WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. v. Caballero et al
Plaintiff: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.
Defendant: Banco Continental, S.A., Inversiones Continental (Panama), S.A. de C.V., Banco De Los Trabajadores S.A., Christopher T. Janis, GRUPO CONTINENTAL, Jonathan N. Janis, Marc Gonsalves, Josh Pescatore, Richard Pescatore, Jordan Pescatore, Jada Pescatore, Carol Pescatore Harpster, BANCO CONTINENTAL S.A., Jarrod Pescatore, Carolyn Pescatore, Keith Stansell, John Pescatore, Judith G. Janis, Antonio Caballero, Thomas Howes, Michael I. Janis, BANTRAB, Olivia Pescatore and BANCO HONDURAS
Case Number: 1:2020cv20868
Filed: February 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery/Enforcement
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1335
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2020 Filing 36 PAPERLESS NOTICE of Hearing on #35 MOTION for Permanent Injunction Under 28 U.S.C. 2361: Motion Hearing set for 5/5/2020 02:00 PM in Miami Division before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. (ps1)
April 17, 2020 Filing 35 MOTION for Permanent Injunction Under 28 U.S.C. 2361 by WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Klein, Jonathan)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #31 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga (CMA)
April 8, 2020 Filing 33 TRANSCRIPT of the Telephone Conference held on 03/19/20, before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga, 1-21 pages, Court Reporter: Stephanie McCarn, 305-523-5518 / Stephanie_McCarn@flsd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased by contacting the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 4/29/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 5/11/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 7/7/2020. (smn)
April 7, 2020 Filing 32 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell (Korvick, Tony)
April 7, 2020 Filing 31 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Nathan Tarnor. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-12708983 by Carol Pescatore Harpster, Carolyn Pescatore, Jada Pescatore, Jarrod Pescatore, John Pescatore, Jordan Pescatore, Josh Pescatore, Olivia Pescatore, Richard Pescatore. Attorney Tony P. Korvick added to party Carol Pescatore Harpster(pty:dft), Attorney Tony P. Korvick added to party Carolyn Pescatore(pty:dft), Attorney Tony P. Korvick added to party Jada Pescatore(pty:dft), Attorney Tony P. Korvick added to party Jarrod Pescatore(pty:dft), Attorney Tony P. Korvick added to party John Pescatore(pty:dft), Attorney Tony P. Korvick added to party Jordan Pescatore(pty:dft), Attorney Tony P. Korvick added to party Josh Pescatore(pty:dft), Attorney Tony P. Korvick added to party Olivia Pescatore(pty:dft), Attorney Tony P. Korvick added to party Richard Pescatore(pty:dft). Responses due by 4/21/2020 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certification of Nathan Tarnor, Esq., #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Korvick, Tony)
April 6, 2020 Filing 30 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Interpleader Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.. Banco Continental, S.A. served on 4/4/2020, answer due 4/27/2020; Inversiones Continental (Panama), S.A. de C.V. served on 4/4/2020, answer due 4/27/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Klein, Jonathan)
April 3, 2020 Filing 29 Summons Issued as to Banco Continental, S.A., Inversiones Continental (Panama), S.A. de C.V.. (lbc)
April 3, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) via Alternative Service by WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. (Klein, Jonathan)
April 3, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) via Alternative Service by WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. (Klein, Jonathan)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER granting #25 Motion for Alternative Service Pursuant to Rule 4(f)(3). Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 4/3/2020. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
April 2, 2020 Filing 25 MOTION for Alternative Service Pursuant to Rule 4(f)(3) and Incorporated Memorandum of Law by WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Alex C. Lakatos, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Klein, Jonathan)
April 1, 2020 Filing 24 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Banco De Los Trabajadores S.A.. Banco De Los Trabajadores S.A. waiver sent on 3/31/2020, answer due 6/1/2020. (Redmond, Patricia)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report and AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES Joint Scheduling Report due by 5/4/2020 Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 3/30/2020. See attached document for full details. (cqs)
March 27, 2020 Filing 22 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.. Carol Pescatore Harpster waiver sent on 3/17/2020, answer due 5/18/2020; Carolyn Pescatore waiver sent on 3/17/2020, answer due 5/18/2020; Jada Pescatore waiver sent on 3/17/2020, answer due 5/18/2020; Jarrod Pescatore waiver sent on 3/17/2020, answer due 5/18/2020; John Pescatore waiver sent on 3/17/2020, answer due 5/18/2020; Jordan Pescatore waiver sent on 3/17/2020, answer due 5/18/2020; Josh Pescatore waiver sent on 3/17/2020, answer due 5/18/2020; Olivia Pescatore waiver sent on 3/17/2020, answer due 5/18/2020; Richard Pescatore waiver sent on 3/17/2020, answer due 5/18/2020. (Klein, Jonathan)
March 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER setting aside #12 Order; Plaintiff, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., shall file its motion for alternative service on the remaining un-served Defendants on or before April 2, 2020. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 3/19/2020. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
March 19, 2020 Filing 20 PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga: Telephone Conference held on 3/19/2020. Total time in court: 30 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Patricia Ann Redmond, Juan C. Basombrio, Leon Nicholas Patricios, Tony P. Korvick, Alex C. Lakatos, Gabriella Rosell, Court Reporter: Stephanie McCarn, 305-523-5518 / Stephanie_McCarn@flsd.uscourts.gov. (mh00)
March 18, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Tony P. Korvick on behalf of Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes, Christopher T. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Keith Stansell. Attorney Tony P. Korvick added to party Marc Gonsalves(pty:dft), Attorney Tony P. Korvick added to party Thomas Howes(pty:dft), Attorney Tony P. Korvick added to party Christopher T. Janis(pty:dft), Attorney Tony P. Korvick added to party Jonathan N. Janis(pty:dft), Attorney Tony P. Korvick added to party Judith G. Janis(pty:dft), Attorney Tony P. Korvick added to party Michael I. Janis(pty:dft), Attorney Tony P. Korvick added to party Keith Stansell(pty:dft). (Korvick, Tony)
March 18, 2020 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Christopher T. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Michael I. Janis. Christopher T. Janis waiver sent on 3/17/2020, answer due 5/18/2020; Judith G. Janis waiver sent on 3/17/2020, answer due 5/18/2020; Jonathan N. Janis waiver sent on 3/17/2020, answer due 5/18/2020; Michael I. Janis waiver sent on 3/17/2020, answer due 5/18/2020. (Korvick, Tony)
March 18, 2020 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Keith Stansell, Marc Gonsalves, Thomas Howes. Keith Stansell waiver sent on 3/17/2020, answer due 5/18/2020; Marc Gonsalves waiver sent on 3/17/2020, answer due 5/18/2020; Thomas Howes waiver sent on 3/17/2020, answer due 5/18/2020. (Korvick, Tony)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #15 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga (CMA)
March 17, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Juan C. Basombrio. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-12613943 by Banco De Los Trabajadores S.A.. Responses due by 3/31/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Redmond, Patricia)
March 16, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Joseph Ignacio Zumpano on behalf of Antonio Caballero. Attorney Joseph Ignacio Zumpano added to party Antonio Caballero(pty:dft). (Zumpano, Joseph)
March 16, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Leon Nicholas Patricios on behalf of Antonio Caballero. Attorney Leon Nicholas Patricios added to party Antonio Caballero(pty:dft). (Patricios, Leon)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER re #10 Notice (Other) filed by Banco De Los Trabajadores S.A., staying case as to Banco de los Trabajadores, S.A. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 3/16/2020. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #9 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga (CMA)
March 16, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE by Banco De Los Trabajadores S.A. (Redmond, Patricia)
March 13, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Alex C. Lakatos. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-12600519 by WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.. Responses due by 3/27/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Klein, Jonathan)
March 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER re #6 Notice of Attorney Appearance filed by Banco De Los Trabajadores S.A.; Defendant Banco De Los Trabajadores S.A. shall not file a response until all Defendants have been served. Once all Defendants have been served, Defendants shall submit a single combined response or separate answers within the time allowed for the last-served Defendant to respond. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 3/13/2020. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
March 13, 2020 Filing 7 PAPERLESS NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Status Conference, re: service on Banco Continental, set for 3/19/2020 09:45 AM in Miami Division before Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. The parties may appear by phone and are instructed to call 1-888-684-8852 on the date and time set forth above. The access code is 3156459 and the password is 5510. FOR CLARITY, PLEASE DO NOT USE A CELL PHONE OR A SPEAKER PHONE. (ps1)
March 13, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Patricia Ann Redmond on behalf of Banco De Los Trabajadores S.A.. Attorney Patricia Ann Redmond added to party Banco De Los Trabajadores S.A.(pty:dft). (Redmond, Patricia)
February 28, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Banco Continental, S.A., Banco De Los Trabajadores S.A., Antonio Caballero, Marc Gonsalves, Carol Pescatore Harpster, Thomas Howes, Inversiones Continental (Panama), S.A. de C.V., Christopher T. Janis, Jonathan N. Janis, Judith G. Janis, Michael I. Janis, Carolyn Pescatore, Jada Pescatore, Jarrod Pescatore, John Pescatore, Jordan Pescatore, Josh Pescatore, Olivia Pescatore, Richard Pescatore, Keith Stansell. (lbc)
February 27, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. (Klein, Jonathan)
February 27, 2020 Filing 3 Clerks Notice to Filer re: Summons(es) cannot be issued. Summons NOT issued for the following reason - Summons does not list name and Address of Defendant. (pcs)
February 27, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
February 27, 2020 Filing 1 Interpleader Complaint Filing fees $400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-12521985, filed by WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Exhibit A, #4 Exhibit B, #5 Exhibit C)(Klein, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A. v. Caballero et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Banco Continental, S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Inversiones Continental (Panama), S.A. de C.V.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Banco De Los Trabajadores S.A.
Represented By: Patricia Ann Redmond
Represented By: Juan C. Basombrio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher T. Janis
Represented By: Tony P. Korvick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GRUPO CONTINENTAL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jonathan N. Janis
Represented By: Tony P. Korvick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marc Gonsalves
Represented By: Tony P. Korvick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Josh Pescatore
Represented By: Nathaniel A. Tarnor
Represented By: Tony P. Korvick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Richard Pescatore
Represented By: Nathaniel A. Tarnor
Represented By: Tony P. Korvick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jordan Pescatore
Represented By: Nathaniel A. Tarnor
Represented By: Tony P. Korvick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jada Pescatore
Represented By: Nathaniel A. Tarnor
Represented By: Tony P. Korvick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carol Pescatore Harpster
Represented By: Nathaniel A. Tarnor
Represented By: Tony P. Korvick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BANCO CONTINENTAL S.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jarrod Pescatore
Represented By: Nathaniel A. Tarnor
Represented By: Tony P. Korvick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carolyn Pescatore
Represented By: Nathaniel A. Tarnor
Represented By: Tony P. Korvick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Stansell
Represented By: Tony P. Korvick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Pescatore
Represented By: Nathaniel A. Tarnor
Represented By: Tony P. Korvick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judith G. Janis
Represented By: Tony P. Korvick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Antonio Caballero
Represented By: Joseph Ignacio Zumpano
Represented By: Leon Nicholas Patricios
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Howes
Represented By: Tony P. Korvick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael I. Janis
Represented By: Tony P. Korvick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BANTRAB
Represented By: Patricia Ann Redmond
Represented By: Juan C. Basombrio
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Olivia Pescatore
Represented By: Nathaniel A. Tarnor
Represented By: Tony P. Korvick
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BANCO HONDURAS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A.
Represented By: Jonathan Samuel Klein
Represented By: Alex C. Lakatos
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?