134 EXPEDITED MOTION For Contempt, For Sanctions, and to Modify Preliminary Injunction filed by Sexual MD Solutions, LLC. (Shore, Joshua)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 176 ORDER Scheduling Mediation before Herbert M. Stettin. Mediation Hearing set for 6/3/2020 10:30 AM. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 5/28/2020. See attached document for full details. (mkr)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 185 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (1805721)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 175 ORDER requiring non-party Jay Campbell's response to the subpoena no later than 6/4/2020. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 5/27/2020. See attached document for full details. (mkr)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 174 Exhibit and Witness List (Second Amended) by Sexual MD Solutions, LLC.. (Ferot, Alice)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 173 ORDER denying #165 Motion for Expedited Motion to Shorten the Time for Jay Campbell to Respond to Subpoena, requiring Peter C. Godwin's deposition to take place on 5/28/2020, requiring the parties to file exhibits on the docket and provide the Court with hardcopies by 5/28/2020, requiring the plaintiff to provide notice of any objections to the defendants' expert by noon on 5/28/2020 and requiring a joint notice regarding the trial by 6/26/2020. Miscellaneous Deadline 5/28/2020. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 5/27/2020. See attached document for full details. (mkr)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 172 CLERK'S NOTICE THAT DEFENDANT'S EXHIBITS 1-14 AND 16-21 WERE ADMITTED AT THE TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE HELD 5/27/20. (cg1)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 171 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan: Telephone Conference held on 5/27/2020. Total time in court: 45 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Andrew Scott Berman, Jayashree Mitra, Jamie Leigh Webner, Rasheed M. McWilliams, Andrew Edward Beaulieu, Alice Ferot, Jeffrey W. Gutchess and Richard Serafan. (Digital 15:34:19) (cg1)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 170 Exhibit and Witness List (Amended) by Sexual MD Solutions, LLC.. (Ferot, Alice)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 169 Exhibit and Witness List by Sexual MD Solutions, LLC.. (Ferot, Alice)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 168 Exhibit and Witness List of All Defendants by Moon Pool, LLC.. (Berman, Andrew)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 167 RESPONSE to Motion re #134 EXPEDITED MOTION For Contempt, For Sanctions, and to Modify Preliminary Injunction filed by Jon Hoffman. Attorney William Barry Blum added to party Jon Hoffman(pty:ip). Replies due by 6/2/2020. (Blum, William)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 166 RESPONSE in Opposition re #165 Plaintiff's MOTION for Discovery to Shorten the Time for Jay Campbell to Respond to Subpoena (Expedited) All Defendants filed by Moon Pool, LLC. Replies due by 6/2/2020. (Berman, Andrew)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 165 Plaintiff's MOTION for Discovery to Shorten the Time for Jay Campbell to Respond to Subpoena (Expedited) by Sexual MD Solutions, LLC. Responses due by 6/9/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Declaration of Nicole Lopez, #2 Exhibit B Service of Subpoena and Order by Email)(Ferot, Alice)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 164 ORDER requiring the parties to submit the form order scheduling mediation to the Court by 5/29/2020 for the mediation to be completed by 6/19/2020 and by 6/25/2020 for the mediation to be completed by 1/4/2021. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 5/26/2020. See attached document for full details. (mkr)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 163 REPLY to Response to Motion re #141 MOTION to Stay re #126 Order, Preliminary Injunction, #125 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction Expedited Motion by all Defendants filed by Moon Pool, LLC. (Berman, Andrew)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 162 ORDER requiring the parties to exchange exhibit and witness lists by 9:00 AM on 5/27/2020, attempt to agree to the admissibility of exhibits and to file exhibit and witness lists including any objections by noon on 5/27/2020.(Exhibit List and Witness List due by 5/27/2020). Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 5/26/2020. See attached document for full details. (mkr)
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 161 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. Show Cause Hearing set for 5/29/2020 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan. At that show cause hearing, the plaintiff shall be prepared to prove by clear and convincing evidence that the defendants have violated the Court's #126 Preliminary Injunction and the defendants will be provided with the opportunity to refute the evidence presented by the plaintiff. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 5/26/2020. See attached document for full details. (mkr)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 177 Clerks Notice to Filer re 158 Sealed Document, 157 Sealed Document. Document Not Captioned; In the future the Filer must File a Notice of Filing with the attached Exhibits with the proper caption pursuant to Local Rules. It is not necessary to re-file these documents. (nc)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 160 REPLY to Response to Motion re #67 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #43 Amended Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #43 Amended Complaint All Defendants filed by Moon Pool, LLC. (Berman, Andrew)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 159 RESPONSE to Motion re #134 EXPEDITED MOTION For Contempt, For Sanctions, and to Modify Preliminary Injunction Objections to Evidence in Motion filed by Moon Pool, LLC. Replies due by 5/29/2020. (Berman, Andrew)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 155 RESPONSE in Opposition re #134 EXPEDITED MOTION For Contempt, For Sanctions, and to Modify Preliminary Injunction All Defendants filed by Moon Pool, LLC. Replies due by 5/29/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Affidavit Jon Hoffman, #3 Affidavit Dustin Wolff, #4 Affidavit Jay Campbell, #5 Affidavit Jonathan Karchmer)(Berman, Andrew)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 154 RESPONSE in Opposition re #141 MOTION to Stay re #126 Order, Preliminary Injunction, #125 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction Expedited Motion by all Defendants filed by Sexual MD Solutions, LLC. Replies due by 5/29/2020. (Beaulieu, Andrew)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 153 ORDER granting #152 Motion to File Under Seal. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 5/22/2020. See attached document for full details. (mkr)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 152 MOTION to Seal Defendants (Unopposed) per Local Rule 5.4 by Moon Pool, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order) (Berman, Andrew)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 158 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (520748)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 157 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (520748)
May 22, 2020 Opinion or Order SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 156 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (520748)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 151 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Jamie Leigh Webner on behalf of Moon Pool, LLC, Novus Anti-Aging Center, Inc., Dustin Wolff, Stephanie Wolff, Wolff Marketing Enterprises LLC. Attorney Jamie Leigh Webner added to party Moon Pool, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Jamie Leigh Webner added to party Novus Anti-Aging Center, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Jamie Leigh Webner added to party Dustin Wolff(pty:dft), Attorney Jamie Leigh Webner added to party Stephanie Wolff(pty:dft), Attorney Jamie Leigh Webner added to party Wolff Marketing Enterprises LLC(pty:dft). (Webner, Jamie)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 150 Acknowledgment of Receipt of NOA from USCA re #142 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, filed by Moon Pool, LLC. Date received by USCA: 5/18/20. USCA Case Number: 20-11871-C. (hh)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 149 ORDER regarding subpoena directed at non-party Jay Campbell. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 5/18/2020. See attached document for full details. (mkr)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 148 ORDER regarding subpoena directed at non-party Jon Hoffman. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 5/18/2020. See attached document for full details. (mkr)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 147 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #143 Motion for Leave to Conduct Expedited Discovery, re-setting briefing schedule on #134 EXPEDITED MOTION For Contempt, For Sanctions, and to Modify Preliminary Injunction filed by Sexual MD Solutions, LLC (Response due by 5/22/2020; Reply due by 5/28/2020 at noon) and setting Telephonic Status Conference for 5/27/2020 03:30 PM in Miami Division before Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 5/18/2020. See attached document for full details. (mkr)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 146 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan: Motion Hearing held on 5/18/2020 re #143 MOTION to Expedite Discovery filed by Sexual MD Solutions, LLC. Total time in court: 20 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Andrew Scott Berman, Jayashree Mitra, Rasheed M. McWilliams, Andrew Edward Beaulieu, Jeffrey W. Gutchess. (Digital 15:00:00) (cg1)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 145 ORDER setting briefing schedule as to #141 MOTION to Stay re #126 Order, Preliminary Injunction, #125 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction Expedited Motion by all Defendants (Responses due by 5/22/2020, Replies due by 5/26/2020). Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 5/18/2020. See attached document for full details. (mkr)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER Setting Hearing on #143 MOTION to Expedite Discovery: Telephonic Motion Hearing set for 5/18/2020 03:00 PM in Miami Division before Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 5/18/2020. See attached document for full details. (mkr)
May 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Transmission of Notice of Appeal, Orders under appeal and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals re #142 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal, Notice has been electronically mailed. (apz)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 143 MOTION to Expedite Discovery by Sexual MD Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Requests for Production to Defendants, #2 Exhibit Subpoena Duces Tecum Directed to J. Hoffman, #3 Exhibit Subpoena Duces Tecum Directed to J. Campbell)(Beaulieu, Andrew)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 142 Notice of Interlocutory Appeal by all Defendants as to #126 Order, Preliminary Injunction, #125 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Moon Pool, LLC. Filing fee $ 505.00 receipt number AFLSDC-12893242. Within fourteen days of the filing date of a Notice of Appeal, the appellant must complete the Eleventh Circuit Transcript Order Form regardless of whether transcripts are being ordered [Pursuant to FRAP 10(b)]. For information go to our FLSD website under Transcript Information. (Berman, Andrew)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 141 MOTION to Stay re #126 Order, Preliminary Injunction, #125 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction Expedited Motion by all Defendants by Novus Anti-Aging Center, Inc.. Responses due by 5/29/2020 (Berman, Andrew)
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 140 NOTICE by Sexual MD Solutions, LLC of Filing Evidence of Defendants Continuing Violation of the Courts Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Beaulieu, Andrew)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 139 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. The parties are required to participate in two mediations: an initial mediation no later than Friday, June 19, 2020 and a final mediation no later than Monday, January 4, 2021. (Mediation Deadline 6/19/2020; Mediation Deadline 1/4/2021). Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 5/14/2020. See attached document for full details. (mkr)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 138 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for 6/28/2021 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan. Calendar Call set for 6/24/2021 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/27/2021 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan. Discovery due by 11/11/2020. Expert Discovery due by 12/18/2020. Motions due by 1/19/2021. The Court hereby adopts all other deadlines as indicated in the #56 parties' Appendix A Proposed Schedule. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 5/14/2020. See attached document for full details. (mkr) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER setting briefing schedule and tentative evidentiary hearing date, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to #134 EXPEDITED MOTION For Contempt, For Sanctions, and to Modify Preliminary Injunction .( Responses due by 5/19/2020, Replies due by 5/22/2020., Motion Hearing set for 5/29/2020 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan). Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 5/14/2020. See attached document for full details. (mkr)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 136 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan: Status Conference held on 5/14/2020. Total time in court: 20 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Andrew Scott Berman, Jayashree Mitra, Rasheed M. McWilliams, Joshua Shore, Andrew Edward Beaulieu, Jeffrey W. Gutchess. (Digital 11:11:57) (cg1)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 135 NOTICE by Sexual MD Solutions, LLC Declaration of Mark White in Support of Expedited Motion For Contempt, For Sanctions, and to Modify Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Errata Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F) (Shore, Joshua)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 134 EXPEDITED MOTION For Contempt, For Sanctions, and to Modify Preliminary Injunction by Sexual MD Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Beaulieu, Andrew)
May 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 133 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #104 Motion to Seal Defendants Exhibit 92 (FILED UNDER PROTEST) per Local Rule 5.4 by Moon Pool, LLC, Novus Anti-Aging Center, Inc., Dustin Wolff, Stephanie Wolff, Wolff Marketing Enterprises LLC. No response was filed. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 5/13/2020. (mkr)
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 132 ORDER granting #131 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to #67 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #43 Amended Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #43 Amended Complaint filed by Dustin Wolff. Reply due by 5/22/2020 and may exceed the page limit by (5) additional pages. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 5/12/2020. See attached document for full details. (mkr)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 131 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #129 Response in Opposition to Motion, and to exceed page limit by 5 pages by Moon Pool, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berman, Andrew)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 130 Preliminary Injuction Bond BOND in the amount of $635,000.00 posted by Sexual MD Solutions, LLC Approved by Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan (drz)
May 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 129 RESPONSE in Opposition re #67 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #43 Amended Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #43 Amended Complaint filed by Sexual MD Solutions, LLC. Replies due by 5/15/2020. (Shore, Joshua)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 128 ORDER granting #127 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response to #67 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #43 Amended Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #43 Amended Complaint filed by Dustin Wolff. Responses due by 5/8/2020. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 5/7/2020. See attached document for full details. (mkr)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 127 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #67 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #43 Amended Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #43 Amended Complaint by Sexual MD Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Ferot, Alice)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 126 PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION ORDER. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 5/6/2020. See attached document for full details. (mkr)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 125 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #62 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 5/6/2020. See attached document for full details. (mkr)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 124 ORDER Setting Status Conference and granting #122 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to #67 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #43 Amended Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #43 Amended filed by Sexual MD Solutions, LLC. (Status Conference set for 5/14/2020 11:00 AM in Miami Division before Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan) Set/Reset Deadlines as to #67 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #43 Amended Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #43 Amended Complaint , (Responses due by 5/7/2020, Replies due by 5/18/2020). Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 4/29/2020. See attached document for full details. (mkr)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 123 ORDER OF REFERENCE-REFERRING CASE to Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan for Trial. Judge Ursula Ungaro no longer assigned as presider/referral judge(s) in case., Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 4/29/2020. See attached document for full details. (drz)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 122 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #67 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #43 Amended Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #43 Amended Complaint by Sexual MD Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Beaulieu, Andrew)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 121 TRANSCRIPT of Temporary Injunction/Evidentiary Hearing held on 04/24/2020 before Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan, 1-243 pages, Court Reporter: Patricia Diaz, 305-523-5178 / Patricia_Diaz@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 5/19/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/29/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/27/2020. (Diaz, Patricia)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 120 Joint Notice and Consent to Jurisdiction US Magistrate Judge signed by all parties . Filed by Sexual MD Solutions, LLC (Ferot, Alice)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 118 HEARING EXHIBITS 1-42 by Sexual MD Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 through 42)(Ferot, Alice)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 117 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #116 Motion to Strike #106 Notice (Other) filed by Moon Pool, LLC. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 4/27/2020. (mkr)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 116 Plaintiff's MOTION to Strike #106 Notice (Other) Defendant's Advice to Court by Sexual MD Solutions, LLC. Responses due by 5/11/2020 (Shore, Joshua)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 115 CLERK'S NOTICE of Compliance by Sealing [76-1],[98-1] pursuant to #114 Order on Motion to Seal (nc)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 114 ORDER granting #102 Motion to Seal. The Clerk of the Court is directed to SEAL DE# [76-1] and DE# [98-1]. The plaintiff shall re-file these documents in accordance with this Order. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 4/27/2020. See attached document for full details. (mkr)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 113 ORDER RE-SETTING INITIAL PLANNING AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE: Scheduling Conference set for 5/29/2020 10:30 AM before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 4/27/2020. See attached document for full details. (drz)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 119 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (1805721)
April 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 106 (STRICKEN by DE# 117.) NOTICE by Moon Pool, LLC re #62 Renewed MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Defendants' Advice to Court (Berman, Andrew) Modified to reflect "stricken" on 4/27/2020 (wc).
April 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 112 Clerks Notice to Filer re 105 Sealed Document. Document Not Captioned; In the future when Filing a Sealed Document, the Filer must File a Notice of Filing with Attached Exhibits with the proper caption pursuant to Local Rules. It is not necessary to re-file this document. (nc)
April 25, 2020 Filing 104 MOTION to Seal Defendants Exhibit 92 (FILED UNDER PROTEST) per Local Rule 5.4 by Moon Pool, LLC, Novus Anti-Aging Center, Inc., Dustin Wolff, Stephanie Wolff, Wolff Marketing Enterprises LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Ferot 4-22-2020 email), #2 Exhibit B (Redacted DX 92)) (Berman, Andrew)
April 25, 2020 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 105 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (520748)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 103 ORDER requiring the defendants to respond to #102 Plaintiff's MOTION to Seal Plaintiff's Exhibit 22 per Local Rule 5.4 filed by Sexual MD Solutions, LLC, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as to #102 Plaintiff's MOTION to Seal Plaintiff's Exhibit 22 per Local Rule 5.4.( Responses due by 4/27/2020 at noon). Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 4/24/2020. See attached document for full details. (mkr)
April 24, 2020 Filing 102 Plaintiff's MOTION to Seal Plaintiff's Exhibit 22 per Local Rule 5.4 by Sexual MD Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion) (Ferot, Alice)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 101 ORDER denying #97 Motion to Strike Reply. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 4/24/2020. See attached document for full details. (mkr)
April 23, 2020 Filing 100 RESPONSE in Opposition re #97 MOTION to Strike #87 Reply to Response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Sexual MD Solutions, LLC. Replies due by 4/30/2020. (Shore, Joshua)
April 23, 2020 Filing 98 HEARING EXHIBITS 1-42 by Sexual MD Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 through 42)(Ferot, Alice)
April 23, 2020 Filing 97 MOTION to Strike #87 Reply to Response to Motion by Moon Pool, LLC, Novus Anti-Aging Center, Inc., Dustin Wolff, Stephanie Wolff, Wolff Marketing Enterprises LLC. Responses due by 5/7/2020 (Berman, Andrew)
April 23, 2020 Filing 96 Exhibit and Witness List by Sexual MD Solutions, LLC.. (Ferot, Alice)
April 23, 2020 Filing 95 Proposed Findings of Fact and Proposed Conclusions of Law by Moon Pool, LLC, Novus Anti-Aging Center, Inc., Dustin Wolff, Stephanie Wolff, Wolff Marketing Enterprises LLC. (Berman, Andrew)
April 23, 2020 SYSTEM ENTRY - Docket Entry 99 [misc] restricted/sealed until further notice. (1805721)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 94 STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 4/21/2020. See attached document for full details. (drz)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 93 ORDER granting #65 Motion for Protective Order. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 4/21/2020. See attached document for full details. (drz)
April 22, 2020 Filing 92 Proposed Findings of Fact and Proposed Conclusions of Law by Sexual MD Solutions, LLC. (Beaulieu, Andrew)
April 22, 2020 Filing 91 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #86 Motion to File Exhibit under Seal. The plaintiff is permitted to file its exhibit in support of its Reply to the Motion for Temporary Injunction under seal. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 4/22/2020. (mkr)
April 22, 2020 Filing 90 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #89 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall have until noon on April 23, 2020, to file their proposed findings of fact and conclusions of law. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 4/22/2020. (mkr)
April 22, 2020 Filing 89 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proposed Findings of Fact and Conclusions of Law re 84 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer, #71 Order by Moon Pool, LLC, Novus Anti-Aging Center, Inc., Dustin Wolff, Stephanie Wolff, Wolff Marketing Enterprises LLC. Responses due by 5/6/2020 (Berman, Andrew)
April 22, 2020 Filing 88 HEARING EXHIBITS Amended Deposition Designations Per DE#71 52 by Moon Pool, LLC, Novus Anti-Aging Center, Inc., Dustin Wolff, Stephanie Wolff, Wolff Marketing Enterprises LLC. Related document: #77 Exhibits,,,,,,, filed by Wolff Marketing Enterprises LLC, Dustin Wolff, Stephanie Wolff, Moon Pool, LLC, Novus Anti-Aging Center, Inc., #71 Order. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 52 (amended))(Berman, Andrew)
April 21, 2020 Filing 87 REPLY to Response to Motion re #62 Renewed MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Sexual MD Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Declaration of M. White and Attached Exhibits)(Beaulieu, Andrew)
April 21, 2020 Filing 86 Plaintiff's MOTION to Seal per Local Rule 5.4 by Sexual MD Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Motion) (Ferot, Alice)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 85 ORDER REFERRING #62 Renewed MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Sexual MD Solutions, LLC. Motion referred to Judge John J. O'Sullivan. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 4/21/2020. See attached document for full details. (drz)
April 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 84 ORDER granting #81 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply. The plaintiff shall have until April 21, 2020, to file its reply in support of its motion for a preliminary injunction. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 4/21/2020. See attached document for full details. (mkr)
April 21, 2020 Filing 83 Clerks Notice to Filer re #81 Plaintiff's MOTION for Extension of Time to File Reply re #62 Renewed MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . Wrong Motion Relief(s) Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong motion relief(s) when docketing the motion. The correction was made by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future motions filed must include applicable reliefs. (ls)
April 20, 2020 Filing 82 RESPONSE in Opposition re #81 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #62 Renewed MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Moon Pool, LLC, Novus Anti-Aging Center, Inc., Dustin Wolff, Stephanie Wolff, Wolff Marketing Enterprises LLC. Replies due by 4/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Berman, Andrew)
April 20, 2020 Filing 81 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #62 Renewed MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Sexual MD Solutions, LLC. Responses due by 5/4/2020 (Shore, Joshua) Modified Relief on 4/21/2020 (ls).
April 20, 2020 Filing 80 STIPULATION : Joint Stipulation of Consent to the United States Magistrate Judges Jurisdiction for the Adjudication of Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Sexual MD Solutions, LLC (Ferot, Alice)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 79 ORDER granting #74 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. The plaintiff may file a Reply to the #69 Response to the Motion for Preliminary Injunction that does not exceed fifteen (15) pages. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 4/20/2020. See attached document for full details. (mkr)
April 20, 2020 Filing 78 Exhibit and Witness List by Sexual MD Solutions, LLC.. (Ferot, Alice)
April 19, 2020 Filing 77 HEARING EXHIBITS 1-91 by Moon Pool, LLC, Novus Anti-Aging Center, Inc., Dustin Wolff, Stephanie Wolff, Wolff Marketing Enterprises LLC. Related document: #68 Exhibit List filed by Dustin Wolff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36A, #37 Exhibit 36B, #38 Exhibit 37, #39 Exhibit 38, #40 Exhibit 39, #41 Exhibit 40, #42 Exhibit 41, #43 Exhibit 42, #44 Exhibit 43, #45 Exhibit 44, #46 Exhibit 45, #47 Exhibit 46, #48 Exhibit 47, #49 Exhibit 48, #50 Exhibit 49, #51 Exhibit 50, #52 Exhibit 51, #53 Exhibit 52, #54 Exhibit 53, #55 Exhibit 54, #56 Exhibit 55, #57 Exhibit 56, #58 Exhibit 57, #59 Exhibit 58, #60 Exhibit 59, #61 Exhibit 60, #62 Exhibit 61, #63 Exhibit 62, #64 Exhibit 63, #65 Exhibit 64, #66 Exhibit 65, #67 Exhibit 66, #68 Exhibit 67, #69 Exhibit 68, #70 Exhibit 69, #71 Exhibit 70, #72 Exhibit 71, #73 Exhibit 72, #74 Exhibit 73, #75 Exhibit 74, #76 Exhibit 75, #77 Exhibit 76, #78 Exhibit 77, #79 Exhibit 78, #80 Exhibit 79, #81 Exhibit 80, #82 Exhibit 81, #83 Exhibit 82, #84 Exhibit 83, #85 Exhibit 84, #86 Exhibit 85, #87 Exhibit 86, #88 Exhibit 87, #89 Exhibit 88, #90 Exhibit 89, #91 Exhibit 90, #92 Exhibit 91)(Berman, Andrew)
April 19, 2020 Filing 76 HEARING EXHIBITS 1-26 by Sexual MD Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 through 26)(Ferot, Alice)
April 18, 2020 Filing 75 AFFIDAVIT in Opposition re #62 Renewed MOTION for Preliminary Injunction April 16, 2020 Declaration of Dustin Wolff (already filed as ECF 69-1) with Exhibits filed by Dustin Wolff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L, #13 Exhibit M, #14 Exhibit N, #15 Exhibit O)(Berman, Andrew)
April 17, 2020 Filing 74 Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Sexual MD Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Beaulieu, Andrew)
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 73 ORDER granting #64 Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom for the 4/24/2020 evidentiary hearing. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 4/17/2020. See attached document for full details. (mkr)
April 17, 2020 Filing 72 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan: Status Conference held on 4/17/2020.DEFENDANT'S EXHIBITS 1-91 ADMITTED. PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBITS 1-26 ADMITTED. Total time in court: 40 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Andrew Scott Berman, Joshua M. Masur, Jayashree Mitra, Rasheed M. McWilliams, Andrew Edward Beaulieu, Alice Ferot, Jeffrey W. Gutchess. (Digital 10:01:47) (cg1)
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER following status hearing on 4/17/2020. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 4/17/2020. See attached document for full details. (mkr)
April 17, 2020 Filing 70 Witness List Revised List of all Defendants by Dustin Wolff.. (Berman, Andrew)
April 17, 2020 Filing 69 RESPONSE in Opposition re #62 Renewed MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Refiled all Defendants filed by Dustin Wolff. Replies due by 4/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Dustin Wolff w/o exhibits, #2 Affidavit Jon Hoffman, #3 Affidavit Stephanie Wolff)(Berman, Andrew)
April 17, 2020 PAPERLESS NOTICE RESETTING HEARING **TIME CHANGE ONLY** Evidentiary Hearing reset for 4/24/2020 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan. (cg1)
April 16, 2020 Filing 68 Exhibit List Second Amended by Dustin Wolff.. (Berman, Andrew)
April 16, 2020 Filing 67 Defendant's MOTION TO DISMISS #43 Amended Complaint FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM , Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #43 Amended Complaint ( Responses due by 4/30/2020) by Dustin Wolff. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Dustin Wolff, #2 Affidavit Jon Hoffman, #3 Affidavit Stephanie Wolff)(Berman, Andrew)
April 16, 2020 Filing 66 Exhibit List Amended of all Defendants re injunction hearing by Dustin Wolff.. (Berman, Andrew)
April 16, 2020 Filing 65 Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Sexual MD Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Beaulieu, Andrew)
April 16, 2020 Filing 64 Joint MOTION to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom by Sexual MD Solutions, LLC. Responses due by 4/30/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Beaulieu, Andrew)
April 6, 2020 Filing 63 NOTICE of Filing Exhibits by Sexual MD Solutions, LLC re #62 Renewed MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Part 1, #2 Exhibit A Part 2) (Ferot, Alice) Modified text on 4/7/2020 (kpe).
April 6, 2020 Filing 62 Renewed MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Sexual MD Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Beaulieu, Andrew)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 61 ORDER granting #57 MOTION to Strike #55 Reply to Response to Motion Dustin Wolff and filed by Moon Pool, LLC, denying without prejudice to renew #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Sexual MD Solutions, LLC, setting additional deadlines and re-setting hearing dates (Motion Deadline 4/6/2020, Response due by 4/16/2020, Reply due by 4/20/2020., Evidentiary Hearing re-set for 4/24/2020 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan., Status Conference re-set for 4/17/2020 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan). Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 4/1/2020. See attached document for full details. (mkr)
April 1, 2020 Filing 60 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan: Motion Hearing held on 4/1/2020 re #57 MOTION to Strike #55 Reply to Response to Motion Dustin Wolff and filed by Moon Pool, LLC. Total time in court: 34 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Andrew Scott Berman, Joshua M. Masur, Rasheed M. McWilliams, Andrew Edward Beaulieu, Jeffrey W. Gutchess. (Digital 10:00:06) (cg1)
March 31, 2020 Filing 59 RESPONSE to Motion re #57 MOTION to Strike #55 Reply to Response to Motion Dustin Wolff and filed by Sexual MD Solutions, LLC. Replies due by 4/7/2020. (Beaulieu, Andrew)
March 30, 2020 Filing 58 PAPERLESS ORDER Setting Telephonic Hearing on Motion #57 MOTION to Strike #55 Reply to Response to Motion Dustin Wolff: Telephonic Motion Hearing set for 4/1/2020 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan. At the time of the hearing, the parties shall call the Court's audio conference number (888) 363-4735 and enter the access code 7229437#. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 3/30/2020. See attached document for full details. (mkr) Modified text on 3/30/2020 (mf).
March 30, 2020 Filing 57 MOTION to Strike #55 Reply to Response to Motion Dustin Wolff and by Moon Pool, LLC. Responses due by 4/13/2020 (Berman, Andrew)
March 27, 2020 Filing 56 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f) by Sexual MD Solutions, LLC (Ferot, Alice)
March 25, 2020 Filing 55 STRICKEN REPLY to Response to Motion re #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Sexual MD Solutions, LLC. (Beaulieu, Andrew) Modified on 4/1/2020 stricken per de# 61 (dj).
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 54 ORDER resetting The Initial Planning and Scheduling Conference: Scheduling Conference set for 5/1/2020 09:30 AM before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 3/25/2020. See attached document for full details. (drz)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 53 ORDER granting in part and denying in part #52 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document Moon Pool, LLC. Answer due 4/17/2020; Dustin Wolff. Answer due 4/17/2020. Re: #43 Amended Complaint filed by Sexual MD Solutions, LLC. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 3/24/2020. See attached document for full details. (drz)
March 23, 2020 Filing 52 Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #43 Amended Complaint All Defendants by Novus Anti-Aging Center, Inc.. (Berman, Andrew)
March 23, 2020 Filing 51 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew Scott Berman on behalf of Wolff Marketing Enterprises LLC. Attorney Andrew Scott Berman added to party Wolff Marketing Enterprises LLC(pty:dft). (Berman, Andrew)
March 23, 2020 Filing 50 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew Scott Berman on behalf of Stephanie Wolff. Attorney Andrew Scott Berman added to party Stephanie Wolff(pty:dft). (Berman, Andrew)
March 23, 2020 Filing 49 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew Scott Berman on behalf of Novus Anti-Aging Center, Inc.. Attorney Andrew Scott Berman added to party Novus Anti-Aging Center, Inc.(pty:dft). (Berman, Andrew)
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 48 ORDER granting #47 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply to #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Sexual MD Solutions, LLC. Reply due by 3/25/2020. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 3/23/2020. See attached document for full details. (mkr)
March 23, 2020 Filing 47 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #29 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Sexual MD Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Beaulieu, Andrew)
March 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 46 ORDER re #19 Corrected Motion to Dismiss with Corrected Motion to Dismiss Exhibits the Declarations filed by Dustin Wolff, Moon Pool, LLC, All Defendants. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 3/20/2020. See attached document for full details. (lk)
March 20, 2020 Set/Reset Answer Due Deadline: APRIL 1, 2020 as per DE #46 All Defendants. (lk)
March 19, 2020 Filing 45 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on #43 Amended Complaint into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Stephanie Wolff, Wolff Marketing Enterprises LLC and Novus Anti-Aging Center, Inc.. (Gutchess, Jeffrey)
March 19, 2020 Filing 44 Clerks Notice to Filer re #43 Amended Complaint. Parties/Mediator Not Added. ERROR. The Filer failed to add all parties from the complaint/petition/removal etc. Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Entry of Parties Listed into CM/ECF and add the additional parties. (lbc)
March 18, 2020 Filing 43 AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Sexual MD Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Agreement)(Beaulieu, Andrew)
March 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER re-setting status conference **TIME CHANGE ONLY** ( Status Conference re-set for 4/7/2020 11:00 AM in Miami Division before Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan). Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 3/18/2020. See attached document for full details. (mkr)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER following status hearing on 3/16/2020 re: #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Sexual MD Solutions, LLC, as to #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction . ( Miscellaneous Deadline 4/6/2020, Replies due by 3/23/2020, Evidentiary Hearing set for 4/9/2020 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan., Status Conference set for 4/7/2020 10:15 AM in Miami Division before Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan). Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 3/16/2020. See attached document for full details. (mkr)
March 16, 2020 Filing 40 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan: Status Conference held on 3/16/2020. Total time in court: 10 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Andrew Scott Berman, Joshua M. Masur, Jayashree Mitra, Andrew Edward Beaulieu, Alice Ferot, Jeffrey W. Gutchess. (Digital 12:59:59) (cg1)
March 13, 2020 Filing 39 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #28 Motion for Witnesses to Appear Remotely. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 3/18/2020. (mkr)
March 13, 2020 Filing 38 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan: Status Conference held on 3/13/2020. Total time in court: 35 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Andrew Scott Berman, Joshua M. Masur, Jayashree Mitra, Rasheed M. McWilliams, Andrew Edward Beaulieu, Alice Ferot, Jeffrey W. Gutchess.PLAINTIFF'S EXHIBITS 1-30 ADMITTED. DEFENDANT'S EXHIBITS 1-3,5-10 AND 14-16 ADMITTED. (Digital 15:33:10) (cg1) Modified on 3/13/2020 to add exhibits admitted. (cg1)
March 12, 2020 Filing 37 Exhibit and Witness List for the March 18, 2020 evidentiary hearing filed by Sexual MD Solutions, LLC.. (Beaulieu, Andrew)
March 12, 2020 Filing 36 Exhibit and Witness List Moon Pool LLC and by Dustin Wolff.. (Berman, Andrew)
March 12, 2020 Filing 35 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #33 Motion for Judicial Notice. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 3/12/2020. (mkr)
March 12, 2020 Filing 34 APPENDIX to #29 Response in Opposition to Motion, by Dustin Wolff (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Dustin Wolff, #2 Affidavit Jon Hoffman)(Berman, Andrew)
March 12, 2020 Filing 33 Renewed MOTION Request for Judicial Notice re #29 Response in Opposition to Motion, Moon Pool LLC and by Dustin Wolff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11)(Berman, Andrew)
March 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER denying #27 Request for Judicial Notice re: Exhibits, filed by Dustin Wolff. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 3/12/2020. See attached document for full details. (mkr)
March 12, 2020 Filing 31 Clerk's Notice to Filer re #30 Appendix. Document Not Captioned; CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED - The Filer must File a Notice of Striking, then refile the document with the proper caption pursuant to Local Rules. (wc)
March 11, 2020 Filing 30 APPENDIX to #29 Response in Opposition to Motion, Moon Pool LLC and by Dustin Wolff (Attachments: #1 Affidavit Jon Hoffman)(Berman, Andrew)
March 11, 2020 Filing 29 RESPONSE in Opposition re #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction Moon Pool LLC and filed by Dustin Wolff. Replies due by 3/18/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 2 to Request for Judicial Notice, #2 Exhibit 7 to Request for Judicial Notice, #3 Affidavit Stephanie Wolff)(Berman, Andrew)
March 11, 2020 Filing 28 MOTION Motion for Witnesses to Appear Remotely Moon Pool and by Dustin Wolff. (Berman, Andrew)
March 11, 2020 Filing 27 HEARING EXHIBITS Request for Judicial Notice by Dustin Wolff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11)(Berman, Andrew)
March 11, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Andrew Edward Beaulieu on behalf of Sexual MD Solutions, LLC. Attorney Andrew Edward Beaulieu added to party Sexual MD Solutions, LLC(pty:pla). (Beaulieu, Andrew)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER granting #24 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Rasheed M. McWilliams. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 3/10/2020. See attached document for full details. (drz)
March 10, 2020 Filing 24 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Rasheed M. McWilliams. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-12581655 by Dustin Wolff. Responses due by 3/24/2020 (Attachments: #1 Certification)(Berman, Andrew)
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER granting #21 Motion for Substitution of Counsel. Attorney Andrew S. Berman, Esq. added. Attorney Jennifer Ann Kerr terminated. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 3/10/2020. See attached document for full details. (drz)
March 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER denying as moot #16 Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction; denying as moot #16 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim( Responses due by 3/23/2020); denying as moot #18 Motion for Leave to File. Clerks Notice: Filer must separately re-file the amended pleading pursuant to Local Rule 15.1, unless otherwise ordered by the Judge; granting #19 Motion for Leave to File. Clerks Notice: Filer must separately re-file the amended pleading pursuant to Local Rule 15.1, unless otherwise ordered by the Judge. Re: #19 Corrected MOTION for Leave to File Agreed to Correct Scrivener's Error in Motion to Dismiss with Corrected Motion to Dismiss Exhibits the Declarations filed by Dustin Wolff, Moon Pool, LLC. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 3/9/2020. See attached document for full details. (drz)
March 9, 2020 Filing 21 STIPULATED MOTION for Substitution of Counsel. Substituting Andrew S. Berman, Jamie L. Webner for Jennifer A. Kerr by Moon Pool, LLC and by Dustin Wolff. Attorney Andrew Scott Berman added to party Dustin Wolff(pty:dft). Responses due by 3/23/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Berman, Andrew)
March 6, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE by Moon Pool, LLC, Dustin Wolff re #19 Corrected MOTION for Leave to File Agreed to Correct Scrivener's Error in Motion to Dismiss with Corrected Motion to Dismiss Exhibits the Declarations, #16 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),,, MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and for Motion to Transfer Venue Notice of Filing Dustin Wolff's Declaration (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Declaration of Dustin Wolff 4 pages) (Kerr, Jennifer)
March 5, 2020 Filing 19 Corrected MOTION for Leave to File Agreed to Correct Scrivener's Error in Motion to Dismiss with Corrected Motion to Dismiss Exhibits the Declarations by Moon Pool, LLC, Dustin Wolff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Corrected Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit to Corrected Motion to Dismiss - Dustin Wolff (Exhibit A to Corrected Motion to Dismiss), #3 Exhibit B to Corrected Motion to Dismiss (Jon Hoffman Declaration to Corrected Motion to Dismiss))(Kerr, Jennifer)
March 5, 2020 Filing 18 Agreed MOTION for Leave to File to Correct Scrivener's Error in Motion to Dismiss by Moon Pool, LLC, Dustin Wolff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Corrected Motion to Dismiss)(Kerr, Jennifer)
March 5, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE by Sexual MD Solutions, LLC re #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order Granting Preliminary Injunction) (Ferot, Alice)
March 4, 2020 Filing 16 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),,, , MOTION TO DISMISS #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),,, FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM and for Motion to Transfer Venue ( Responses due by 3/18/2020) by Moon Pool, LLC, Dustin Wolff. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: Declaration of Dustin Wolff to Support Motion to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(2), #2 Exhibit B: Declaration of Jon Hoffman to Support Motion to Dismiss Under Rule 12(b)(2))(Kerr, Jennifer)
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Order Setting Initial Planning and Scheduling Conference: Joint Scheduling Report due by 3/27/2020 Scheduling Conference set for 4/10/2020 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 3/3/2020. See attached document for full details. (drz)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER requiring the plaintiff to provide a proposed order as required by the Local Rules as to #13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Sexual MD Solutions, LLC Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 3/2/2020. See attached document for full details. (mkr)
March 2, 2020 Filing 13 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Sexual MD Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A GAINSWave Membership Agreement)(Ferot, Alice)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Joshua M. Masur. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 3/2/2020. See attached document for full details. (drz)
March 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #10 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Jayashree Mitra. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 3/2/2020. See attached document for full details. (drz)
February 27, 2020 Filing 10 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Jayashree Mitra. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-12524221 by Moon Pool, LLC, Dustin Wolff. Responses due by 3/12/2020 (Attachments: #1 Certification Jayashree Mitra, #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice)(Kerr, Jennifer)
February 27, 2020 Filing 9 First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Joshua M. Masur. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-12524189 by Moon Pool, LLC, Dustin Wolff. Responses due by 3/12/2020 (Attachments: #1 Certification Joshua M. Masur, Esq., #2 Text of Proposed Order Granting Pro Hac Vice)(Kerr, Jennifer)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER following status hearing on Motion for Temporary Injunction held on 2/27/2020. (Witness and Exhibit Lists due by 3/12/2020 at 5:00 PM, Responses due by 3/11/2020, Replies due by 3/16/2020, Evidentiary Hearing set for 3/18/2020 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan, Status Conference set for 3/13/2020 03:30 PM in Miami Division before Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan). Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 2/27/2020. See Order for additional deadlines. (mkr)
February 27, 2020 Filing 7 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan: Status Conference held on 2/27/2020. Total time in court: 21 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Joshua Masur, Jayashree Mitra, Jennifer Ann Kerr, Alice Ferot, Jeffrey W. Gutchess, Andrew Beaulieu. (Digital 10:01:37) (cg1)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER Setting Status Conference: Status Conference set for 2/27/2020 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan. Signed by Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan on 2/26/2020. See attached document for full details. (mkr)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Ch. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan with notices (NEFs for Events only) for all filings in case. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 2/26/2020. See attached document for full details. (drz)
February 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER re #1 Notice of Removal (State Court Complaint),,, filed by Dustin Wolff, Moon Pool, LLC, Moon Pool, LLC response due 3/4/2020; Dustin Wolff response due 3/4/2020. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 2/26/2020. See attached document for full details. (drz)
February 26, 2020 Filing 3 CLERK'S NOTICE - attorney admissions is unable to send Bar letters to non-member attorneys Joshua M. Masur and Jayashree Mitra. Pursuant to Rule 5.1a6, a signature block with the name, address, telephone number and email address of all counsel is required. Non-member attorneys Joshua M. Masur and Jayashree Mitra are required to file a motion for Pro Hac Vice appearance if they wish to to participate and appear in this case. Contact information in CM/ECF is not current. See website for sample motion at www.flsd.uscourts.gov. (pt)
February 26, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Ursula Ungaro. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (drz)
February 26, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (STATE COURT COMPLAINT - Sexual MD Solutions, LLC v. Dustin Wolff and Moon Pool, LLC) Filing fee $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-12511562, filed by Moon Pool, LLC, Dustin Wolff. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit 1: Complaint, #3 Exhibit 2: Motion for Injunction, #4 Exhibit 3: Return of Service on Wolff, #5 Exhibit 4: Return of Service on Moon Pool, LLC, #6 Exhibit 5: D. Wolff Declaration, #7 Exhibit 6: Hoffman Declaration, #8 Exhibit 7: Phillips Declaration, #9 Exhibit 8: A. Wolff Declaration, #10 Exhibit 9: Ceccarelli Declaration, #11 Exhibit 10: Thompson Declaration, #12 Exhibit 11: Roberts Declaration, #13 Exhibit 12: Kerr Declaration)(Kerr, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sexual MD Solutions, LLC v. Wolff et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Moon Pool, LLC
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Kerr
Represented By: Jayashree Mitra
Represented By: Joshua Masur
Represented By: Joshua M. Masur
Represented By: Rasheed M. McWilliams
Represented By: Andrew Scott Berman
Represented By: Jamie Leigh Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dustin Wolff
Represented By: Jennifer Ann Kerr
Represented By: Jayashree Mitra
Represented By: Joshua Masur
Represented By: Joshua M. Masur
Represented By: Rasheed M. McWilliams
Represented By: Andrew Scott Berman
Represented By: Jamie Leigh Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Wolff
Represented By: Andrew Scott Berman
Represented By: Jamie Leigh Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wolff Marketing Enterprises LLC
Represented By: Andrew Scott Berman
Represented By: Jamie Leigh Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Novus Anti-Aging Center, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Scott Berman
Represented By: Jamie Leigh Katz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sexual MD Solutions, LLC
Represented By: Joshua Shore
Represented By: Alice Ferot
Represented By: Jeffrey W. Gutchess
Represented By: Andrew Edward Beaulieu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?