Americans for Immigrant Justice, Inc. v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
Plaintiff: Americans for Immigrant Justice, Inc.
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security and United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Case Number: 1:2020cv20920
Filed: March 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Jose E Martinez
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:0552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #6 Joint Motion to Consolidate Cases. The Court cannot consolidate an existing case with a case that is not presently before it. If the parties wish to consolidate the two cases, as it appears they do, they should first ask the judge who will have jurisdiction to consider consolidation to accept transfer of a related case. Once the two cases are before the one judge, the parties may thereafter request consolidation. Signed by Judge Jose E. Martinez on 4/30/2020. (kml)
April 23, 2020 Filing 6 Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases 20-20920-CIV-MARTINEZ and 20-21072-CIV-ALTONAGA by United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. Responses due by 5/7/2020 (Raurell, Carlos)
April 8, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. Attorney Carlos Javier Raurell added to party United States Department of Homeland Security(pty:dft), Attorney Carlos Javier Raurell added to party United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement(pty:dft). (Raurell, Carlos)
March 24, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Americans for Immigrant Justice, Inc. re #1 Complaint, (Attachments: #1 Affidavit, #2 Affidavit, #3 Affidavit)(Norris, Allison)
March 2, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (ar2)
March 2, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Jose E. Martinez. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia M. Otazo-Reyes is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ar2)
March 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Department of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs Enforcement. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-12537860, filed by Americans for Immigrant Justice, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s), #5 Summon(s), #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit)(Norris, Allison)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Americans for Immigrant Justice, Inc. v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Carlos Javier Raurell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Carlos Javier Raurell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Americans for Immigrant Justice, Inc.
Represented By: Allison Norris
Represented By: Lisa M Berlow-Lehner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?