Internet Media Interactive Corp. v. Lennar Corporation
Plaintiff: Internet Media Interactive Corp.
Defendant: Lennar Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv21270
Filed: March 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Ursula Ungaro
Nature of Suit: Patent
Cause of Action: 35:0271
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER DISMISSING CASE; Notice is approved, and this case is hereby Dismissed with Prejudice as to all parties and all claims. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 4/20/2020. See attached document for full details. (jbs)
April 20, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal of Defendant with Prejudice by Internet Media Interactive Corp. (Haller, Timothy)
April 17, 2020 Filing 12 FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (lk)
April 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Administrative Order Closing Case. All future hearings and deadlines are CANCELLED and all pending motions are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 4/16/2020. See attached document for full details. (lk)
April 17, 2020 Filing 10 Notice of Court Practice upon Settlement. Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 4/17/2020. See attached document for full details. (lk)
April 17, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Settlement and [Proposed] Order Staying Case by Internet Media Interactive Corp. (Haller, Timothy)
April 9, 2020 Set Answer to Complaint Due Deadline: Lennar Corporation response due 5/1/2020 per DE #8 (jbs)
April 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting in part #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document. Re: #1 Complaint, filed by Internet Media Interactive Corp.. Joint Scheduling Report due by 5/4/2020 Response to the Complaint due by 5/1/2020 Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 4/8/2020. See attached document for full details. (jbs)
April 7, 2020 Filing 7 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to #1 Complaint, #6 Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report,, Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings, by Internet Media Interactive Corp.. (Haller, Timothy)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 Order Setting Initial Planning and Scheduling Conference; Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report, ( Scheduling Conference set for 5/15/2020 10:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Ursula Ungaro.) Joint Scheduling Report due by 5/1/2020 Signed by Judge Ursula Ungaro on 4/1/2020. See attached document for full details. (lk)
March 31, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on #1 Complaint, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Internet Media Interactive Corp.. Lennar Corporation served on 3/26/2020, answer due 4/16/2020. (Haller, Timothy)
March 25, 2020 Filing 4 FORM AO 120 SENT TO DIRECTOR OF U.S. PATENT AND TRADEMARK (ar2)
March 25, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Lennar Corporation. (ar2)
March 25, 2020 Filing 2 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Ursula Ungaro. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge John J. O'Sullivan is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (ar2)
March 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against Lennar Corporation. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number AFLSDC-12651502, filed by Internet Media Interactive Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Summon(s), #3 Exhibit A)(Haller, Timothy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Internet Media Interactive Corp. v. Lennar Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lennar Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Internet Media Interactive Corp.
Represented By: Timothy J. Haller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?