Dowdy v. Celebrity Cruises, Inc.
Plaintiff: Stephanie Dowdy
Defendant: Celebrity Cruises, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv21088
Filed: March 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Marcia G Cooke
Referring Judge: Jonathan Goodman
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2020 Filing 7 Certificate of Other Affiliates by Stephanie Dowdy (Gerson, Philip)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MAGISTRATE JUDGE GOODMANS DISCOVERY PROCEDURES ORDER. (For Image See DE#5 ) Signed by Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman on 4/9/2020. See attached document for full details. (drz)
April 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF REFERRAL AND ORDER REGARDING COURT PRACTICES AND PROCEDURES. Signed by Judge Marcia G. Cooke on 4/9/2020. See attached document for full details. (drz)
April 7, 2020 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Stephanie Dowdy. Celebrity Cruises, Inc. waiver sent on 4/7/2020, answer due 6/8/2020. (Gerson, Philip)
March 12, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Celebrity Cruises, Inc. (pcs)
March 12, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Marcia G. Cooke. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jonathan Goodman is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs)
March 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Celebrity Cruises, Inc.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-12591392, filed by Stephanie Dowdy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Summons, #3 Exhibit Civil Cover)(Gerson, Philip)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Dowdy v. Celebrity Cruises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephanie Dowdy
Represented By: Nicholas I. Gerson
Represented By: Edward Steven Schwartz
Represented By: David L Markel
Represented By: Raul Gabriel Delgado, II
Represented By: Philip Maurice Gerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Celebrity Cruises, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?