Rashbaum v. Celebrity Cruises, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Richard Rashbaum
Defendant: Royal Caribbean Cruises, LTD. and Celebrity Cruises, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv21210
Filed: March 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Federico A Moreno
Nature of Suit: P.I.: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1391
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2020 Filing 10 Clerks Notice to Filer re #8 Notice (Other). Wrong Event Selected; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see [de#9]. It is not necessary to refile this document. (lk)
May 12, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Mediator Selection. Selected/Added Michael P Essington as Mediator. See image DE #8 (lk)
May 12, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE by Richard Rashbaum of Selection of Mediator (Baisden, Alexander)
April 28, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings as per DE #7 : Mediation Deadline 12/16/2020. (lk)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER REFERRING CASE to Mediation. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 4/27/2020. See attached document for full details. (mmd)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 SCHEDULING ORDER: Jury Trial set for two-week period starting 2/16/2021 before Judge Federico A. Moreno. Calendar Call set for 2/9/2021 02:00 PM before Judge Federico A. Moreno. Signed by Judge Federico A. Moreno on 4/27/2020. See attached document for full details. (mmd) #Pattern Jury Instruction Builder - To access the latest, up to date changes to the 11th Circuit Pattern Jury Instructions go to https://pji.ca11.uscourts.gov or click here.
April 23, 2020 Filing 5 Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Celebrity Cruises, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Royal Caribbean Cruises, Ltd. for Celebrity Cruises, Inc. (Applin, Nicholas)
April 23, 2020 Filing 4 ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint by Celebrity Cruises, Inc.. Attorney Nicholas Allen Applin added to party Celebrity Cruises, Inc.(pty:dft). (Applin, Nicholas)
March 19, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Celebrity Cruises, Inc., Royal Caribbean Cruises, LTD.. (kpe)
March 19, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Federico A. Moreno. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (kpe)
March 19, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT and Demand for Jury Trial against Celebrity Cruises, Inc., Royal Caribbean Cruises, LTD.. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-12627375, filed by Richard Rashbaum. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Summon(s))(Baisden, Alexander)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rashbaum v. Celebrity Cruises, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Royal Caribbean Cruises, LTD.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Celebrity Cruises, Inc.
Represented By: Nicholas Allen Applin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Rashbaum
Represented By: Alexander Ellis Baisden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?