Woodbury v. Celebrity Cruises, Inc.
Plaintiff: David Nelson Woodbury
Defendant: Celebrity Cruises, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv20932
Filed: March 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Beth Bloom
Referring Judge: Lauren Fleischer Louis
Nature of Suit: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 24, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Selected/Added Laura Bonn as Mediator. Mediation Hearing set for 8/20/2020 @ 10:30 A.M.. (Niad Hannah, Cindy)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER Scheduling Mediation before Laura Bon. Mediation Deadline 8/24/2020. Mediation Hearing set for 8/20/2020 10:30 AM. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 4/23/2020. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER Scheduling Mediation before Laura Bon Mediation Hearing set for 8/20/2020 10:30 AM Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 4/23/2020. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
April 23, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Selected/Added Laura Bonn as Mediator. Mediation Hearing set for 8/20/2020 at 10:30 a.m.. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Saylor, Catherine)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Amended Pleadings due by 6/1/2020., Discovery due by 12/1/2020., Expert Discovery due by 12/1/2020., Joinder of Parties due by 6/1/2020., Mediation Deadline 12/15/2020., In Limine Motions due by 12/23/2020., Dispositive Motions due by 12/23/2020., Motions due by 12/23/2020., Pretrial Stipulation due by 3/15/2021., Jury Trial set for 3/29/2021 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom., Calendar Call set for 3/23/2021 01:45 PM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom.)( Mediation Deadline 12/15/2020.) Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 4/2/2020. See attached document for full details. (kpe) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
April 2, 2020 Filing 11 Joint Notice and Consent to Jurisdiction US Magistrate Judge signed by all parties for certain issues. Filed by David Nelson Woodbury (Munch, Jacob)
April 1, 2020 Filing 10 Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by David Nelson Woodbury (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Munch, Jacob)
March 25, 2020 Filing 9 Certificate of Other Affiliates by David Nelson Woodbury (Munch, Jacob)
March 25, 2020 Filing 8 Notice of NO Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by David Nelson Woodbury (Munch, Jacob)
March 25, 2020 Filing 7 Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Celebrity Cruises, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Royal Caribbean Cruises LTD for Celebrity Cruises, Inc. (Probst, Bryan)
March 25, 2020 Filing 6 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Celebrity Cruises, Inc.. Attorney Bryan Edward Probst added to party Celebrity Cruises, Inc.(pty:dft). (Probst, Bryan)
March 12, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by David Nelson Woodbury. Celebrity Cruises, Inc. served on 3/4/2020, answer due 3/25/2020. (Munch, Jacob)
March 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 3/2/2020. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
March 2, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Celebrity Cruises, Inc.. (kpe)
March 2, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (kpe)
March 2, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Celebrity Cruises, Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-12539998, filed by David Nelson Woodbury. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s), #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Munch, Jacob)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Woodbury v. Celebrity Cruises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Nelson Woodbury
Represented By: Jacob John Munch
Represented By: Catherine Munch Saylor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Celebrity Cruises, Inc.
Represented By: Bryan Edward Probst
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?