PayRange Inc. v. KIOSOFT TECHNOLOGIES, LLC et al
Plaintiff: PayRange Inc.
Defendant: KIOSOFT TECHNOLOGIES, LLC and TECHTREX, INC.
Case Number: 1:2020cv20970
Filed: March 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Rodney Smith
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:0145
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 1, 2020 Filing 20 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand and, COUNTERCLAIM against PayRange Inc. by TECHTREX, INC., KIOSOFT TECHNOLOGIES, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D)(Camp, John)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER REQUIRING JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT, CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES AND CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Joint Scheduling Report due by 5/18/2020. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 4/28/2020. See attached document for full details. (dco)
March 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #16 #17 Amended Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorneys Holiday W. Banta and Christian H. Robertson II. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 3/31/2020. (dco)
March 30, 2020 Attorney Holiday Banta representing KIOSOFT TECHNOLOGIES, LLC (Defendant) and Christian H. Robertson, II representing KIOSOFT TECHNOLOGIES, LLC (Defendant) Activated. (pt)
March 30, 2020 Filing 17 Amended MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Christian H. Robertson II. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Amended/Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filed - Filing Fees Previously Paid. See #14 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, by KIOSOFT TECHNOLOGIES, LLC, TECHTREX, INC.. Responses due by 4/13/2020 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Camp, John)
March 30, 2020 Filing 16 Amended MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Holiday W. Banta. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Amended/Corrected Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filed - Filing Fees Previously Paid. See #13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, by KIOSOFT TECHNOLOGIES, LLC, TECHTREX, INC.. Responses due by 4/13/2020 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Camp, John)
March 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 PAPERLESS ORDER denying without prejudice #13 #14 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorneys Holiday Banta and Christian H. Robertson. Local counsel did not consent to electronically serve all documents and things that may be served electronically or consent to serving documents in compliance with the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. (A sample motion can be found on the Court's website.) Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 3/29/2020. (dco)
March 25, 2020 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Christian H. Robertson II. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-12653924 by KIOSOFT TECHNOLOGIES, LLC, TECHTREX, INC.. Responses due by 4/8/2020 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Camp, John)
March 25, 2020 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Holiday W. Banta. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-12653904 by KIOSOFT TECHNOLOGIES, LLC, TECHTREX, INC.. Responses due by 4/8/2020 (Attachments: #1 Certification, #2 Text of Proposed Order)(Camp, John)
March 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PAPERLESS ORDER granting in part #11 Motion for Extension of Time. Defendants shall respond to the #1 Complaint by no later than May 1, 2020. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 3/25/2020. (dco)
March 25, 2020 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint by KIOSOFT TECHNOLOGIES, LLC, TECHTREX, INC.. Attorney John Anderson Camp added to party KIOSOFT TECHNOLOGIES, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney John Anderson Camp added to party TECHTREX, INC.(pty:dft). (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Camp, John)
March 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PAPERLESS ORDER granting #7 #8 #9 Motions to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorneys Ryan R. Smith, James C. Yoon, and Jamie Y. Otto. Signed by Judge Rodney Smith on 3/24/2020. (dco)
March 23, 2020 Filing 9 Plaintiff's MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Jamie Y. Otto. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-12640947 by PayRange Inc.. Responses due by 4/6/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certification Certification of Jaime Y. Otto)(Englander, Joseph)
March 23, 2020 Filing 8 Plaintiff's MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for James C. Yoon. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-12640888 by PayRange Inc.. Responses due by 4/6/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certification Certification of James C. Yoon)(Englander, Joseph)
March 23, 2020 Filing 7 Plaintiff's MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Ryan R. Smith. Filing Fee $ 200.00 Receipt # AFLSDC-12640786 by PayRange Inc.. Responses due by 4/6/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order, #2 Certification Certification of Ryan R. Smith)(Englander, Joseph)
March 6, 2020 Filing 6 Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement by PayRange Inc. (Englander, Joseph)
March 6, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to KIOSOFT TECHNOLOGIES, LLC, TECHTREX, INC.. (lbc)
March 5, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by PayRange Inc. re #1 Complaint filed by PayRange Inc. (Attachments: #1 Summon(s), #2 Summon(s)) (Englander, Joseph)
March 4, 2020 Filing 3 FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (ar2)
March 3, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Rodney Smith. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ar2)
March 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-12547512, filed by PayRange Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Englander, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: PayRange Inc. v. KIOSOFT TECHNOLOGIES, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KIOSOFT TECHNOLOGIES, LLC
Represented By: Holiday Banta
Represented By: Christian H. Robertson, II
Represented By: John Anderson Camp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TECHTREX, INC.
Represented By: Holiday Banta
Represented By: Christian H. Robertson, II
Represented By: John Anderson Camp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: PayRange Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Robert Englander
Represented By: James C. Yoon
Represented By: Jamie Y. Otto
Represented By: Ryan R. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?