ALTERS et al v. PEOPLE'S REPUBLIC OF CHINA et al Featured Case

Plaintiffs sued Defendants People's Republic of China and various government entities alleging that plaintiffs have or are virtually certain to suffer physical illness or death, as well as emotional distress, as a result of the negligence of defendants in handling the COVID-19 outbreak

Plaintiff: THE PITCHING LAB LLC d/b/a TBT TRAINING, LAWRENCE WOOD, STEPHEN CLYNE, LOGAN ALTERS, MARTA REYES, BILL MCCUTCHEON, DR. ANDREW NEWMAN, BRYAN EADS, RAY BODINE, JUDY HART, SOUTH FLORIDA SURFING CORP. d/b/a ISLAND WATER SPORTS MIAMI, SEAGRASS RESORT, LLC, SAMSON TOURS INC., JUPITER DONUTS, EAST AIR CORPORATION, SHERRY WERNER, TODD KUNTZE, SAUNDRA ANDRINGA-MEUER, ROBERT SHAFFER, SB HOLDINGS I, LLC, KIMBERLY ELLER, GEORGE ROGOZINSKI, Constance Greene, KARL UMBACH, ROBERT JARVIS, Mr. M's Sandwich Shop, Inc., JENNIFER MITCHELL, LINDA IGLESIAS, THE PITCHING LAB LLC, JOHN VECCHIARELLO, LORRAINE CAGGIANO MAIORINO, WILLIAM DAMELIO, GALLERY ART GROUP, INC., JESSICA MERRITT and ESTATE OF JAMES A MITCHELL
Defendant: THE PEOPLE'S GOVERNMENT OF CITY OF WUHAN, CHINA, MINISTRY OF CIVIL AFFAIRS OF THE PEOPLE'S REPUBLIC OF CHINA, NATIONAL HEALTH COMMISSION OF THE PEOPLE'S REPUBLIC OF CHINA, PEOPLE'S GOVERNMENT OF HUBAI PROVINCE, MINISTRY OF EMERGENCY MANAGEMENT OF THE PEOPLE'S REPUBLIC OF CHINA, PEOPLE'S REPUBLIC OF CHINA, WUHAN HEALTH COMMISSION, WUHAN INSTITUTE OF VIROLOGY, CHINESE ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, COMMUNIST PARTY OF CHINA, HUBEI HEALTH COMMISSION and THE PEOPLE'S GOVERNMENT OF HUBEI PROVINCE
Case Number: 1:2020cv21108
Filed: March 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Ursula Ungaro
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2020 Filing 17 STATUS REPORT by SAUNDRA ANDRINGA-MEUER, RAY BODINE, LORRAINE CAGGIANO MAIORINO, STEPHEN CLYNE, WILLIAM DAMELIO, BRYAN EADS, EAST AIR CORPORATION, KIMBERLY ELLER, GALLERY ART GROUP, INC., Constance Greene, JUDY HART, LINDA IGLESIAS, ROBERT JARVIS, JUPITER DONUTS, TODD KUNTZE, BILL MCCUTCHEON, JESSICA MERRITT, ESTATE OF JAMES A MITCHELL, JENNIFER MITCHELL, Mr. M's Sandwich Shop, Inc., ANDREW NEWMAN, MARTA REYES, GEORGE ROGOZINSKI, SAMSON TOURS INC., SB HOLDINGS I, LLC, SEAGRASS RESORT, LLC, ROBERT SHAFFER, SOUTH FLORIDA SURFING CORP. d/b/a ISLAND WATER SPORTS MIAMI, THE PITCHING LAB LLC, KARL UMBACH, JOHN VECCHIARELLO, SHERRY WERNER, LAWRENCE WOOD (Moore, Matthew)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO DROP PARTIES PURSUANT TO RULE 21, granting #15 Motion to Drop Parties Pursuant to Rule 21. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 5/7/2020. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
May 5, 2020 Filing 15 Plaintiff's MOTION TO DROP PARTIES/DEFENDANTS, MINISTRY OF EMERGENCY MANAGEMENT OF THE PEOPLE'S REPUBLIC OF CHINA AND MINISTRY OF CIVIL AFFAIRS OF THE PEOPLE'S REPUBLIC OF CHINA PURSUANT TO RULE 21 by LOGAN ALTERS, SAUNDRA ANDRINGA-MEUER, RAY BODINE, LORRAINE CAGGIANO MAIORINO, STEPHEN CLYNE, WILLIAM DAMELIO, BRYAN EADS, EAST AIR CORPORATION, KIMBERLY ELLER, GALLERY ART GROUP, INC., Constance Greene, JUDY HART, LINDA IGLESIAS, ROBERT JARVIS, JUPITER DONUTS, TODD KUNTZE, BILL MCCUTCHEON, JESSICA MERRITT, ESTATE OF JAMES A MITCHELL, JENNIFER MITCHELL, Mr. M's Sandwich Shop, Inc., ANDREW NEWMAN, MARTA REYES, GEORGE ROGOZINSKI, SAMSON TOURS INC., SB HOLDINGS I, LLC, SEAGRASS RESORT, LLC, ROBERT SHAFFER, SOUTH FLORIDA SURFING CORP. d/b/a ISLAND WATER SPORTS MIAMI, THE PITCHING LAB LLC, KARL UMBACH, JOHN VECCHIARELLO, SHERRY WERNER, LAWRENCE WOOD. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order PROPOSED ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO DROP PARTIES PURSUANT TO RULE 21)(Moore, Matthew)
May 5, 2020 Filing 14 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): COMMUNIST PARTY OF CHINA, WUHAN HEALTH COMMISSION, HUBEI HEALTH COMMISSION and WUHAN INSTITUTE OF VIROLOGY, CHINESE ACADEMY OF SCIENCES. (Moore, Matthew)
May 5, 2020 Filing 13 Notice of Entry of Parties Listed NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): TODD KUNTZE, SAUNDRA ANDRINGA-MEUER, JESSICA MERRITT, JOHN VECCHIARELLO, LINDA IGLESIAS, Constance Greene, BRYAN EADS, JENNIFER MITCHELL, ESTATE OF JAMES A MITCHELL, LORRAINE CAGGIANO MAIORINO, RAY BODINE, GEORGE ROGOZINSKI, KIMBERLY ELLER, SHERRY WERNER, WILLIAM DAMELIO, JUDY HART, SB HOLDINGS I, LLC, ROBERT JARVIS, SEAGRASS RESORT, LLC, BILL MCCUTCHEON, ANDREW NEWMAN, Mr. M's Sandwich Shop, Inc., JUPITER DONUTS, GALLERY ART GROUP, INC., SOUTH FLORIDA SURFING CORP. d/b/a ISLAND WATER SPORTS MIAMI, SAMSON TOURS INC., EAST AIR CORPORATION, ROBERT SHAFFER and KARL UMBACH, SB HOLDINGS I, LLC, SHERRY WERNER, EAST AIR CORPORATION, GALLERY ART GROUP, INC., JOHN VECCHIARELLO, ESTATE OF JAMES A MITCHELL, SAMSON TOURS INC., ROBERT JARVIS, LINDA IGLESIAS, SOUTH FLORIDA SURFING CORP. d/b/a ISLAND WATER SPORTS MIAMI, ROBERT SHAFFER, JUPITER DONUTS, TODD KUNTZE, Mr. M's Sandwich Shop, Inc., SAUNDRA ANDRINGA-MEUER, KARL UMBACH, JUDY HART, BILL MCCUTCHEON, WILLIAM DAMELIO, SEAGRASS RESORT, LLC, GEORGE ROGOZINSKI, Constance Greene, JESSICA MERRITT, RAY BODINE, LORRAINE CAGGIANO MAIORINO, KIMBERLY ELLER, ANDREW NEWMAN, JENNIFER MITCHELL and BRYAN EADS.. Attorney Matthew T Moore added to party TODD KUNTZE(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew T Moore added to party SAUNDRA ANDRINGA-MEUER(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew T Moore added to party JESSICA MERRITT(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew T Moore added to party JOHN VECCHIARELLO(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew T Moore added to party LINDA IGLESIAS(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew T Moore added to party Constance Greene(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew T Moore added to party BRYAN EADS(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew T Moore added to party JENNIFER MITCHELL(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew T Moore added to party ESTATE OF JAMES A MITCHELL(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew T Moore added to party LORRAINE CAGGIANO MAIORINO(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew T Moore added to party RAY BODINE(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew T Moore added to party GEORGE ROGOZINSKI(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew T Moore added to party KIMBERLY ELLER(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew T Moore added to party SHERRY WERNER(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew T Moore added to party WILLIAM DAMELIO(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew T Moore added to party JUDY HART(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew T Moore added to party SB HOLDINGS I, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew T Moore added to party ROBERT JARVIS(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew T Moore added to party SEAGRASS RESORT, LLC(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew T Moore added to party BILL MCCUTCHEON(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew T Moore added to party ANDREW NEWMAN(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew T Moore added to party Mr. M's Sandwich Shop, Inc.(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew T Moore added to party JUPITER DONUTS(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew T Moore added to party GALLERY ART GROUP, INC.(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew T Moore added to party SOUTH FLORIDA SURFING CORP. d/b/a ISLAND WATER SPORTS MIAMI(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew T Moore added to party SAMSON TOURS INC.(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew T Moore added to party EAST AIR CORPORATION(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew T Moore added to party ROBERT SHAFFER(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew T Moore added to party KARL UMBACH(pty:pla). (Moore, Matthew)
May 5, 2020 Filing 12 Clerks Notice to Filer re #11 Amended Complaint. Parties/Mediator Not Added. ERROR. The Filer failed to add all parties from the complaint. Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Entry of Parties Listed into CM/ECF and add all the additional parties. (lbc)
May 4, 2020 Filing 11 First AMENDED COMPLAINT Pursuant to F.R.C.P.15(a)(1) against All Defendants, filed by LAWRENCE WOOD, MARTA REYES, LOGAN ALTERS, STEPHEN CLYNE, THE PITCHING LAB LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Composite Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Composite Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Composite Exhibit C)(Moore, Matthew)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER granting #9 Motion for Extension of Time to Comply with the Court's Order Setting Initial Planning and Scheduling Conference. Scheduling Conference set for 9/4/2020 09:30 AM before Judge Ursula Ungaro. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 4/23/2020. See attached document for full details. (drz)
April 15, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to Comply with Court's Order Setting Initial Planning and Scheduling Conference re #8 Order Setting/Cancelling Hearing,, Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report, by STEPHEN CLYNE, MARTA REYES, THE PITCHING LAB LLC, LAWRENCE WOOD. Responses due by 4/29/2020 (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Moore, Matthew)
March 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER SETTING INITIAL PLANNING AND SCHEDULING CONFERENCE (Scheduling Conference set for 5/1/2020 09:30 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro, Joint Scheduling Report due by 4/17/2020) Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 3/17/2020. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
March 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #6 MOTION to Drop Party/Plaintiff Logan Alters Pursuant to Rule 21 filed by LAWRENCE WOOD, STEPHEN CLYNE, THE PITCHING LAB LLC, MARTA REYES, LOGAN ALTERS. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 3/16/2020. See attached document for full details. (pcs)
March 13, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to Drop Party/Plaintiff Logan Alters Pursuant to Rule 21 by LOGAN ALTERS, STEPHEN CLYNE, MARTA REYES, THE PITCHING LAB LLC, LAWRENCE WOOD. (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Moore, Matthew)
March 13, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Change of Address by Vincent Duffy (Duffy, Vincent)
March 13, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Change of Address by Matthew T Moore (Moore, Matthew)
March 13, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to PEOPLE'S REPUBLIC OF CHINA. (pcs)
March 12, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Ursula Ungaro. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (pcs) Modified on 3/13/2020 (pcs).
March 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-12595677, filed by LAWRENCE WOOD, MARTA REYES, LOGAN ALTERS, STEPHEN CLYNE, THE PITCHING LAB LLC d/b/a TBT TRAINING. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s) Summons)(Moore, Matthew)
March 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-12595677, filed by LAWRENCE WOOD, MARTA REYES, LOGAN ALTERS, STEPHEN CLYNE, THE PITCHING LAB LLC d/b/a TBT TRAINING. (Attachments: # 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, # 2 Summon(s) Summons)(Moore, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: ALTERS et al v. PEOPLE'S REPUBLIC OF CHINA et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE PITCHING LAB LLC d/b/a TBT TRAINING
Represented By: Matthew T Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LAWRENCE WOOD
Represented By: Matthew T Moore
Represented By: Vincent Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: STEPHEN CLYNE
Represented By: Matthew T Moore
Represented By: Vincent Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LOGAN ALTERS
Represented By: Matthew T Moore
Represented By: Vincent Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARTA REYES
Represented By: Matthew T Moore
Represented By: Vincent Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BILL MCCUTCHEON
Represented By: Matthew T Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: DR. ANDREW NEWMAN
Represented By: Matthew T Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRYAN EADS
Represented By: Matthew T Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RAY BODINE
Represented By: Matthew T Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUDY HART
Represented By: Matthew T Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SOUTH FLORIDA SURFING CORP. d/b/a ISLAND WATER SPORTS MIAMI
Represented By: Matthew T Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SEAGRASS RESORT, LLC
Represented By: Matthew T Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAMSON TOURS INC.
Represented By: Matthew T Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JUPITER DONUTS
Represented By: Matthew T Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EAST AIR CORPORATION
Represented By: Matthew T Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SHERRY WERNER
Represented By: Matthew T Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: TODD KUNTZE
Represented By: Matthew T Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SAUNDRA ANDRINGA-MEUER
Represented By: Matthew T Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT SHAFFER
Represented By: Matthew T Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SB HOLDINGS I, LLC
Represented By: Matthew T Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIMBERLY ELLER
Represented By: Matthew T Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GEORGE ROGOZINSKI
Represented By: Matthew T Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Constance Greene
Represented By: Matthew T Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KARL UMBACH
Represented By: Matthew T Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROBERT JARVIS
Represented By: Matthew T Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mr. M's Sandwich Shop, Inc.
Represented By: Matthew T Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JENNIFER MITCHELL
Represented By: Matthew T Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LINDA IGLESIAS
Represented By: Matthew T Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: THE PITCHING LAB LLC
Represented By: Matthew T Moore
Represented By: Vincent Duffy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JOHN VECCHIARELLO
Represented By: Matthew T Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: LORRAINE CAGGIANO MAIORINO
Represented By: Matthew T Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: WILLIAM DAMELIO
Represented By: Matthew T Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: GALLERY ART GROUP, INC.
Represented By: Matthew T Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JESSICA MERRITT
Represented By: Matthew T Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ESTATE OF JAMES A MITCHELL
Represented By: Matthew T Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE PEOPLE'S GOVERNMENT OF CITY OF WUHAN, CHINA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MINISTRY OF CIVIL AFFAIRS OF THE PEOPLE'S REPUBLIC OF CHINA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NATIONAL HEALTH COMMISSION OF THE PEOPLE'S REPUBLIC OF CHINA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PEOPLE'S GOVERNMENT OF HUBAI PROVINCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MINISTRY OF EMERGENCY MANAGEMENT OF THE PEOPLE'S REPUBLIC OF CHINA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: PEOPLE'S REPUBLIC OF CHINA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WUHAN HEALTH COMMISSION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WUHAN INSTITUTE OF VIROLOGY, CHINESE ACADEMY OF SCIENCES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMMUNIST PARTY OF CHINA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HUBEI HEALTH COMMISSION
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: THE PEOPLE'S GOVERNMENT OF HUBEI PROVINCE
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?