Bank Of America, N.A. v. Rodriguez
Appellant: Bank Of America, N.A.
Appellee: Genny Marino Rodriguez
Case Number: 1:2020cv21403
Filed: April 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Southern District of Florida
Presiding Judge: Robert N Scola
Referring Judge: Kathleen M Williams
Nature of Suit: Bankruptcy Appeal (801)
Cause of Action: 28:0158
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 13, 2020 Civil Case Terminated per DE #8 . Closing Case. (pcs)
April 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Order Consolidating Related Cases Signed by Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr on 4/10/2020. See attached document for full details. Associated Cases: 1:20-cv-20758-RNS, 1:20-cv-21403-RNS. All future filings in these actions must be filed in case number 20cv20758 (pcs) Modified on 4/13/2020 (pcs).
April 13, 2020 Cases associated. (pcs)
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER TRANSFERRING CASE to Judge Robert N. Scola, Jr for all further proceedings, accepted and signed on 04/10/2020. Judge Kathleen M. Williams no longer assigned to case Signed by Judge Kathleen M. Williams on 4/10/2020. See attached document for full details. (cds)
April 10, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE by Bank Of America, N.A. Notice of Filing Copy of April 6, 2020 Order Granting Motion to Vacate Bankruptcy Court Order entered in District Court Appellate Case No. 1:20-cv-20758-RNS (Kaufman, Dora)
April 10, 2020 Filing 5 Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by Bank Of America, N.A. (Kaufman, Dora)
April 1, 2020 Filing 4 Clerk's Notice to Parties Re Administrative Order 2015-9 and Amendments to Federal Bankruptcy Rules and Local Rule 87.4 Re Processing of Bankruptcy Appeals (jc)
April 1, 2020 Filing 3 Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Kathleen M. Williams. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jc)
April 1, 2020 Filing 2 Bankruptcy Transmittal of re #1 Bankruptcy Appeal filed by Bank Of America, N.A. (Attachments: #1 Amended NOA, #2 Docket Sheet)(lle)
April 1, 2020 Filing 1 Notice of APPEAL FROM BANKRUPTCY COURT (received), Bankruptcy Court case number 12-12043-LMI, filed by Bank Of America, N.A..(lle)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Florida Southern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bank Of America, N.A. v. Rodriguez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellant: Bank Of America, N.A.
Represented By: Laudy Luna
Represented By: Dora Faye Kaufman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Appellee: Genny Marino Rodriguez
Represented By: Bruce Jacobs
Represented By: Eric Scott Brumfield
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?