Americans for Immigrant Justice, Inc. v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
Plaintiff: Americans for Immigrant Justice, Inc.
Defendant: Immigration and Customs Enforcement, Department of Homeland Security, United States Department of Homeland Security and United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Case Number: 1:2020cv21072
Filed: March 10, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Cecilia M Altonaga
Nature of Suit: Freedom of Information Act
Cause of Action: 05:0552
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PAPERLESS ORDER denying #12 Motion to Consolidate Cases. The Court cannot consolidate an existing case with a case that is not presently before it. If the parties wish to consolidate the two cases, as it appears they do, they should first ask the judge who will have jurisdiction to consider consolidation to accept transfer of a related case. Once the two cases are before the one judge, the parties may thereafter request consolidation. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga (CMA)
April 23, 2020 Filing 12 Joint MOTION to Consolidate Cases 20-20920-CIV-MARTINEZ and 20-21072-CIV-ALTONAGA by United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. Responses due by 5/7/2020 (Raurell, Carlos)
April 13, 2020 Filing 11 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement. Attorney Carlos Javier Raurell added to party United States Department of Homeland Security(pty:dft), Attorney Carlos Javier Raurell added to party United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement(pty:dft). (Raurell, Carlos)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Joint Scheduling Report due by 5/20/2020 Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 4/9/2020. See attached document for full details. (cds)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER re #5 Certificate of Service filed by Americans for Immigrant Justice, Inc., #8 Certificate of Service filed by Americans for Immigrant Justice, Inc. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 4/9/2020. See attached document for full details. (cds)
April 9, 2020 Filing 8 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Americans for Immigrant Justice, Inc. re #1 Complaint, (Norris, Allison)
April 9, 2020 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Americans for Immigrant Justice, Inc. re #1 Complaint, (Norris, Allison)
April 9, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Americans for Immigrant Justice, Inc. re #1 Complaint, (Norris, Allison)
April 9, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Americans for Immigrant Justice, Inc. re #1 Complaint, (Norris, Allison)
March 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER requiring service to be perfected by 6/8/2020. Signed by Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 3/30/2020. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
March 11, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to United States Department of Homeland Security, United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (kpe)
March 10, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (kpe)
March 10, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Department of Homeland Security, Immigration and Customs Enforcement. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-12581661, filed by Americans for Immigrant Justice, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s), #4 Summon(s), #5 Summon(s), #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit)(Norris, Allison)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Americans for Immigrant Justice, Inc. v. United States Department of Homeland Security et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Homeland Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of Homeland Security
Represented By: Carlos Javier Raurell
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Immigration and Customs Enforcement
Represented By: Carlos Javier Raurell
Represented By: Noticing INS Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Americans for Immigrant Justice, Inc.
Represented By: Allison Norris
Represented By: Lisa M Berlow-Lehner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?